Karen McNeil, et al v. Community Probation Services,, et al
Plaintiff: KAREN MCNEIL, LESLEY JOHNSON, TANYA MITCHELL and SONYA BEARD, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant: PATRICIA MCNAIR, PSI-PROBATION, L.L.C., PROGRESSIVE SENTENCING, INC., TENNESSEE CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, MARKEYTA BLEDSOE, PSI-PROBATION II, LLC, TIMOTHY COOK, J. RUSSELL PARKS, HARRIET THOMPSON and COMMUNITY PROBATION SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: INDYA HILFORT
Defendant / Appellant: SHERIFF KYLE HELTON and GILES COUNTY, TENNESSEE
Case Number: 19-5262
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 23, 2019 Summary McNeil v. Community Probation Services, LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 26 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/02/2019 11:37 AM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 05/31/2019. appellee brief now due 07/08/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:26 PM]
May 1, 2019 Filing 24 Status Update filed with the Mediation Office. (LMR) [Entered: 05/01/2019 02:17 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 23 The Mediation Conference scheduled for 04/22/2019 is hereby canceled. A Status update is DUE TO THE MEDIATION OFFICE 04/25/2019. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:00 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 05/14/2019; appellee brief due 06/13/2019 (PJE) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:55 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Cassandra Crane for Giles County, Tennessee and Kyle Helton. Certificate of Service: 04/04/2019. [19-5262] (CC) [Entered: 04/04/2019 01:15 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 04/08/2019 further action will be taken. (PJE) [Entered: 04/04/2019 07:24 AM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Eric Ian Halperin for Appellee Indya Hilfort Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-5262] (EIH) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:43 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Elizabeth Rossi. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-5262] (ER) [Entered: 04/02/2019 04:12 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Jonas Wang. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-5262] (JW) [Entered: 04/02/2019 03:20 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Eric Halperin. Certificate of Service: 04/02/2019. [19-5262] (EIH) [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:59 AM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Chirag G. Badlani. Certificate of Service: 04/01/2019. [19-5262] (CGB) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:57 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Kate E. Schwartz. Certificate of Service: 04/01/2019. [19-5262] (KES) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:55 PM]
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Matthew J. Piers. Certificate of Service: 03/29/2019. [19-5262] (MJP) [Entered: 03/29/2019 12:23 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER SENT to all parties regarding correction to the caption in light of district court removing a defendant from the case as inproprerly named on their docket. (PJE) [Entered: 03/28/2019 02:08 PM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER SENT to parties regarding corrected case caption. (PJE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:59 AM]
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by David W. Garrison. Certificate of Service: 03/27/2019. [19-5262] (DWG) [Entered: 03/27/2019 10:33 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Indya Hilfort by Scott P. Tift. Certificate of Service: 03/26/2019. [19-5262] (SPT) [Entered: 03/26/2019 06:04 PM]
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Cassandra Crane for Appellants Giles County, Tennessee and Kyle Helton. Certificate of Service:03/21/2019. [19-5262] (CC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:13 PM]
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Cassandra Crane for Appellants Giles County, Tennessee and Kyle Helton Certificate of Service: 03/21/2019. [19-5262] (CC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:11 PM]
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Giles County, Tennessee and Kyle Helton by Cassandra M. Crane. Certificate of Service: 03/21/2019. [19-5262] (CC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:08 PM]
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Giles County, Tennessee and Kyle Helton by Robyn Beale Williams. Certificate of Service: 03/21/2019. [19-5262] (RBW) [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:06 PM]
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/22/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Bob Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:46 PM]
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/21/2019 12:39 PM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:59 AM]
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Giles County, Tennessee and Kyle Helton. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen McNeil, et al v. Community Probation Services,, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLEY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONYA BEARD, On behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA MCNAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSI-PROBATION, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SENTENCING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENNESSEE CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKEYTA BLEDSOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSI-PROBATION II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. RUSSELL PARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIET THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY PROBATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INDYA HILFORT
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Represented By: Elizabeth Rossi
Represented By: Kate Ellen Schwartz
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Eric Ian Halperin
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Jonas Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHERIFF KYLE HELTON
Represented By: Cassandra Crane
Represented By: Robyn Beale Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GILES COUNTY, TENNESSEE
Represented By: Cassandra Crane
Represented By: Robyn Beale Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?