Charles Cranfield v. State Farm Fire & Casualty

Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLES CRANFIELD, individually and on behalf of all other Ohio residents similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 19-3004
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER filed by Mr. Patrick J. Perotti for Charles Cranfield communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: February 25, 26, 27, 28 March 1, 5, 6, 7, 11, 13, 19, 20, 21, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 April 2, 26 May 1, 2, 3, 8, 10, 13, 14, 15, 16, 29. Certificate of Service: 01/31/2019. [19-3004] (PJP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:27 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:22 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/13/2019. appellee brief now due 04/12/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:39 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 01/28/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:35 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 The case manager for this case is now: Monica Page (RLJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:51 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Perotti for Appellant Charles Cranfield Certificate of Service: 01/16/2019. [19-3004] (PJP) [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:46 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Perotti for Appellant Charles Cranfield. Certificate of Service:01/16/2019. [19-3004] (PJP) [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:45 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Charles Cranfield by Patrick J. Perotti. Certificate of Service: 01/09/2019. [19-3004] (PJP) [Entered: 01/09/2019 07:44 PM]
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Heidi Dalenberg for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company Certificate of Service: 01/08/2019. [19-3004] (HD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 04:27 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Karl A. Bekeny. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2019. [19-3004] (KAB) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:36 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Benjamin C. Sasse'. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2019. [19-3004] (BCS) [Entered: 01/04/2019 11:33 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 01/28/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:07 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:03 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Jacob L. Kahn. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2019. [19-3004] (JK) [Entered: 01/03/2019 02:54 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2019. [19-3004] (JAC) [Entered: 01/03/2019 02:50 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Heidi Dalenberg. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2019. [19-3004] (HD) [Entered: 01/03/2019 02:46 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/11/2019; appellee brief due 03/13/2019. (RLJ) [Entered: 01/02/2019 12:02 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is now: Monica Page. (RLJ) [Entered: 01/02/2019 12:01 PM]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Charles Cranfield. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 01/02/2019 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Cranfield v. State Farm Fire & Casualty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES CRANFIELD, individually and on behalf of all other Ohio residents similarly situated
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Benjamin C. Sasse
Represented By: Heidi Dalenberg
Represented By: Karl A. Bekeny
Represented By: Jacob Kahn
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?