Travis May v. Daniel Heyns, et al
Defendant / Appellee: POND, Resident Substance Abuse Treatment Counselor, THOMAS COMBS, Michigan Parole Board Member, HERNANDEZ, Resident Substance Abuse Treatment Counselor, JULIA HITCHINGHAM, Substance Abuse Section Manager, RILEY, Deputy Warden, MICHAEL EGEN, Michigan Parole Board Member, JANE DOE, 1-3, DANIEL H. HEYNS, Director MDOC and SONIA WARCHOCK, Michigan Parole Board Member
Plaintiff / Appellant: TRAVIS MAY
Case Number: 19-1596
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [ # 4 ]. Lawrence Raymond Przybysz's acknowledgement is due 08/02/2019. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:24 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Mr. Lawrence Raymond Przybysz, filed by Travis May. [4] ; District Court Docket Number: 2:15-cv-10785 ; Date NOA Filed: 05/28/2019 ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 07/02/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Judge Danny Reeves ; Hearing Dates: All transcripts ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. (RGF) [Entered: 07/02/2019 11:29 AM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/28/2019 10:49 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:59 PM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Travis May. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Travis May v. Daniel Heyns, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POND, Resident Substance Abuse Treatment Counselor
Represented By: Eric M. Jamison
Represented By: Michael Richard Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS COMBS, Michigan Parole Board Member
Represented By: Michael Richard Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HERNANDEZ, Resident Substance Abuse Treatment Counselor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIA HITCHINGHAM, Substance Abuse Section Manager
Represented By: Eric M. Jamison
Represented By: Michael Richard Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RILEY, Deputy Warden
Represented By: Eric M. Jamison
Represented By: Michael Richard Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL EGEN, Michigan Parole Board Member
Represented By: Michael Richard Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL H. HEYNS, Director MDOC
Represented By: Michael Richard Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONIA WARCHOCK, Michigan Parole Board Member
Represented By: Allan J. Soros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRAVIS MAY
Represented By: Travis May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?