Bryant Baker v. Michael Dewine, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRYANT BAKER
Defendant / Appellee: CRAIG TRENEFF, MAGISTRATE MARCI WEBBER, ELISE ANDERSON, BRIAN BURRIER, RICHARD P. OESTREICH, OHIO TENTH DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS, MICHAEL DEWINE, STEVE WYGLE, FRANKLIN COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, OHIO, STEPHEN DAULTON, CRYSTAL VANARSDALE, JUDGE ELIZABETH GILL, SUPREME COURT OF OHIO, RONALD R. PETROFF, BRIE BAKER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARCI WEBBER
Case Number: 19-3530
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Marci Webber, Crystal Vanarsdale, Elise Anderson, Steve Wygle and Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, Ohio by Nick A. Soulas, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 07/31/2019. [19-3530] (NAS) [Entered: 07/31/2019 11:04 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Bryant Baker for leave to file 60(b) motion in the lower court. Certificate of service: 06/26/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/02/2019 11:40 AM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ehren W. Slagle for Appellee Craig Treneff Certificate of Service: 06/19/2019. [19-3530] (EWS) [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:22 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Craig Treneff by Ehren W. Slagle. Certificate of Service: 06/19/2019. [19-3530] (EWS) [Entered: 06/19/2019 04:18 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Brian Burrier by Melvin J. Davis. Certificate of Service: 06/19/2019. [19-3530] (MJD) [Entered: 06/19/2019 02:16 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Marci Webber, Crystal Vanarsdale, Elise Anderson, Steve Wygle and Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, Ohio by Amy L. Hiers. Certificate of Service: 06/19/2019. [19-3530] (ALH) [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:33 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ronald R. Petroff by Christopher L. Trolinger. Certificate of Service: 06/18/2019. [19-3530] (CLT) [Entered: 06/18/2019 10:08 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. David C. Moser for Appellee Elizabeth Gill Certificate of Service: 06/17/2019. [19-3530] (DCM) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:32 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Elizabeth Gill by David C. Moser. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2019. [19-3530] (DCM) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:28 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Supreme Court of Ohio and Michael Dewine by Heather L. Buchanan. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2019. [19-3530] (HLB) [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:26 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ohio Tenth District Court of Appeals by Andrew Fraser. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2019. [19-3530] (JAF) [Entered: 06/17/2019 01:23 PM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 3 ]. Response filed by Party Mr. Bryant Baker. Certificate of Service:06/11/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:39 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Mr. Bryant Baker show cause for possible jurisdictional defect involving the filing of a late notice of appeal. Response due by 06/27/2019 for Bryant Baker. (KSF) [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:56 PM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:34 PM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Bryant Baker. Transcript needed: n. (KSF) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant Baker v. Michael Dewine, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYANT BAKER
Represented By: Bryant Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRAIG TRENEFF
Represented By: Ehren W. Slagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGISTRATE MARCI WEBBER
Represented By: Amy L. Hiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELISE ANDERSON
Represented By: Amy L. Hiers
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN BURRIER
Represented By: Melvin J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD P. OESTREICH
Represented By: Richard P. Oestreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OHIO TENTH DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS
Represented By: John Andrew Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DEWINE
Represented By: Heather L. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE WYGLE
Represented By: Amy L. Hiers
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANKLIN COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, OHIO
Represented By: Amy L. Hiers
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN DAULTON
Represented By: Barry H. Wolinetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRYSTAL VANARSDALE
Represented By: Amy L. Hiers
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDGE ELIZABETH GILL
Represented By: David C. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPREME COURT OF OHIO
Represented By: Heather L. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD R. PETROFF
Represented By: Christopher Lewis Trolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIE BAKER
Represented By: Barry H. Wolinetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARCI WEBBER
Represented By: Amy L. Hiers
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?