Leanne Walters, et al v. MI, et al
Defendant: STATE OF MICHIGAN, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: SARAH CHEESEMAN, individually and as next friend of her children A.C. and D.C., SHAYLA ROBINSON, individually and as next friend of her children C.R.1, C.R.2, and S.H., FLOYD BELL, individually and as next friend to his child M.B., ANGEL SCHMIDT, SUZAN EARLY, individually and as next friend to her children A.E. and C.R., JANAY COLEMAN-SANDERS, individually and as next friend of her child J.S., STARLA BARNEFSKE, individually and as next friend to her children C.W., H.W.and M.W., KYNA EDWARDS, individually and as next friend of her children C.G. and K.G., TALITA HILL, individually and as next friend of her children A.M.1, A.M.2, C.M., and D.M., MERRILL JOHNSON, individually and as next friend to her child C.M., TAMMY LOREN, individually and as next friend of her children D.L., E.L., I.L, and J.L., LEAH BURMEISTER, individually and as next friend to her child R.C., DEREK DAVIS, individually and as next friend of his children A.D., C.D.1 and C.D.2, TALISHA LOVETT, individually and next friend to her children A.L.2, A.L.2, A.L.3, C.L., E.L., G.L., J.L., and M.L., WILLIE DANIELS, individually and as next friend to his children D.D.1 and D.D.2, ASHLEY PRICE, individually and as next friend to her child K.W., TERI MATTHESS, individually and as next friend of her children J.D. and L.D., ALICIA KUYKENDALL, individually and as next friend of her children S.C.1 and S.C.2., TEARIA ANTHONY, individually and as next friend to her child J.N., SAMANTHA DENISON, individually and as next friend to her child N.T., ANGIELIC REED, individually and as next friend to her child L.R., LEANNE WALTERS, individually and as next friend of her children G.W.1, G.W.2,K.M., J.D., LOVIE WRIGHT, individually and as next friend of her children A.G., C.G., D.G., and R.G., TATYONNA HANDLEY, individually and as next friend to her child T.M., CRYSTAL HANDLEY, individually and as next friend of her children E.F.1, E.F.2, E.F.3, E.F.4 and T.P., BARBARA MITCHELL, individually and as next friend of her children C.B. and T.M., SHATOYA STARKS, individually and as next friend of her children T.P.1, T.P.2, and T.P.3., LONISE COULTER, individually and as next friend of her children M.S. and N.C., LEANDRE BEARD, individually and as next friend to her child J.B., DEBRA SOTO, individually and as next friend of her children E.S.1, E.S.2 and S.T., TRACEY GORDON, individually and as next friend to her children H.U. and S.B., AMANDA ENGELMANN, individually and as next friend of her children J.M.1, J.M.2, TOM ABNEY, individually and as next friend to his children L.A. and N.A., SHANTARA SPICER-JOHNSON, individually and as next friend to her child Z.J., ROBERT BROWN, individually and as next friend to his children A.B., H.B. and T.B., SHAWNTELE BROWN, individually and as next friend of her children B.T. and C.B., MELISSA KELLY, individually and as next friend to her child J.K., NILE HAWTHORNE, individually and as next friend of her children J.H. and N.H., JACKIE PUTNEY, individually and as next friend to her children B.G., J.L. and M.S., SHEIMYEE BROWN, individually and as next friend to her child K.B., MONIQUE STEVENSON, individually and as next friend of her children A.S. and D.S., OKNEEA HELLEMS, individually and as next friend of her children E.H.1, E.H.2, and E.H.3, CHALONDA JONES, individually and as next friend of her children J.C., J.J.1, J.J.2, and M.L., MONICA LOOMIS, individually and as next friend of her children J.Y., J.S., S.S., and S.Y., ROSALINDA GUERRERO, individually and as next friend of her children M.G.1 and M.G.2., JACQUELINE WEAVER, individually and as next friend to her child T.W., LAWANA HILLARD, individually and as next friend of her children A.L., R.M., T.M., and T.B., CARRIE GREEN, individually and as next friend to her child C.B., JOYCELAND FISHER, individually and as next friend of her children D.G. and P.P. and TRISHA HILL, individually and as next friend to her children J.H.1, J.H.2, W.W., and X.H.
Defendant / Appellant: RICHARD DALE SNYDER, former Governor, GRETCHEN WHITMER, Governor and ANDY DILLON, former State Treasurer
Not Classified By Court: In re: FLINT WATER CASES
Case Number: 19-2008
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Ms. Margaret Bettenhausen for Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer. Certificate of Service: 09/10/2019. [19-2008] (MB) [Entered: 09/10/2019 02:30 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Margaret Bettenhausen for Appellants Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer. Certificate of Service:09/09/2019. [19-2008] (MB) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:25 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer by Zachary C. Larsen. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-2008] (ZCL) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:17 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer by Richard S. Kuhl. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-2008] (RSK) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:13 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer by Nathan A. Gambill. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-2008] (NAG) [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:09 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer by Margaret A. Bettenhausen. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-2008] (MB) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:28 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:47 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Andy Dillon, Richard Dale Snyder and Gretchen Whitmer. Hearings held: y. (BLC) [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leanne Walters, et al v. MI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAH CHEESEMAN, individually and as next friend of her children A.C. and D.C.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHAYLA ROBINSON, individually and as next friend of her children C.R.1, C.R.2, and S.H.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FLOYD BELL, individually and as next friend to his child M.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANGEL SCHMIDT
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUZAN EARLY, individually and as next friend to her children A.E. and C.R.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANAY COLEMAN-SANDERS, individually and as next friend of her child J.S.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STARLA BARNEFSKE, individually and as next friend to her children C.W., H.W.and M.W.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KYNA EDWARDS, individually and as next friend of her children C.G. and K.G.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TALITA HILL, individually and as next friend of her children A.M.1, A.M.2, C.M., and D.M.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MERRILL JOHNSON, individually and as next friend to her child C.M.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAMMY LOREN, individually and as next friend of her children D.L., E.L., I.L, and J.L.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAH BURMEISTER, individually and as next friend to her child R.C.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEREK DAVIS, individually and as next friend of his children A.D., C.D.1 and C.D.2
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TALISHA LOVETT, individually and next friend to her children A.L.2, A.L.2, A.L.3, C.L., E.L., G.L., J.L., and M.L.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIE DANIELS, individually and as next friend to his children D.D.1 and D.D.2
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ASHLEY PRICE, individually and as next friend to her child K.W.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TERI MATTHESS, individually and as next friend of her children J.D. and L.D.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALICIA KUYKENDALL, individually and as next friend of her children S.C.1 and S.C.2.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TEARIA ANTHONY, individually and as next friend to her child J.N.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAMANTHA DENISON, individually and as next friend to her child N.T.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANGIELIC REED, individually and as next friend to her child L.R.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEANNE WALTERS, individually and as next friend of her children G.W.1, G.W.2,K.M., J.D.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LOVIE WRIGHT, individually and as next friend of her children A.G., C.G., D.G., and R.G.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TATYONNA HANDLEY, individually and as next friend to her child T.M.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CRYSTAL HANDLEY, individually and as next friend of her children E.F.1, E.F.2, E.F.3, E.F.4 and T.P.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BARBARA MITCHELL, individually and as next friend of her children C.B. and T.M.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHATOYA STARKS, individually and as next friend of her children T.P.1, T.P.2, and T.P.3.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LONISE COULTER, individually and as next friend of her children M.S. and N.C.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEANDRE BEARD, individually and as next friend to her child J.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBRA SOTO, individually and as next friend of her children E.S.1, E.S.2 and S.T.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRACEY GORDON, individually and as next friend to her children H.U. and S.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMANDA ENGELMANN, individually and as next friend of her children J.M.1, J.M.2
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TOM ABNEY, individually and as next friend to his children L.A. and N.A.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHANTARA SPICER-JOHNSON, individually and as next friend to her child Z.J.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT BROWN, individually and as next friend to his children A.B., H.B. and T.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHAWNTELE BROWN, individually and as next friend of her children B.T. and C.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELISSA KELLY, individually and as next friend to her child J.K.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NILE HAWTHORNE, individually and as next friend of her children J.H. and N.H.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACKIE PUTNEY, individually and as next friend to her children B.G., J.L. and M.S.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHEIMYEE BROWN, individually and as next friend to her child K.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MONIQUE STEVENSON, individually and as next friend of her children A.S. and D.S.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OKNEEA HELLEMS, individually and as next friend of her children E.H.1, E.H.2, and E.H.3
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHALONDA JONES, individually and as next friend of her children J.C., J.J.1, J.J.2, and M.L.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MONICA LOOMIS, individually and as next friend of her children J.Y., J.S., S.S., and S.Y.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSALINDA GUERRERO, individually and as next friend of her children M.G.1 and M.G.2.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JACQUELINE WEAVER, individually and as next friend to her child T.W.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAWANA HILLARD, individually and as next friend of her children A.L., R.M., T.M., and T.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARRIE GREEN, individually and as next friend to her child C.B.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOYCELAND FISHER, individually and as next friend of her children D.G. and P.P.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRISHA HILL, individually and as next friend to her children J.H.1, J.H.2, W.W., and X.H.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Jonathan S. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD DALE SNYDER, former Governor
Represented By: Margaret Bettenhausen
Represented By: Zachary Chad Larsen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GRETCHEN WHITMER, Governor
Represented By: Margaret Bettenhausen
Represented By: Zachary Chad Larsen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDY DILLON, former State Treasurer
Represented By: Margaret Bettenhausen
Represented By: Zachary Chad Larsen
Represented By: Richard S. Kuhl
Represented By: Nathan A. Gambill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: FLINT WATER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MICHIGAN, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?