Ernest Kirk, et al v. Calhoun County, MI, et al
Defendant: C.M. YOUNG, acting in their individual capacity, all jointly and severally, B. LINCOLN, acting in their individual capacity, all jointly and severally, MATTHEW SAXTON, Sheriff, acting individually and in his official capacity, all jointly and severally, CALHOUN COUNTY, MI, a municipal corporation, all jointly and severally and GREG GAMMONS, Deputy, acting in his individual capacity, all jointly and severally
Plaintiff / Appellee: ERNEST KIRK and CLAUDIA KIRK
Defendant / Appellant: DEPUTY SPARKS and BRANDY EDMONDS, Sergeant, acting in her individual capacity, all jointly and severally
Case Number: 19-2456
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [12] Transcript to be filed in district court by Kathleen Sue Thomas by 02/18/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 01/17/2020 02:42 PM]
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas, for transcript [12] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 01/16/2020 ; Estimated completion date: 02/17/2020 ; Estimated number of pages: 58 . [19-2456] (KST) [Entered: 01/17/2020 02:32 PM]
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/17/2020 11:24 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [12]. Kathleen Sue Thomas's acknowledgement is due 01/16/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:22 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Kathleen Sue Thomas, filed by Ms. Marcelyn A. Stepanski for Brandy Edmonds and Sparks. [12] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 01/02/2020 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Honorable Paul L. Maloney ; Hearing Dates: November 19, 2019, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 01/02/2020. [19-2456] (MAS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:02 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Marcelyn A. Stepanski for Appellants Brandy Edmonds and Sparks Certificate of Service: 01/02/2020. [19-2456] (MAS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:55 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Marcelyn A. Stepanski for Appellants Brandy Edmonds and Sparks. Certificate of Service:01/02/2020. [19-2456] (MAS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:53 AM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Brandy Edmonds and Sparks by Marcelyn A. Stepanski. Certificate of Service: 01/02/2020. [19-2456] (MAS) [Entered: 01/02/2020 11:51 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION filed by Goodman Hurwitz & James that Nicholas Howard Klaus is no longer with firm. Certificate of Service: 12/19/2019. (RLJ) [Entered: 12/23/2019 03:23 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Ernest Kirk and Doctor Claudia Kirk by William H. Goodman. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2019. [19-2456] (WHG) [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:27 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Julie H. Hurwitz for Appellees Doctor Claudia Kirk and Mr. Ernest Kirk Certificate of Service: 12/20/2019. [19-2456] (JHH) [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:24 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Doctor Claudia Kirk and Mr. Ernest Kirk by Julie H. Hurwitz. Certificate of Service: 12/20/2019. [19-2456] (JHH) [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:23 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/16/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 12/20/2019 11:52 AM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 12/20/2019 11:50 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 11:01 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Brandy Edmonds and Sparks. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 12/19/2019 10:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernest Kirk, et al v. Calhoun County, MI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.M. YOUNG, acting in their individual capacity, all jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. LINCOLN, acting in their individual capacity, all jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW SAXTON, Sheriff, acting individually and in his official capacity, all jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALHOUN COUNTY, MI, a municipal corporation, all jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG GAMMONS, Deputy, acting in his individual capacity, all jointly and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERNEST KIRK
Represented By: Julie H. Hurwitz
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Nicholas Howard Klaus
Represented By: William H. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLAUDIA KIRK
Represented By: Julie H. Hurwitz
Represented By: Huwaida Arraf
Represented By: Nicholas Howard Klaus
Represented By: William H. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEPUTY SPARKS
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRANDY EDMONDS, Sergeant, acting in her individual capacity, all jointly and severally
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Represented By: Marcelyn A. Stepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?