Tracy Micks-Harm v. William Nichols, et al
Plaintiff: TRACY CLARE MICKS-HARM, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL HENDRICKS, US ATTORNEY GENERAL, AARON OETJENS, MONROE COUNTY, MI, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN FOUNDATION, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN, JON LASOTA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BRENT CATHEY, MI STATE POLICE, ALAN J. ROBERTSON, M.D., BLUE CROSS COMPLETE OF MICHIGAN, DEREK LINDSAY, MICHAEL G. ROEHRIG, CARL CHRISTENSEN, M.D., SARAH BUCIAK, MIKE MERKLE, CHARLES F. MCCORMICK, MI BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION, MATTHEW J. SCHNEIDER, MICHAEL ZSENYUK, BRIAN ZAZADNY, MONROE BANK AND TRUST, MIKE GUZOWSKI, DANA NESSEL, WAYNE F. PRATT, UDAYAN MANDAVIA, BILL SCHUETTE, SHAWN KOTCH, CATHERINE WASKIEWICZ, TIMOTHY SPROULL, MICHAEL J. ST. JOHN, CHRISTENSEN RECOVERY SERVICES, STATE OF MICHIGAN, RAY KISONAS, TIMOTHY GATES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, TINA TODD, MANTIS, BRIAN BISHOP, DIANE YOUNG, JACK VITALE, DAN LOEPP, BLUE CARE NETWORK OF MICHIGAN, SCOTT BEARD, MIKE MCLAINE, MARC MOORE, CHRISTINE HICKS, JENNIFER MARIE FITZGERALD, CITY OF MONROE, MI POLICE DEPARTMENT, BLUECAID OF MICHIGAN, JOHN J. MULRONEY, JAMES STEWART, aka James Howell, VAUGHN HAFNER, JIM GALLAGHER, CITY OF MONROE, MI, DINA YOUNG, LAURIE J. MICHELSON, U.S. District Judge, JEFFREY YORKEY, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BRANDY R MCMILLION, WILLIAM MCMULLEN, R. STEVEN WHALEN, ALLISON ARNOLD, MICHIGAN AUTOMATED PRESCRIPTION SYSTEM, THOMAS SCOTT, TIMOTHY CHARLES ERICKSON, MBT FINANCIAL CORPORATION, WILLIAM CHAMULAK, SUSAN MEHREGAN, CHRIS MILLER, MONROE COUNTY, MI SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, LEON PEDELL, M.D., MICHIGAN ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING SYSTEM, I-PATIENT CARE, INC., HALEY WINANS, ROBERT BLAIR, TOM FARRELL, MONROE COUNTY MI, CIRCUIT COURT, DALE MALONE, ADAM ZIMMERMAN, DANIEL WHITE, WILLIAM PAUL NICHOLS, KIM GAEDEKE, JESSICA CHAFFIN, SEAN STREET, DIANE SILAS, DONALD BRADY, MONROE BANK & TRUST, MONROE COUNTY, MI, CIRCUIT COURT, FIRST MERCHANTS CORPORATION, fka MBT Financial Corporation, fka Monroe Bank & Trust, JESSICA D. CHAFFIN, MICHIGAN BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: JENNIFER L. SMITH
Case Number: 19-2207
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 28 Financial Affidavit filed by Party Jennifer L. Smith Certificate of Service: 11/02/2019. (CB) [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:27 AM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 Appellant MOTION filed by Jennifer L. Smith to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 11/02/2019. (CB) [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:26 AM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 26 LETTER SENT to all parties with new caption adding First Merchants Corp, [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2199, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2211, 19-2216, 19-2225, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:33 AM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER SENT to all parties , adding "Blue Cross Blue Shield" as appellee. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2199, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2211, 19-2216, 19-2225, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 07:57 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellees MBT Financial Corporation, Susan Mehregan, Monroe Bank & Trust and Thomas Scott Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2207] (MTK) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:12 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees MBT Financial Corporation, Susan Mehregan and Thomas Scott by Matthew T. Kemp. Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2207] (MTK) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:12 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Scott R. Knapp for Appellees Christensen Recovery Services and Dan Loepp Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2207] (SRK) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:59 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Care Network of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Brian Zazadny, Michael Zsenyuk, Carl Christensen, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Jim Gallagher, Dan Loepp and Christensen Recovery Services by Samantha A. Pattwell. Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2207] (SAP) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:34 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Care Network of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Brian Zazadny, Michael Zsenyuk, Carl Christensen, Christensen Recovery Services, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Jim Gallagher and Dan Loepp by Scott R. Knapp. Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2207] (SRK) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:27 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (CB) [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:40 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 Copy of District Court Order filed denying in forma pauperis. (CB) [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:39 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees MI, Bill Schuette, Dana Nessel, MI Bureau of Licensing and Regulation, Michigan Administrative Hearing System, MI State Police, Marc Moore, Michael J. St. John, Michigan Automated Prescription System, Kim Gaedeke, MANTIS, Sean Street, Scott Beard, Timothy Sproull, William McMullen, Vaughn Hafner, Dina Young, Jennifer Marie Fitzgerald, Timothy Charles Erickson and Catherine Waskiewicz by Kyla Barranco. Certificate of Service: 10/25/2019. [19-2207] (KLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 08:46 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Allison Arnold, Robert Blair, Jessica Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Mike McLaine, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Monroe County MI, Circuit Court, William Paul Nichols, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey by Lisa A. Anderson. Certificate of Service: 10/25/2019. [19-2207] (LAA) [Entered: 10/25/2019 08:31 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 **DOCUMENTS LOCKED, TO BE REFILED SEPARATELY** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Robert Blair, Jessica Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, William Paul Nichols, Allison Arnold, Mike McLaine, Monroe County MI, Circuit Court, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey in 19-2173--[Edited 10/24/2019 by CB] (LAA) [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:23 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Honorable Laurie J. Michelson and Honorable R. Steven Whalen by Anca I. Pop. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2207] (AIP) [Entered: 10/24/2019 01:32 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees MI, Bill Schuette, Dana Nessel, MI Bureau of Licensing and Regulation, Michigan Administrative Hearing System, MI State Police, Marc Moore, Michael J. St. John, Michigan Automated Prescription System, Kim Gaedeke, MANTIS, Sean Street, Scott Beard, Timothy Sproull, William McMullen, Vaughn Hafner, Dina Young, Jennifer Marie Fitzgerald, Timothy Charles Erickson and Catherine Waskiewicz by Mark E. Donnelly. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2207] (MED) [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:34 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brian Bishop, Christine Hicks, John J. Mulroney, William Chamulak, Tom Farrell, Mike Guzowski, Timothy Gates, Sarah Buciak, Matthew J. Schneider, Wayne F. Pratt, Brandy R McMillion, DEA, US Attorney General and USA by Bradley H. Darling. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2207] (BHD) [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:12 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert S. Iwrey for Appellee I-Patient Care, Inc. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2207] (RSI) [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:40 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees I-Patient Care, Inc. and Udayan Mandavia by Robert S. Iwrey. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2207] (RSI) [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:17 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2207] (CCH) [Entered: 10/22/2019 08:28 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens by John J. Gilloolly. Certificate of Service: 10/18/2019. [19-2207]***Filed on wrong case by mistake***--[Edited 10/18/2019 by BSM] (JJG) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:16 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens by John J. Gilloolly. Certificate of Service: 10/18/2019. [19-2207]***Filed on wrong case by mistake***--[Edited 10/18/2019 by BSM] (JJG) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:14 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Aaron Oetjens and Chris Miller by John J. Gillooly. Certificate of Service: 10/18/2019. [19-2207] (JJG) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:11 AM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens by Christian C. Huffman. Certificate of Service: 10/18/2019. [19-2207] (CCH) [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:37 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Update fee status change to pending in the district court. (CB) [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:35 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:32 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Jennifer L. Smith. Transcript needed: y. (CB) [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy Micks-Harm v. William Nichols, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL HENDRICKS
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AARON OETJENS
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY, MI
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN FOUNDATION
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON LASOTA
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENT CATHEY
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MI STATE POLICE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN J. ROBERTSON, M.D.
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS COMPLETE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK LINDSAY
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL G. ROEHRIG
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL CHRISTENSEN, M.D.
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARAH BUCIAK
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE MERKLE
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES F. MCCORMICK
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MI BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW J. SCHNEIDER
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL ZSENYUK
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN ZAZADNY
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE BANK AND TRUST
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE GUZOWSKI
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANA NESSEL
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAYNE F. PRATT
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UDAYAN MANDAVIA
Represented By: Robert S. Iwrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL SCHUETTE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAWN KOTCH
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHERINE WASKIEWICZ
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY SPROULL
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. ST. JOHN
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTENSEN RECOVERY SERVICES
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Represented By: Samantha Anne Pattwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAY KISONAS
Represented By: Danessa P. Watkins
Represented By: Michael L. Resis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY GATES
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TINA TODD
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANTIS
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN BISHOP
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK VITALE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN LOEPP
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Represented By: Samantha Anne Pattwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CARE NETWORK OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT BEARD
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE MCLAINE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARC MOORE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE HICKS
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER MARIE FITZGERALD
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MONROE, MI POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUECAID OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN J. MULRONEY
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES STEWART, aka James Howell
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VAUGHN HAFNER
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM GALLAGHER
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MONROE, MI
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DINA YOUNG
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURIE J. MICHELSON, U.S. District Judge
Represented By: Anca Iulia Pop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY YORKEY
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDY R MCMILLION
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM MCMULLEN
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. STEVEN WHALEN
Represented By: Anca Iulia Pop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLISON ARNOLD
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHIGAN AUTOMATED PRESCRIPTION SYSTEM
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS SCOTT
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY CHARLES ERICKSON
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MBT FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM CHAMULAK
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN MEHREGAN
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS MILLER
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY, MI SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEON PEDELL, M.D.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHIGAN ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING SYSTEM
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: I-PATIENT CARE, INC.
Represented By: Robert S. Iwrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HALEY WINANS
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT BLAIR
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOM FARRELL
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY MI, CIRCUIT COURT
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALE MALONE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM ZIMMERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL WHITE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM PAUL NICHOLS
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM GAEDEKE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA CHAFFIN
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN STREET
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANE SILAS
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD BRADY
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE BANK & TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY, MI, CIRCUIT COURT
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST MERCHANTS CORPORATION, fka MBT Financial Corporation, fka Monroe Bank & Trust
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA D. CHAFFIN
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHIGAN BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Represented By: Samantha Anne Pattwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY CLARE MICKS-HARM, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER L. SMITH
Represented By: Jennifer L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?