Ganiyu Jaiyeola v. Toyota Motor North America, et al
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., et al
Defendant / Appellee: AISAN INDUSTRY CO., LTD, a foreign corporation and TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, a foreign corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: GANIYU AYINIA JAIYEOLA
Case Number: 19-1918
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Transcript, [ # 12 ], has been filed in the District Court on 10/07/2019 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Kathy Jean Anderson ; Actual Number of Pages: 22 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; [19-1918] (KJA) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:53 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [ # 12 ] Transcript to be filed in district court by Kathy Jean Anderson by 11/04/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:56 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Kathy Jean Anderson, for transcript [ # 12 ] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 10/01/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 10/07/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 21 . [19-1918] (KJA) [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:50 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [ # 12 ]. Kathy Jean Anderson's acknowledgement is due 10/16/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:13 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Kathy Jean Anderson, filed by Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola. [12] ; District Court Docket Number: 1:17-cv-00562 ; Date NOA Filed: 08/12/2019 ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 09/27/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Ellen S. Carmody ; Hearing Dates: February 2, 2018 Plaintiff's motion to compel ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. (CAM) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:11 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY filed by Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola regarding response [ # 10 ]. Certificate of Service: 09/27/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 10/02/2019 03:02 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 FILED: Response to Plaintiff-Appellant's Pro Se Transcript Order Form. by Ms. Carmen M. Bickerdt for Aisan Industry Co., Ltd and Toyota Motor Corporation. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-1918] (CMB) [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:53 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola. (CAM) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:41 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Carmen M. Bickerdt for Appellees Aisan Industry Co., Ltd and Toyota Motor Corporation Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1918] (CMB) [Entered: 09/11/2019 01:52 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION filed by Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola regarding amended certificate of service for the appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of Service: 09/05/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:15 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Toyota Motor Corporation and Aisan Industry Co., Ltd by Carmen M. Bickerdt. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1918] (CMB) [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:29 PM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:33 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Appellant MOTION filed by Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 09/03/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:31 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Aisan Industry Co., Ltd and Toyota Motor Corporation by Robert A. Brundage. Certificate of Service: 09/04/2019. [19-1918] (RAB) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:58 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 11:54 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 11:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganiyu Jaiyeola v. Toyota Motor North America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AISAN INDUSTRY CO., LTD, a foreign corporation
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Robert Allen Brundage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION, a foreign corporation
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Robert Allen Brundage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GANIYU AYINIA JAIYEOLA
Represented By: Ganiyu Ayinia Jaiyeola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?