Damar Ruffin v. Marc Kudley, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAMAR D. RUFFIN
Defendant / Appellee: JOURNALIST ADAM FERRISE, in his individual capacity, M. SLOTT, Sergeant, in his individual and official capacity, DETECTIVE SCOTT WILLIAMS, in his individual and official capacity, DETECTIVE CHRIS CARNEY, in his individual and official capacity, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION AGENT TIMOTHY EDQUIST, CLEVELAND PLAIN DEALER, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY JUSTIN RICHARDS, in his individual and official capacity, DETECTIVE MIKE ZIMCOSKY, in his individual and official capacity, CITY OF AKRON, OH, POSTAL INSPECTOR MARC KUDLEY, in his individual capacity, JOHN DOE, DISTRICT ATTORNEY SHERRI BEVAN WALSH, in her individual and official capacity, DETECTIVE ALAN T. JONES, in his individual and official capacity and DETECTIVE PAUL J. HILL, in his individual and official capacity
Case Number: 19-3534
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant MOTION filed by Damar D. Ruffin to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 06/17/2019. (SSS) [Entered: 06/25/2019 07:55 AM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 4A4 ORDER from district court filed, RE #15. Order Filed:06/10/2019 denying motion to alter or amend judgment and reconsideration/affidavit. (SSS) [Entered: 06/12/2019 08:42 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to alter or amend judgment and reconsideration/affidavit filed in district court on May 31, 2019, RE #13. (SSS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 12:46 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (SSS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 11:16 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 11:15 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Damar D. Ruffin. Transcript needed: n. (SSS) [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:59 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Damar Ruffin v. Marc Kudley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAMAR D. RUFFIN
Represented By: Damar D. Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOURNALIST ADAM FERRISE, in his individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. SLOTT, Sergeant, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE SCOTT WILLIAMS, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE CHRIS CARNEY, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION AGENT TIMOTHY EDQUIST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLEVELAND PLAIN DEALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY JUSTIN RICHARDS, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE MIKE ZIMCOSKY, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF AKRON, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POSTAL INSPECTOR MARC KUDLEY, in his individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY SHERRI BEVAN WALSH, in her individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE ALAN T. JONES, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DETECTIVE PAUL J. HILL, in his individual and official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?