Novia Communications, LLC v. Jesse Weatherby, et al
Defendant: ORION MEDIA MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: JESSE WEATHERBY and COMMUNITY BROADCAST GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: NOVIA COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Case Number: 19-3421
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 21, 2020 Novia Commc'ns v. Jesse Weatherby

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 06/18/2019 11:54 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Novia Communications, LLC Certificate of Service:06/17/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-3421] (MTK) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:32 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jesse Weatherby and Community Broadcast Group, Inc. by Susan B. Nelson. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-3421] (SBN) [Entered: 05/22/2019 03:03 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Paul Silk, Jr. for Appellee Community Broadcast Group, Inc. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-3421] (JPS) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:57 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James Paul Silk, Jr. for Appellee Jesse Weatherby. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-3421] (JPS) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:56 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jesse Weatherby and Community Broadcast Group, Inc. by James P. Silk, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2019. [19-3421] (JPS) [Entered: 05/22/2019 02:54 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC. Certificate of Service:05/21/2019. [19-3421] (MTK) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:18 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew T. Kemp for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC Certificate of Service: 05/21/2019. [19-3421] (MTK) [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:16 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC by Gregory H. Wagoner. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2019. [19-3421] (GHW) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:44 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC by John C. Barron. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2019. [19-3421] (JCB) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:41 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Novia Communications, LLC by Matthew T. Kemp. Certificate of Service: 05/21/2019. [19-3421] (MTK) [Entered: 05/21/2019 01:38 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:12 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:10 PM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: Appellant brief due 06/17/2019. Appellee brief due 07/17/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:23 AM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:17 AM]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Novia Communications, LLC. Hearing held: n. (BLC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 09:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novia Communications, LLC v. Jesse Weatherby, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION MEDIA MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Susan Baum Nelson
Represented By: James Paul Silk Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSE WEATHERBY
Represented By: Susan Baum Nelson
Represented By: James Paul Silk Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMUNITY BROADCAST GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Susan Baum Nelson
Represented By: James Paul Silk Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NOVIA COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Represented By: Gregory H. Wagoner
Represented By: John C. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?