UAW International, et al v. TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: KIM TASKILA, UAW INTERNATIONAL, MARTIN LAMER, RONALD GARDNER, for themselves and others similarly situated and JOHN YASSO
Defendant / Appellee: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Case Number: 19-2262
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST BRIEF filed by Mr. Gregory Valentin Mersol for TRW Automotive U.S. LLC in 19-2252, 19-2262 Certificate of Service:12/26/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-2252, 19-2262] (GVM) [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:38 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 12/26/2019; second brief due 01/27/2020; third brief due 02/26/2020. [19-2252, 19-2262] (KSF) [Entered: 12/18/2019 01:56 PM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER SENT to Mr. Gregory Valentin Mersol for TRW Automotive U.S. LLC and Mr. William Arthur Wertheimer, Jr. for UAW International, Martin Lamer, John Yasso, Kim Taskila and Ronald Gardner in 19-2252 and 19-2262, regarding amended case caption for a cross appeal. [19-2252, 19-2262] (KSF) [Entered: 12/18/2019 11:56 AM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/26/2019; appellee brief due 01/27/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 11/15/2019 09:54 AM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee TRW Automotive U.S. LLC by Gregory V. Mersol. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2019. [19-2262] (GVM) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:55 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Gilbert Brosky for Appellee TRW Automotive U.S. LLC Certificate of Service: 11/07/2019. [19-2262] (GB) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:41 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee TRW Automotive U.S. LLC by Gilbert Brosky. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2019. [19-2262] (GB) [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:54 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. William Arthur Wertheimer, Jr. for Appellants Ronald Gardner, Martin Lamer, Kim Taskila, UAW International and John Yasso. Certificate of Service:10/29/2019. [19-2262] (WAW) [Entered: 10/29/2019 04:44 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ronald Gardner, Martin Lamer, Kim Taskila, UAW International, John Yasso and Appellee TRW Automotive U.S. LLC by William Wertheimer. Certificate of Service: 10/29/2019. [19-2262] (WAW) [Entered: 10/29/2019 04:43 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:36 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Ronald Gardner, Martin Lamer, Kim Taskila, UAW International and John Yasso. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UAW International, et al v. TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIM TASKILA
Represented By: William Arthur Wertheimer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UAW INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: William Arthur Wertheimer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTIN LAMER
Represented By: William Arthur Wertheimer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD GARDNER, for themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: William Arthur Wertheimer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN YASSO
Represented By: William Arthur Wertheimer Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?