Tracy Micks-Harm, et al v. William Nichols, et al
Plaintiff: TRACY CLARE MICKS-HARM, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL HENDRICKS, US ATTORNEY GENERAL, AARON OETJENS, MONROE COUNTY, MI, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN FOUNDATION, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN, JON LASOTA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BRENT CATHEY, MI STATE POLICE, ALAN J. ROBERTSON, M.D., BLUE CROSS COMPLETE OF MICHIGAN, DEREK LINDSAY, MICHAEL G. ROEHRIG, CARL CHRISTENSEN, M.D., SARAH BUCIAK, MIKE MERKLE, CHARLES F. MCCORMICK, MI BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION, MATTHEW J. SCHNEIDER, MICHAEL ZSENYUK, BRIAN ZAZADNY, MONROE BANK AND TRUST, MIKE GUZOWSKI, DANA NESSEL, WAYNE F. PRATT, UDAYAN MANDAVIA, BILL SCHUETTE, SHAWN KOTCH, CATHERINE WASKIEWICZ, TIMOTHY SPROULL, MICHAEL J. ST. JOHN, CHRISTENSEN RECOVERY SERVICES, STATE OF MICHIGAN, RAY KISONAS, TIMOTHY GATES, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, TINA TODD, MANTIS, BRIAN BISHOP, DIANE YOUNG, JACK VITALE, DAN LOEPP, BLUE CARE NETWORK OF MICHIGAN, SCOTT BEARD, MIKE MCLAINE, MARC MOORE, CHRISTINE HICKS, JENNIFER MARIE FITZGERALD, CITY OF MONROE, MI POLICE DEPARTMENT, BLUECAID OF MICHIGAN, JOHN J. MULRONEY, JAMES STEWART, aka James Howell, VAUGHN HAFNER, JIM GALLAGHER, CITY OF MONROE, MI, DINA YOUNG, LAURIE J. MICHELSON, U.S. District Judge, JEFFREY YORKEY, BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BRANDY R MCMILLION, WILLIAM MCMULLEN, R. STEVEN WHALEN, ALLISON ARNOLD, MICHIGAN AUTOMATED PRESCRIPTION SYSTEM, THOMAS SCOTT, TIMOTHY CHARLES ERICKSON, MBT FINANCIAL CORPORATION, WILLIAM CHAMULAK, SUSAN MEHREGAN, CHRIS MILLER, MONROE COUNTY, MI SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, LEON PEDELL, M.D., MICHIGAN ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING SYSTEM, I-PATIENT CARE, INC., HALEY WINANS, ROBERT BLAIR, TOM FARRELL, MONROE COUNTY MI, CIRCUIT COURT, DALE MALONE, ADAM ZIMMERMAN, DANIEL WHITE, WILLIAM PAUL NICHOLS, KIM GAEDEKE, JESSICA CHAFFIN, SEAN STREET, DIANE SILAS, DONALD BRADY, MONROE BANK & TRUST, MONROE COUNTY, MI, CIRCUIT COURT, FIRST MERCHANTS CORPORATION, fka MBT Financial Corporation, fka Monroe Bank & Trust, JESSICA D. CHAFFIN, MICHIGAN BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION and CHARLES F. MCCORMICK, IV
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL SMALLWOOD, for Heidi Smallwood
Case Number: 19-2237
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 57 LETTER filed by Mr. Lawrence J. Acker for Leon Pedell in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 notifying they will not be filing an appellee brief. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LJA) [Entered: 11/06/2020 01:17 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 56 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Leon Pedell in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 by Lawrence J. Acker. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LJA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:46 PM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 55 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - FORM IS BLANK - Counsel is instructed to refile a completed form*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Leon Pedell in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 by Lawrence J. Acker. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] --[Edited 11/04/2020 by LAJ] (LJA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 10:32 AM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 54 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Kyla L Barranco for Scott Beard, Timothy Charles Erickson, Jennifer Marie Fitzgerald, Kim Gaedeke, Vaughn Hafner, MANTIS, William McMullen, MI State Police, Michigan Administrative Hearing System, Michigan Automated Prescription System, Michigan Bureau of Licensing and Regulation, Marc Moore, Dana Nessel, Bill Schuette, Timothy Sproull, Michael J. St. John, MI, Sean Street, Catherine Waskiewicz and Dina Young in 19-2173, Ms. Kyla L Barranco for Marc Moore, Sean Street, Scott Beard, Timothy Sproull, William McMullen, Vaughn Hafner, Dina Young, Bill Schuette, Jennifer Marie Fitzgerald, Timothy Charles Erickson, Catherine Waskiewicz, Michael J. St. John, Michigan Administrative Hearing System, Michigan Automated Prescription System, Kim Gaedeke, Michigan Bureau of Licensing and Regulation, MANTIS, MI State Police, Dana Nessel and MI in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (KLB) [Entered: 10/21/2020 01:17 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 53 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for First Merchants Corporation, Susan Mehregan and Thomas Scott in 19-2173, Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Susan Mehregan, Thomas Scott and First Merchants Corporation in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (MTK) [Entered: 10/21/2020 09:29 AM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 52 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Anca Iulia Pop for Honorable Laurie J. Michelson and Honorable R. Steven Whalen in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (AIP) [Entered: 10/21/2020 09:12 AM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 51 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Bradley H. Darling for Attorney General of The United States of America, Brian Bishop, Sarah Buciak, William Chamulak, DEA, Tom Farrell, Timothy Gates, Mike Guzowski, Christine Hicks, Brandy R McMillion, John J. Mulroney, Wayne F. Pratt, Matthew J. Schneider and USA in 19-2173, Mr. Bradley H. Darling for Brian Bishop, Christine Hicks, John J. Mulroney, William Chamulak, Tom Farrell, Mike Guzowski, Timothy Gates, Sarah Buciak, Haley Winans, Matthew J. Schneider, Wayne F. Pratt, Brandy R McMillion, Michael Hendricks, DEA, Attorney General of The United States of America and USA in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (BHD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 09:09 AM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 50 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Blue Care Network of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Carl Christensen, Jim Gallagher, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Brian Zazadny and Michael Zsenyuk in 19-2173, Mr. Phillip J. DeRosier for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Care Network of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Carl Christensen, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, Jim Gallagher, Brian Zazadny, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Michael Zsenyuk, James Stewart and Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (PJD) [Entered: 10/21/2020 08:08 AM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 49 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert S. Iwrey for I-Patient Care, Inc. and Udayan Mandavia in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, Mr. Robert S. Iwrey for I-Patient Care, Inc. in 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (RSI) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:13 PM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 48 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Michael Hendricks in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 by Bradley Darling. Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (BHD) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:00 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 47 FILED: Certificate of Service by Ms. Lisa A. Anderson for Allison Arnold, Robert Blair, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Mike McLaine, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court, William Paul Nichols, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey in 19-2173, Ms. Lisa A. Anderson for William Paul Nichols, Robert Blair, Jon Lasota, Mike McLaine, Tina Todd, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jack Vitale, Daniel White, Allison Arnold, Jeffrey Yorkey, Michael G. Roehrig, Dale Malone, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department and Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/19/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAA) [Entered: 10/19/2020 02:44 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 46 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Lisa A. Anderson for Allison Arnold, Robert Blair, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Mike McLaine, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court, William Paul Nichols, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey in 19-2173, Ms. Lisa A. Anderson for William Paul Nichols, Robert Blair, Jon Lasota, Mike McLaine, Tina Todd, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jack Vitale, Daniel White, Allison Arnold, Jeffrey Yorkey, Michael G. Roehrig, Dale Malone, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department and Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/19/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAA) [Entered: 10/19/2020 01:44 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 45 CORRECTED APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, IV, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens in 19-2173, Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Aaron Oetjens, Mike Merkle, Donald Brady, Chris Miller, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Brent Cathey and Charles F. McCormick, IV in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237.. Certificate of Service: 10/15/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CCH) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:41 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 44 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for City of Monroe, MI, Shawn Kotch, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Derek Lindsay, Aaron Oetjens, Mike Merkle, Donald Brady, Chris Miller and Charles F. McCormick, IV because the Designation of Relevant District Court Documents is missing. Corrected brief due: 10/19/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAJ) [Entered: 10/15/2020 10:50 AM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 43 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE CORRECTION LETTER BELOW*** APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, IV, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens in 19-2173, Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Aaron Oetjens, Mike Merkle, Donald Brady, Chris Miller, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Brent Cathey and Charles F. McCormick, IV in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 10/14/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237]--[Edited 10/15/2020 by LAJ] (CCH) [Entered: 10/14/2020 11:18 AM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 42 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Allison Arnold, Robert Blair, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Mike McLaine, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court, William Paul Nichols, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, Daniel White, Jeffrey Yorkey and Michael G. Roehrig in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 by Lisa A. Anderson. Certificate of Service: 10/02/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAA) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:36 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEFING LETTER SENT sua sponte resetting the pro se briefing schedule: appellant briefs now due 09/21/2020 for cases 19-2207 and 19-2226; appellee briefs now due 10/21/2020 for all cases. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAJ) [Entered: 09/03/2020 01:18 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 39 AMENDED APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Care Network of Michigan, Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Christensen Recovery Services, Carl Christensen, Jim Gallagher, Dan Loepp, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Brian Zazadny and Michael Zsenyuk in 19-2182, 19-2173, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 by Phillip J. DeRosier. (Amended to include Blue Cross Blue Shield Association.) Certificate of Service: 08/19/2020. [19-2182, 19-2173, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (PJD) [Entered: 08/19/2020 02:24 PM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 38 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellees' motions to extend time to file their briefs [ # 36 ] [ # 35 ] [ # 34 ] [ # 33 ] and clarifying and/or resetting the pro se briefing schedule accordingly: Appellant briefs have been filed in cases 19-2173, 19-2228, and 19-2237. Appellant briefs still due 08/20/2020 for cases 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, and 19-2227. All appellee briefs now due 09/22/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAJ) [Entered: 08/14/2020 01:05 PM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION filed by Mr. Robert S. Iwrey for I-Patient Care, Inc. and Udayan Mandavia in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, Mr. Robert S. Iwrey for I-Patient Care, Inc. in 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/14/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (RSI) [Entered: 08/14/2020 10:16 AM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION filed by Ms. Lisa A. Anderson for Allison Arnold, Robert Blair, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Mike McLaine, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court, William Paul Nichols, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey in 19-2173, Ms. Lisa A. Anderson for William Paul Nichols, Robert Blair, Jon Lasota, Mike McLaine, Tina Todd, Jessica D. Chaffin, Jack Vitale, Daniel White, Allison Arnold, Jeffrey Yorkey, Michael G. Roehrig, Dale Malone, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department and Monroe County, MI, Circuit Court in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/14/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (LAA) [Entered: 08/14/2020 10:15 AM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION filed by Ms. Anca Iulia Pop for Honorable Laurie J. Michelson and Honorable R. Steven Whalen in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/14/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (AIP) [Entered: 08/14/2020 09:51 AM]
August 14, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION filed by Mr. Bradley H. Darling for Attorney General of The United States of America, Brian Bishop, Sarah Buciak, William Chamulak, DEA, Tom Farrell, Timothy Gates, Mike Guzowski, Christine Hicks, Brandy R McMillion, John J. Mulroney, Wayne F. Pratt, Matthew J. Schneider and USA in 19-2173, Mr. Bradley H. Darling for Brian Bishop, Christine Hicks, John J. Mulroney, William Chamulak, Tom Farrell, Mike Guzowski, Timothy Gates, Sarah Buciak, Haley Winans, Matthew J. Schneider, Wayne F. Pratt, Brandy R McMillion, Michael Hendricks, DEA, Attorney General of The United States of America and USA in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/14/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (BHD) [Entered: 08/14/2020 09:47 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 32 ***MOTION LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THEIR BRIEF*** MOTION filed by Ms. Anca Iulia Pop for Honorable Laurie J. Michelson and Honorable R. Steven Whalen in 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 to consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237. Certificate of Service: 08/13/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237]--[Edited 08/14/2020 by LAJ] (AIP) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:56 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 31 ***MOTION LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS A MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE THEIR BRIEF*** MOTION filed by Mr. Bradley H. Darling for Attorney General of The United States of America, Brian Bishop, Sarah Buciak, William Chamulak, DEA, Tom Farrell, Timothy Gates, Mike Guzowski, Christine Hicks, Brandy R McMillion, John J. Mulroney, Wayne F. Pratt, Matthew J. Schneider and USA in 19-2173, Mr. Bradley H. Darling for Brian Bishop, Christine Hicks, John J. Mulroney, William Chamulak, Tom Farrell, Mike Guzowski, Timothy Gates, Sarah Buciak, Haley Winans, Matthew J. Schneider, Wayne F. Pratt, Brandy R McMillion, Michael Hendricks, DEA, Attorney General of The United States of America and USA in 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237 to consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-2173, 19-2228, 19-2237, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227. Certificate of Service: 08/13/2020. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237]--[Edited 08/14/2020 by LAJ] (BHD) [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:52 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 30 The case manager for this case is now: Laura A. Jones [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (RB) [Entered: 07/30/2020 07:34 AM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Michael Smallwood Certificate of Service:07/20/2020. Argument Request: not received. (CLB) [Entered: 07/27/2020 09:26 AM]
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER filed to consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-2182/2207/2209/2226/2227. These cases will be consolidted for submission with previously consolidated cases 19-2173/2228/2237. [19-2182, 19-2173, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CLB) [Entered: 07/08/2020 09:07 AM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Care Network of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Brian Zazadny, Michael Zsenyuk, Carl Christensen, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Jim Gallagher, Dan Loepp and Christensen Recovery Services by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 06/11/2020. [19-2237] (PJD) [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:10 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/24/2020;. appellee brief due 08/26/2020;. [19-2173, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CLB) [Entered: 06/11/2020 08:50 AM]
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER filed to consolidate for briefing and submission cases 19-2173/2228/2237. [19-2173, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CLB) [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:09 AM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Scott R. Knapp for Appellees Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Christensen Recovery Services and Dan Loepp Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-2237] (SRK) [Entered: 11/05/2019 04:00 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Care Network of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Brian Zazadny, Michael Zsenyuk, Carl Christensen, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Jim Gallagher, Dan Loepp and Christensen Recovery Services by Scott R. Knapp. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-2237] (SRK) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:58 PM]
November 5, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutal Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Care Network of Michigan, Bluecaid of Michigan, Blue Cross Complete of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Brian Zazadny, Michael Zsenyuk, Carl Christensen, Alan J. Robertson, Diane Silas, James Stewart, Jim Gallagher, Dan Loepp and Christensen Recovery Services by Samantha A. Pattwell. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2019. [19-2237] (SAP) [Entered: 11/05/2019 03:37 PM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER SENT to all parties with new caption adding First Merchants Corp, [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2199, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2211, 19-2216, 19-2225, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 08:33 AM]
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER SENT to all parties , adding "Blue Cross Blue Shield" as appellee. [19-2173, 19-2182, 19-2199, 19-2207, 19-2209, 19-2211, 19-2216, 19-2225, 19-2226, 19-2227, 19-2228, 19-2237] (CB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 07:57 AM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 CORRESPONDENCE: Letter from appellant regarding party Blue Cross Blue Shield. by Michael Smallwood. (CB) [Entered: 11/04/2019 02:54 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellees MBT Financial Corporation, Susan Mehregan, Monroe Bank & Trust and Thomas Scott Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2237] (MTK) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:04 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees MBT Financial Corporation, Susan Mehregan and Thomas Scott by Matthew T. Kemp. Certificate of Service: 10/31/2019. [19-2237] (MTK) [Entered: 10/31/2019 05:03 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Allison Arnold, Robert Blair, Jessica Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Mike McLaine, Monroe County MI, Circuit Court, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, William Paul Nichols, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey by Lisa A. Anderson. Certificate of Service: 10/25/2019. [19-2237] (LAA) [Entered: 10/25/2019 03:22 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Bill Schuette, Dana Nessel, MI Bureau of Licensing and Regulation, Michigan Administrative Hearing System, MI State Police, Marc Moore, Michael J. St. John, Michigan Automated Prescription System, Kim Gaedeke, MANTIS, Sean Street, Scott Beard, Timothy Sproull, William McMullen, Vaughn Hafner, Jennifer Marie Fitzgerald, Timothy Charles Erickson, Catherine Waskiewicz, MI and Dina Young by Kyla Barranco. Certificate of Service: 10/25/2019. [19-2237] (KLB) [Entered: 10/25/2019 10:03 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 **DOCUMENTS LOCKED, TO BE REFILED SEPARATELY** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Robert Blair, Jessica Chaffin, Jon Lasota, Dale Malone, Monroe County, MI, Monroe County, MI Sheriff's Department, Michael G. Roehrig, Tina Todd, Jack Vitale, William Paul Nichols, Allison Arnold, Mike McLaine, Monroe County MI, Circuit Court, Daniel White and Jeffrey Yorkey in 19-2173--[Edited 10/24/2019 by CB] (LAA) [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:23 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees MI, Bill Schuette, Dana Nessel, MI Bureau of Licensing and Regulation, Michigan Administrative Hearing System, MI State Police, Marc Moore, Michael J. St. John, Michigan Automated Prescription System, Kim Gaedeke, MANTIS, Sean Street, Scott Beard, Timothy Sproull, William McMullen, Vaughn Hafner, Dina Young, Jennifer Marie Fitzgerald, Timothy Charles Erickson and Catherine Waskiewicz by Mark E. Donnelly. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2237] (MED) [Entered: 10/24/2019 02:28 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Honorable Laurie J. Michelson and Honorable R. Steven Whalen by Anca I. Pop. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2237] (AIP) [Entered: 10/24/2019 01:51 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brian Bishop, Christine Hicks, John J. Mulroney, William Chamulak, Tom Farrell, Mike Guzowski, Timothy Gates, Sarah Buciak, Matthew J. Schneider, Wayne F. Pratt, Brandy R McMillion, DEA, US Attorney General and USA by Bradley H. Darling. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2237] (BHD) [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:56 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-2237] (CCH) [Entered: 10/24/2019 09:24 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 **LOCKED, INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED**CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christian Charles Huffman for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens Certificate of Service: 10/23/2019. [19-2237]--[Edited 10/23/2019 by CB] (CCH) [Entered: 10/23/2019 02:46 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert S. Iwrey for Appellee I-Patient Care, Inc. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2237] (RSI) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:36 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees I-Patient Care, Inc. and Udayan Mandavia by Robert S. Iwrey. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2237] (RSI) [Entered: 10/22/2019 03:35 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens by John J. Gillooly. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2237] (JJG) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:52 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Donald Brady, Brent Cathey, City of Monroe, MI, City of Monroe, MI Police Department, Shawn Kotch, Derek Lindsay, Charles F. McCormick, Mike Merkle, Chris Miller and Aaron Oetjens by Christian C. Huffman. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2019. [19-2237] (CCH) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:49 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CB) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:09 PM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Michael Smallwood. Transcript needed: y. (CB) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tracy Micks-Harm, et al v. William Nichols, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL HENDRICKS
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AARON OETJENS
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY, MI
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN FOUNDATION
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON LASOTA
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENT CATHEY
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MI STATE POLICE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAN J. ROBERTSON, M.D.
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS COMPLETE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK LINDSAY
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL G. ROEHRIG
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL CHRISTENSEN, M.D.
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARAH BUCIAK
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE MERKLE
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES F. MCCORMICK
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MI BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW J. SCHNEIDER
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL ZSENYUK
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN ZAZADNY
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE BANK AND TRUST
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE GUZOWSKI
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANA NESSEL
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAYNE F. PRATT
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UDAYAN MANDAVIA
Represented By: Robert S. Iwrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL SCHUETTE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAWN KOTCH
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHERINE WASKIEWICZ
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY SPROULL
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL J. ST. JOHN
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTENSEN RECOVERY SERVICES
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Samantha Anne Pattwell
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAY KISONAS
Represented By: Danessa P. Watkins
Represented By: Michael L. Resis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY GATES
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TINA TODD
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANTIS
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN BISHOP
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK VITALE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAN LOEPP
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Samantha Anne Pattwell
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CARE NETWORK OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT BEARD
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE MCLAINE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARC MOORE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE HICKS
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER MARIE FITZGERALD
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MONROE, MI POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUECAID OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN J. MULRONEY
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES STEWART, aka James Howell
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VAUGHN HAFNER
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM GALLAGHER
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF MONROE, MI
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DINA YOUNG
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURIE J. MICHELSON, U.S. District Judge
Represented By: Anca Iulia Pop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY YORKEY
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN MUTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDY R MCMILLION
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM MCMULLEN
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. STEVEN WHALEN
Represented By: Anca Iulia Pop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLISON ARNOLD
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHIGAN AUTOMATED PRESCRIPTION SYSTEM
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS SCOTT
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY CHARLES ERICKSON
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MBT FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM CHAMULAK
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN MEHREGAN
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS MILLER
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY, MI SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEON PEDELL, M.D.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHIGAN ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING SYSTEM
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: I-PATIENT CARE, INC.
Represented By: Robert S. Iwrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HALEY WINANS
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT BLAIR
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOM FARRELL
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY MI, CIRCUIT COURT
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALE MALONE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM ZIMMERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL WHITE
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM PAUL NICHOLS
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM GAEDEKE
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA CHAFFIN
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN STREET
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANE SILAS
Represented By: Stefanie R. Phillips
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD BRADY
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE BANK & TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MONROE COUNTY, MI, CIRCUIT COURT
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST MERCHANTS CORPORATION, fka MBT Financial Corporation, fka Monroe Bank & Trust
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA D. CHAFFIN
Represented By: Daniel A. Klemptner
Represented By: Lisa A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHIGAN BUREAU OF LICENSING AND REGULATION
Represented By: Mark E. Donnelly
Represented By: Kyla L. Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bradley H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Samantha Anne Pattwell
Represented By: Scott R. Knapp
Represented By: Phillip J. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES F. MCCORMICK, IV
Represented By: Christian Charles Huffman
Represented By: John J. Gillooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL SMALLWOOD, for Heidi Smallwood
Represented By: Michael Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY CLARE MICKS-HARM, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?