Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. v. Zaremba Family Farms, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellant: ZAREMBA GROUP, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company and ZAREMBA FAMILY FARMS, INC., a Michigan corporation
Plaintiff / Appellee: ENCANA OIL & GAS (USA) INC., a Delaware corporation
Case Number: 19-1021
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/09/2019;. appellee brief due 05/09/2019; (BSM) [Entered: 02/28/2019 08:49 AM]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER filed: The motion to dismiss the appeal as untimely is therefore GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and the motion to dismiss the Zaremba Group for lack of standing is DENIED AS MOOT. [ # 12 ]. Damon J. Keith, Circuit Judge; Raymond M. Kethledge, Circuit Judge and Amul R. Thapar, Circuit Judge. (BSM) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:21 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY filed by Mr. Neil Lloyd for Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. regarding MOTION [12] filed by Mr. Neil Lloyd for Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction Certificate of Service: 01/30/2019. [19-1021] (NL) [Entered: 01/30/2019 03:25 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 12 ]; previously filed by Mr. Neil Lloyd for Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.. Response from Attorney Mr. Michael F. Wais for Appellants Zaremba Family Farms, Inc. and Zaremba Group, LLC Certificate of Service:01/23/2019. [19-1021] (MFW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:35 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. (BSM) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:01 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION filed by Mr. Neil Lloyd for Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1021] (NL) [Entered: 01/17/2019 02:52 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. by Jessica A. Sprovtsoff. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1021] (JAS) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:09 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert J. Wierenga for Appellee Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1021] (RJW) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:05 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. by Neil Lloyd. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1021] (NL) [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:57 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. by Robert J. Wierenga. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1021] (RJW) [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:40 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Michael F. Wais for Appellants Zaremba Family Farms, Inc. and Zaremba Group, LLC. Certificate of Service:01/16/2019. [19-1021] (MFW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:32 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael F. Wais for Appellants Zaremba Family Farms, Inc. and Zaremba Group, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-1021] (MFW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:30 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Zaremba Family Farms, Inc. and Zaremba Group, LLC by Michael F. Wais. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-1021] (MFW) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:28 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Zaremba Family Farms, Inc. and Zaremba Group, LLC by Jonathan F. Karmo. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-1021] (JFK) [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:24 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/12/2019;. appellee brief due 03/14/2019; (BSM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 04:28 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Briston Mitchell (BSM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 04:27 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Zaremba Family Farms, Inc. and Zaremba Group, LLC. Transcript needed: n. (BSM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 04:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc. v. Zaremba Family Farms, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ZAREMBA GROUP, LLC, a Michigan limited liability company
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Represented By: Jonathan F. Karmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ZAREMBA FAMILY FARMS, INC., a Michigan corporation
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Represented By: Jonathan F. Karmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ENCANA OIL & GAS (USA) INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Wierenga
Represented By: Jessica Anne Sprovtsoff
Represented By: Neil Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?