General Medicine, P.C. v. Alex Azar, II
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellant: GENERAL MEDICINE, P.C.
Case Number: 19-1365
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 24, 2020 Summary General Medicine, P.C. v. Azar

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER filed by Mr. Barry M. Rosenbaum for General Medicine, P.C. communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: August 5 through 9, 2019; October 14 through 16, 2019; January 30 through February 21, 2020. Certificate of Service: 06/03/2019. [19-1365] (BMR) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:43 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Barry M. Rosenbaum for General Medicine, P.C. Certificate of Service:06/03/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-1365] (BMR) [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:32 AM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 12:16 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/03/2019;. appellee brief due 07/02/2019; (CB) [Entered: 04/23/2019 08:06 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Barry M. Rosenbaum for General Medicine, P.C.. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1365] (BMR) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:22 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Barry M. Rosenbaum for Appellant General Medicine, P.C.. Certificate of Service:04/22/2019. [19-1365] (BMR) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:20 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Barry M. Rosenbaum for Appellant General Medicine, P.C. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1365] (BMR) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:17 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant General Medicine, P.C. by Barry M. Rosenbaum. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1365] (BMR) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:14 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Alex M. Azar, II by Sarah Karpinen. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2019. [19-1365] (SPK) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:58 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 05/01/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:52 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:48 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:51 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant General Medicine, P.C.. Transcript needed: y. (CB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: General Medicine, P.C. v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR, II, Secretary of the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Sarah Pring Karpinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GENERAL MEDICINE, P.C.
Represented By: Barry M. Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?