Garrett Tetil, et al v. Juniata Township, et al
Plaintiff: GARRETT TETIL
Defendant / Appellee: JUNIATA TOWNSHIP PLANNING COMMISSION, JUNIATA TOWNSHIP ZONING BOARD OF APPEALS and JUNIATA TOWNSHIP
Plaintiff / Appellant: LAURA RICHMOND, RACHELLE TERBUSH, AMANDA WENZLICK, RYAN WENZLICK and JERRY TERBUSH
Undetermined: PEGASUS WIND, LLC
Case Number: 19-1058
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - mediation [ # 13 ] filed by Mr. Kevin J. Roragen. Entered by order of the court. (CAW) [Entered: 01/31/2019 03:57 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION:. The Mediation Conference scheduled for 02/08/2019 is hereby canceled. (MLB) [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:11 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33(d). Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Kevin J. Roragen for Appellants Laura Richmond, Jerry TerBush, Rachelle TerBush, Amanda Wenzlick and Ryan Wenzlick. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2019. [19-1058] (KJR) [Entered: 01/30/2019 05:11 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Juniata Township, Juniata Township Planning Commission and Juniata Township Zoning Board of Appeals by Heidi D. Hudson. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2019. [19-1058] (HDH) [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:27 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 02/08/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:04 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Ashley Grace Chrysler for Intervenor Pegasus Wind, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/18/2019. [19-1058] (AGC) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:35 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Intervenor Pegasus Wind, LLC by Ashley G. Chrysler. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2019. [19-1058] (AGC) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:33 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Intervenor Pegasus Wind, LLC by Daniel P. Ettinger. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2019. [19-1058] (DPE) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:31 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Intervenor Pegasus Wind, LLC by Jonathan E. Lauderbach. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2019. [19-1058] (JEL) [Entered: 01/18/2019 01:27 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/15/2019 11:33 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/15/2019 11:31 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Juniata Township, Juniata Township Planning Commission and Juniata Township Zoning Board of Appeals by Amy S. Applin. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2019. [19-1058] (ASA) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:04 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/25/2019; appellee brief due 03/27/2019. (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:50 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 12:38 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Laura Richmond, Jerry TerBush, Rachelle TerBush, Amanda Wenzlick and Ryan Wenzlick. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 01/14/2019 12:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett Tetil, et al v. Juniata Township, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUNIATA TOWNSHIP PLANNING COMMISSION
Represented By: Heidi D. Hudson
Represented By: Amy Sitner Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUNIATA TOWNSHIP ZONING BOARD OF APPEALS
Represented By: Heidi D. Hudson
Represented By: Amy Sitner Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUNIATA TOWNSHIP
Represented By: Heidi D. Hudson
Represented By: Amy Sitner Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURA RICHMOND
Represented By: Joshua J. Nolan
Represented By: Kevin J. Roragen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RACHELLE TERBUSH
Represented By: Joshua J. Nolan
Represented By: Kevin J. Roragen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMANDA WENZLICK
Represented By: Joshua J. Nolan
Represented By: Kevin J. Roragen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RYAN WENZLICK
Represented By: Joshua J. Nolan
Represented By: Kevin J. Roragen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JERRY TERBUSH
Represented By: Joshua J. Nolan
Represented By: Kevin J. Roragen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRETT TETIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: PEGASUS WIND, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Peter Ettinger
Represented By: Ashley Grace Chrysler
Represented By: Jonathan E. Lauderbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?