USA, ex rel Joseph Odish, et al v. Northrop Grumman Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ex rel and MICHIGAN ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
Defendant / Appellee: LAWRENCE ELLISON, HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, INC., LARRY PAGE, MOOG, INC., ROBERT ROSEN, THOMAS BEAUDOIN, TWEDDLE GROUP, LLC, NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS, INC., TIMOTHY COOK, GOOGLE, LLC, MELISSA MORGENTHALER, WESLEY BUSH, ALPHABET, INC., ANDREW TWEDDLE, COGNITIVE CODE CORPORATION, INC., ERIC SCHMIDT, LESLIE SPRING, APPLE, INC., SALVATORE DIFAZIO, JOHN CARLIN, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, JOHN CHEN, GARY MORGENTHALER, VIRGINIA ROMETTY, CARL C. ICAHN, ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, PC, PAUL RICCI, JOHN BOURBEAU, ORACLE, INC., TODD MORGENTHALER, COGNIZANT TECH SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, MIMI CHEN, NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION and HOWARD S. FREDMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSEPH ODISH and CRANBROOK CAPITAL CONSULTING GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 19-1693
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER filed by Mr. Joseph G. Odish, II for Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC and Joseph Odish regarding FORMAL CORRESPONDENCE AND DECLARATION OF INTENTION TO FILE WRIT OF MANDAMUS FOR FEDERAL CRIME VICTIM STATUS AS WELL AS APPEAL IN THIS HISTORICAL CRIMINAL MATTER Certificate of Service: 08/17/2019. [19-1693] (JGO) [Entered: 08/17/2019 06:29 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Mr. Joseph G. Odish, II for Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC and Joseph Odish to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of Service: 07/22/2019. [19-1693] (JGO) [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:33 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Affidavit filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph G. Odish, II for Appellants Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC and Joseph Odish Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1693] (JGO) [Entered: 07/19/2019 06:10 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC and Joseph Odish by JOSEPH ODISH, Esq.. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1693] (JGO) [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:43 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ***DEFECTIVE FILING--SEE RE 7***APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Joseph Odish, Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC and USA by JOSEPH ODISH, ESQ.. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1693]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CAM] (JGO) [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:59 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 ***DEFECTIVE FILING--SEE RE 7***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Joseph Odish by JOSEPH ODISH, ESQ.. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1693]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CAM] (JGO) [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:52 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ***DEFECTIVE FILING--SEE RE 7***APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Alphabet, Inc., Apple, Inc., Thomas Beaudoin, John Bourbeau, Wesley Bush, John Carlin, John Chen, Mimi Chen, Cognitive Code Corporation, Inc., Cognizant Tech Solutions Corporation, Timothy Cook, Salvatore Difazio, Lawrence Ellison, Howard S. Fredman, Google, LLC, Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc., IBM, Carl C. Icahn, MOOG, Inc., Gary Morgenthaler, Melissa Morgenthaler, Todd Morgenthaler, Northrop Grumman Corporation, Nuance Communications, Inc., Oracle, Inc., Larry Page, Paul Ricci, Virginia Rometty, Rosen & Associates, PC, Mr. Robert Rosen, Eric Schmidt, Leslie Spring, Tweddle Group, LLC, Andrew Tweddle, Appellants Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC, Joseph Odish and Michigan Attorney General's Office and USA by Joseph Odish. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. [19-1693]--[Edited 07/19/2019 by CAM] (JGO) [Entered: 07/19/2019 12:35 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (CAM) [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:12 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:11 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Cranbrook Capital Consulting Group, LLC and Joseph Odish. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA, ex rel Joseph Odish, et al v. Northrop Grumman Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAWRENCE ELLISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY PAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOOG, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS BEAUDOIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWEDDLE GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOOGLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELISSA MORGENTHALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESLEY BUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALPHABET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW TWEDDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COGNITIVE CODE CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC SCHMIDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE SPRING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: APPLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SALVATORE DIFAZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN CARLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN CHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY MORGENTHALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIRGINIA ROMETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL C. ICAHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSEN & ASSOCIATES, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL RICCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BOURBEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ORACLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD MORGENTHALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COGNIZANT TECH SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIMI CHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOWARD S. FREDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH ODISH
Represented By: Joseph Odish
Represented By: Joseph G. Odish II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CRANBROOK CAPITAL CONSULTING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Joseph G. Odish II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ex rel
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHIGAN ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?