Thomas Smith v. Woolace Electric Corporation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS E. SMITH, as Power of Attorney for Menno Schwartz, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: STEVEN GARZA, as both an individual and as an employee of Woolace Electric Corporation and WOOLACE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Case Number: 19-3907
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/18/2019. appellee brief now due 01/16/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 10/15/2019 03:18 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Steven Garza and Woolace Electric Corporation by Robert J. Bahret. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-3907] (RJB) [Entered: 10/11/2019 01:24 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form, [ # 12 ], filed by Mr. Robert J. Bahret for Woolace Electric Corporation and Steven Garza is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (ASM) [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:58 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Steven Garza and Woolace Electric Corporation by Robert J. Bahret. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-3907] (RJB) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:05 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 10 ], filed by Mr. Robert J. Bahret for Woolace Electric Corporation and Steven Garza. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (ASM) [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:47 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 **LOCKED** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Woolace Electric Corporation and Steven Garza by Robert J. Bahret and Andrew J. Ayers. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-3907]--[Edited 10/09/2019 by ASM] (RJB) [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:14 AM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/18/2019, appellee brief due 12/17/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:46 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Carasusana Wall for Appellant Thomas E. Smith. Certificate of Service:10/08/2019. [19-3907] (CW) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:43 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Thomas E. Smith by David W. Zoll. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2019. [19-3907] (DWZ) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:38 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Thomas E. Smith by Carasusana B, Wall. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2019. [19-3907] (CW) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:34 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Carasusana Wall for Thomas E. Smith. Certificate of Service: 10/08/2019. [19-3907] (CW) [Entered: 10/08/2019 02:27 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/15/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/25/2019 02:13 PM]
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:57 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 09/24/2019 05:23 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Thomas E. Smith. Transcript needed: y. (ASM) [Entered: 09/24/2019 05:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Smith v. Woolace Electric Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS E. SMITH, as Power of Attorney for Menno Schwartz, Jr.
Represented By: Carasusana Wall
Represented By: David W. Zoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN GARZA, as both an individual and as an employee of Woolace Electric Corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Bahret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WOOLACE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert J. Bahret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?