Warren K. Henness, et al v. Mike DeWine, et al
Plaintiff: BENNIE ADAMS
Defendant / Appellee: MIKE DEWINE, Governor, State of Ohio, UNKNOWN PHARMACIES, CHRISTOPHER LAROSE, UNKNOWN PHARMACISTS 1-100, DONALD MORGAN, Warden, STEPHEN GRAY, JOHN COLEMAN, Warden, Toledo Correctional Institution, UNKNOWN DRUG SUPPLIERS 1-25, RONALD ERDOS, Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, TIM SHOOP, Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Center, JOHN KASICH, EDWIN A. VOORHIES, Managing Director of Operations, ODRC, RICHARD THEODORE, Pharmacist, c/o ODRC, STUART HUDSON, Director, ODRC, ANONYMOUS EXECUTION TEAM MEMBERS 1-50, c/o Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, JOHN DOES 1-25, CHARLES BRADLEY, Warden, Franklin Medical Center and UNNAMED AND ANONYMOUS EXECUTION TEAM MEMBERS
Other: In re: OHIO EXECUTION PROTOCOL LITIGATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: WARREN K. HENNESS
Case Number: 19-3064
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 11, 2019 Summary In re: Ohio Execution Protocol Litigation
December 17, 2019 Summary In re Ohio Execution Protocol Litig.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness regarding Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule Certificate of Service: 03/19/2019. [19-3064] (ALB) [Entered: 03/19/2019 05:13 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness, regarding a motion, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness. Response from Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies Certificate of Service:03/18/2019. [19-3064] (BMF) [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:15 PM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness to extend time to file brief, to extend time Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule for all briefs. Certificate of Service: 03/15/2019. [19-3064] (ALB) [Entered: 03/15/2019 04:57 PM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies regarding Withdrawal of Hannah C. Wilson. Certificate of Service: 03/14/2019. [19-3064] (BMF) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:51 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 DEATH PENALTY BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 04/22/2019; appellee brief due 06/21/2019. (PJE) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:13 PM]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER filed: The motion for leave to file an oversized motion is GRANTED. The motion to stay the execution is DENIED without prejudice. The motion to expedite the briefing schedule is DENIED, and briefing will be set by separate letter in the normal fashion. Finally, the determination of whether to hear oral argument is reserved until after the completion of briefing. [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ]. Danny J. Boggs, Eugene E. Siler, Jr. and Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judges. (PJE) [Entered: 02/21/2019 01:07 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to stay execution date, [ # 6 ]; previously filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness. Response from Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies Certificate of Service:01/31/2019. [19-3064] (BMF) [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:20 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness regarding Henness's Motion for Stay of Execution, Expedited Briefing, and Oral Argument Certificate of Service: 01/29/2019. [19-3064] (ALB) [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:17 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 5 ]; previously filed by Mr. Allen L. Bohnert for Warren K. Henness. Response from Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies Certificate of Service:01/25/2019. [19-3064] (BMF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:42 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies by Hannah C. Wilson. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] (HCW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:59 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies by Michael J. Hendershot. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] (MJH) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:56 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] (BMF) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:53 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 ****LOCKED**** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies by Hannah C. Wilson. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] Counsel refiling appearances with correct parties--[Edited 01/23/2019 by PJE] (HCW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:42 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 ****LOCKED**** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies by Michael J. Hendershot. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] COUNSEL ADVISED filing new appearances--[Edited 01/23/2019 by PJE] (MJH) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:39 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 ****LOCKED**** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Stuart Hudson, Christopher LaRose, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore, Unnamed and Anonymous Execution Team Members and Edwin A. Voorhies by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] COUNSEL kindly directed to refile appearance form using correct parties on appeal>--[Edited 01/23/2019 by PJE] (BMF) [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:32 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER SENT to parties regarding corrected caption. (PJE) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:03 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Warren K. Henness by David C. Stebbins. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] (DCS) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:44 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Allen L. Bohnert and David C. Stebbins for Warren K. Henness to stay execution date, expedited briefing and oral argument. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by PJE] (ALB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:38 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Allen L. Bohnert and David C. Stebbins for Warren K. Henness to exceed page limit on motion for stay of execution, expedited briefing and oral argument. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064]--[Edited 01/23/2019 by PJE] (ALB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:33 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Warren K. Henness by Allen L. Bohnert. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-3064] (ALB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:21 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 01/23/2019 12:41 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Death Penalty Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Warren K. Henness. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 01/23/2019 12:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Warren K. Henness, et al v. Mike DeWine, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIKE DEWINE, Governor, State of Ohio
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PHARMACIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER LAROSE
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PHARMACISTS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD MORGAN, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN GRAY
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN COLEMAN, Warden, Toledo Correctional Institution
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN DRUG SUPPLIERS 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD ERDOS, Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIM SHOOP, Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Center
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN KASICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWIN A. VOORHIES, Managing Director of Operations, ODRC
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD THEODORE, Pharmacist, c/o ODRC
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STUART HUDSON, Director, ODRC
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANONYMOUS EXECUTION TEAM MEMBERS 1-50, c/o Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES 1-25
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES BRADLEY, Warden, Franklin Medical Center
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNNAMED AND ANONYMOUS EXECUTION TEAM MEMBERS
Represented By: Michael Jason Hendershot
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Represented By: Hannah Carrigg Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: In re: OHIO EXECUTION PROTOCOL LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNIE ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WARREN K. HENNESS
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Represented By: David C. Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?