Little Caesar Enterprises, et al v. Little Caesars ASF Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellant: LITTLE CAESARS ASF, INC., BEVERLY S. KNOX, LITTLE CAESARS ASF CORPORATION, SOUTHERN UTAH PIZZA SERVICE, INC. and ROLLIE ALAN KNOX
Plaintiff / Appellee: LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC., LC TRADEMARKS, INC. and BLUE LINE FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTION, INC.
Case Number: 19-2335
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Russell S. Walker for Appellants Beverly S. Knox, Rollie Alan Knox, Little Caesars ASF Corporation, Little Caesars ASF, Inc. and Southern Utah Pizza Service, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2019. [19-2335] (RSW) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:48 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Beverly S. Knox, Rollie Alan Knox, Little Caesars ASF Corporation, Little Caesars ASF, Inc. and Southern Utah Pizza Service, Inc. by Russell S. Walker. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2019. [19-2335] (RSW) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:05 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert Louis Zisk for Appellees Blue Line Foodservice Distribution, Inc., LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2019. [19-2335] (RLZ) [Entered: 11/20/2019 11:36 AM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. and Blue Line Foodservice Distribution, Inc. by Justin L. Sallis. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2019. [19-2335] (JLS) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:49 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc., Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. and Blue Line Foodservice Distribution, Inc. by Robert L. Zisk. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2019. [19-2335] (RLZ) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:45 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:10 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:09 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:05 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Beverly S. Knox, Rollie Alan Knox, Little Caesars ASF Corporation, Little Caesars ASF, Inc. and Southern Utah Pizza Service, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 11/15/2019 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Little Caesar Enterprises, et al v. Little Caesars ASF Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LITTLE CAESARS ASF, INC.
Represented By: Russell S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BEVERLY S. KNOX
Represented By: Russell S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LITTLE CAESARS ASF CORPORATION
Represented By: Russell S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOUTHERN UTAH PIZZA SERVICE, INC.
Represented By: Russell S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROLLIE ALAN KNOX
Represented By: Russell S. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Represented By: Robert Louis Zisk
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LC TRADEMARKS, INC.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Represented By: Robert Louis Zisk
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BLUE LINE FOODSERVICE DISTRIBUTION, INC.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Represented By: Robert Louis Zisk
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?