James Radke v. Monroe County, MI, et al
Not Yet Classified: MICHELLE M. MARCERO, MITCHELL MCFADDEN, JAMES FRANCES RADKE, TINA TODD, TOD C. O'LONE, MONROE COUNTY, MI, JESSICA D. CHAFFIN, DAVID DELPIOMBO and CHIEF JUDGE JACK VITALE
Case Number: 19-2340
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 01/27/2020. second brief due 02/24/2020. third brief due 03/25/2020. [19-2331, 19-2340] (RLJ) [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:12 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Marcelyn A. Stepanski for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jessica D. Chaffin, David DelPiombo, Michelle M. Marcero, Mitchell McFadden, Monroe County, MI, Tod C. O'Lone, Tina Todd and Jack Vitale. Certificate of Service:12/16/2019. [19-2340] (MAS) [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:53 AM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. [19-2331, 19-2340] (MLB) [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:09 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Bajorek for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331, 19-2340 Certificate of Service: 12/04/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340] (DAB) [Entered: 12/04/2019 07:14 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO ADD CASE NO. 19-2340 TO THE COPORATE DISCLOSURE FORM ALONG WITH CASE NO. 19-2331 BEFORE REFILING IN BOTH CASES. CASE NO. 19-2331 AND CASE NO. 19-2340 SHOULD BE ON THE TOP OF THE FORM*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Bajorek for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331, 19-2340 Certificate of Service: 12/03/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340]--[Edited 12/03/2019 by MMP] (DAB) [Entered: 12/03/2019 10:39 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 ***LOCKED - THE DOCUMENT IS ACUTUALLY THE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES. COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE THE DOCUMENT IN CASE NO. 19-2331 ONLY USING THE CORRECT DOCKETING EVENT*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Bajorek for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331, 19-2340 Certificate of Service: 12/02/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340]--[Edited 12/03/2019 by MMP] (DAB) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:36 PM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331, 19-2340 by David A. Bajorek. Certificate of Service: 12/02/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340] (DAB) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:20 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jessica D. Chaffin, David DelPiombo, Michelle M. Marcero, Mitchell McFadden, Monroe County, MI, Tod C. O'Lone, Tina Todd and Jack Vitale in 19-2331, 19-2340 by Marcelyn A. Stepanski. Certificate of Service: 11/26/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340] (MAS) [Entered: 11/26/2019 11:33 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO FILE THE APPEARANCE IN CASE NO. 19-2340*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2340, 19-2331 by David A. Bajorek. Certificate of Service: 11/25/2019. [19-2340, 19-2331]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by MMP] (DAB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:58 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 ***LOCKED - FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE. NO REFILING IS NECESSARY*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Bajorek for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331, 19-2340 Certificate of Service: 11/25/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by MMP] (DAB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:56 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 ***LOCKED - FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE. NO REFILING IS NECESSARY*** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. David A. Bajorek for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331, 19-2340. Certificate of Service:11/25/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by MMP]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by MMP] (DAB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:52 PM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 ***LOCKED - FILE ONE APPEARANCE FOR BOTH CASES AND LIST BOTH CASE NUMBERS*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee James Frances Radke in 19-2331 by David A. Bajorek. [19-2331, 19-2340]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by MMP] (DAB) [Entered: 11/25/2019 04:48 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 ***LOCKED - COUNSEL ADVISED TO FILE ONE APPEARANCE FORM WITH BOTH CASE NUMBERS *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jessica D. Chaffin, David DelPiombo, Michelle M. Marcero, Mitchell McFadden, Monroe County, MI, Tod C. O'Lone, Tina Todd and Jack Vitale in 19-2331, 19-2340 by Marcelyn A. Stepanski. Certificate of Service: 11/21/2019. [19-2331, 19-2340]--[Edited 11/26/2019 by MMP] (MAS) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:51 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled for 12/09/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Robert Kaiser will include BOTH CA Nos. 19-2331 and 19-2340. [Please open original notice found on CA No. 19-2331 for important details and deadlines.] [19-2331, 19-2340] (LMR) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:14 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:11 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page [19-2340, 19-2331] (MMP) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:50 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Jessica D. Chaffin, David DelPiombo, Michelle M. Marcero, Mitchell McFadden, Monroe County, MI, Tod C. O'Lone, Tina Todd and Jack Vitale. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Radke v. Monroe County, MI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MICHELLE M. MARCERO
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MITCHELL MCFADDEN
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JAMES FRANCES RADKE
Represented By: David A. Bajorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TINA TODD
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TOD C. O'LONE
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MONROE COUNTY, MI
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: JESSICA D. CHAFFIN
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DAVID DELPIOMBO
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: CHIEF JUDGE JACK VITALE
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?