Len Gamboa, et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff / Appellee: MICHAEL WILSON, JAMES RUSTON, CHRISTOPHER DIETERICK, VALUE ADDITIVES, LLC, DINA M. BADAGLIACCO, DON RECKER, VIC SPARANO, ALAN FLANDERS, DAVID BATES, LUTHER PALMER, CHRISTINA BOUYEA, PETE PETERSON, MICHAEL KING, LEN GAMBOA, NIKIAH NUDELL, JEFF RETMIER, JOHNNY TOLLY, ANDREAS ALSDORF, KEN RYAN, WILLIAM MCKNIGHT, BRUCE SZEPELAK, WILLIAM SPARKS, GLENN GOODROAD, JR., RICHARD CASTRO, KOHEN MARZOLF, BRIAN URBAN, JEFFREY MARTIN, EDWARD HATTEN, IVAN TELLEZ and PETE PETERSEN
Defendant / Appellant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Case Number: 19-2120
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of District Court Order filed: Granting in part and Denying in part (DC RE #132 ) Motion for Reconsideration of October 25, 2019 Order. (REO) [Entered: 11/22/2019 08:50 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Andreas Alsdorf, Dina M. Badagliacco, David Bates, Christina Bouyea, Richard Castro, Christopher Dieterick, Alan Flanders, Len Gamboa, Glenn Goodroad, Jr., Edward Hatten, Michael King, Jeffrey Martin, Kohen Marzolf, William McKnight, Nikiah Nudell, Luther Palmer, Pete Peterson, Don Recker, Jeff Retmier, James Ruston, Ken Ryan, Vic Sparano, William Sparks, Bruce Szepelak, Ivan Tellez, Johnny Tolly, Brian Urban, Value Additives, LLC and Michael Wilson by Steve W. Berman. Certificate of Service: 10/17/2019. [19-2120] (SWB) [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:32 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Andreas Alsdorf, Dina M. Badagliacco, David Bates, Christina Bouyea, Richard Castro, Christopher Dieterick, Alan Flanders, Len Gamboa, Glenn Goodroad, Jr., Edward Hatten, Michael King, Jeffrey Martin, Kohen Marzolf, William McKnight, Nikiah Nudell, Luther Palmer, Pete Peterson, Don Recker, Jeff Retmier, James Ruston, Ken Ryan, Vic Sparano, William Sparks, Bruce Szepelak, Ivan Tellez, Johnny Tolly, Brian Urban, Value Additives, LLC and Michael Wilson by E. Powell Miller. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2019. [19-2120] (EPM) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:40 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Andreas Alsdorf, Dina M. Badagliacco, David Bates, Christina Bouyea, Richard Castro, Christopher Dieterick, Alan Flanders, Len Gamboa, Glenn Goodroad, Jr., Edward Hatten, Michael King, Jeffrey Martin, Kohen Marzolf, William McKnight, Nikiah Nudell, Luther Palmer, Pete Peterson, Don Recker, Jeff Retmier, James Ruston, Ken Ryan, Vic Sparano, William Sparks, Bruce Szepelak, Ivan Tellez, Johnny Tolly, Brian Urban, Value Additives, LLC and Michael Wilson by Sharon S. Almonrode. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2019. [19-2120] (SSA) [Entered: 10/16/2019 04:34 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:48 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion for reconsideration filed in the district court on 9/10/2019 RE #106. (REO) [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:40 PM]
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ford Motor Company. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Len Gamboa, et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL WILSON
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES RUSTON
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER DIETERICK
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VALUE ADDITIVES, LLC
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DINA M. BADAGLIACCO
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DON RECKER
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIC SPARANO
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALAN FLANDERS
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID BATES
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUTHER PALMER
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTINA BOUYEA
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PETE PETERSON
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL KING
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEN GAMBOA
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NIKIAH NUDELL
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFF RETMIER
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHNNY TOLLY
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREAS ALSDORF
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEN RYAN
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM MCKNIGHT
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRUCE SZEPELAK
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM SPARKS
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GLENN GOODROAD, JR.
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD CASTRO
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KOHEN MARZOLF
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN URBAN
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFFREY MARTIN
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD HATTEN
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IVAN TELLEZ
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PETE PETERSEN
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Caroline Firth Bartlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Sharon Sue Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Joel A. Dewey
Represented By: Stephanie Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?