Appalachian Regional Health v. U.S. Nursing Corporation

Defendant / Appellant: U.S. NURSING CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Case Number: 19-5031
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 03/01/2019 at 11:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull, Appellant Counsel and Client(s) ONLY. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/22/2019 04:46 PM]
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation by Bradley R. Hume. Certificate of Service: 02/22/2019. [19-5031] (BRH) [Entered: 02/22/2019 12:39 PM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 20 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 02/21/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:54 PM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation by Byron N. Miller. Certificate of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-5031] (BNM) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:55 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/25/2019; appellee brief due 04/22/2019. (REO) [Entered: 02/11/2019 02:58 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 Transcript, [8], has been filed in the District Court on 02/11/2019 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Linda S. Mullen ; Actual Number of Pages: Voir dire transcript from 5/30/2018 - 116 pages ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; [19-5031] (LSM) [Entered: 02/11/2019 09:09 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [8] Transcript to be filed in district court by Linda S. Mullen by 03/11/2019. (REO) [Entered: 02/07/2019 10:55 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 02/21/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:46 PM]
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Andrew Wright for Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation. Certificate of Service:01/31/2019. [19-5031]--[Edited 02/11/2019 by REO] (JAW) [Entered: 01/31/2019 11:10 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/30/2019 11:24 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/30/2019 11:19 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Andrew Wright for Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation. Certificate of Service:01/23/2019. [19-5031] (JAW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:55 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [8]. Linda S. Mullen's acknowledgement is due 02/06/2019. (REO) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:54 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Andrew Wright for Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5031] (JAW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:32 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Linda S. Mullen, filed by Mr. Joseph Andrew Wright for U.S. Nursing Corporation. [8] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 01/23/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Hon. Karen Caldwell ; Hearing Dates: May 30, 2018 - voir dire ; Specially authorized proceedings: Voir Dire ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5031] (JAW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:31 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation by Joseph A. Wright. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5031] (JAW) [Entered: 01/23/2019 04:14 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Barry D. Hunter for Appellee Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5031] (BDH) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:06 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. by Barry D. Hunter. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5031] (BDH) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:04 PM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Appalachian Regional Healthcare, Inc. by Medrith Lee Norman. Certificate of Service: 01/23/2019. [19-5031] (MLN) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:24 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Mr. Joseph Andrew Wright for U.S. Nursing Corporation. (REO) [Entered: 01/09/2019 03:00 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:56 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant U.S. Nursing Corporation. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appalachian Regional Health v. U.S. Nursing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. NURSING CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Wright
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Represented By: Bradley R. Hume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: APPALACHIAN REGIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?