Murray Richelson v. Liberty Insurance Corporation

Defendant / Appellee: LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, other Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: MURRAY RICHELSON, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 19-3035
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:41 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Rodger L. Eckelberry for Appellee Liberty Insurance Corporation Certificate of Service: 02/01/2019. [19-3035] (RLE) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:43 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/08/2019. appellee brief now due 05/31/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:14 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER filed by Mr. Patrick J. Perotti for Murray Richelson communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: February 25, 26, 27, 28 March 1, 5, 6, 7, 11, 13, 19, 20, 21, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29 April 2, 26 May 1, 2, 3, 8, 10, 13, 14, 15, 16, 29. Certificate of Service: 01/31/2019. [19-3035] (PJP) [Entered: 01/31/2019 10:20 AM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER filed by Mr. Rodger L. Eckelberry for Liberty Insurance Corporation communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: March 12, 2019 March 13, 2019 May 1, 2019 May 2, 2019 May 3, 2019. Certificate of Service: 01/31/2019. [19-3035] (RLE) [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:13 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Perotti for Appellant Murray Richelson Certificate of Service: 01/30/2019. [19-3035] (PJP) [Entered: 01/30/2019 07:17 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Perotti for Appellant Murray Richelson. Certificate of Service:01/30/2019. [19-3035] (PJP) [Entered: 01/30/2019 07:16 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Murray Richelson by Patrick J. Perotti. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2019. [19-3035] (PJP) [Entered: 01/30/2019 10:04 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/05/2019; appellee brief due 04/04/2019 (MMP) [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:47 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Liberty Insurance Corporation by Rodger Eckelberry. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3035] (RLE) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:12 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/01/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:30 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:24 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:39 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Murray Richelson. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray Richelson v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, other Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MURRAY RICHELSON, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?