David Phillips v. Warden, USP McCreary
Petitioner / Appellant: DAVID NEIL PHILLIPS
Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN, USP MCCREARY
Case Number: 19-5295
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 07/02/2019. (ASM) [Entered: 05/20/2019 07:26 AM]
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Notice received from district court that filing fee has been paid by Party Mr. David Neil Phillips. 5/16/2019, R. 13. (ASM) [Entered: 05/17/2019 05:11 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee. (ASM) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:59 AM]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order filed regarding a fee related matter: ORDER: 1. Phillips' motion "for stay of abeyance" [R. 9 ] is DENIED. 2. Phillips' motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis [R. 10 ] is GRANTED IN PART. Within 28 DAYS, Phillips shall pay $20.00 to the Clerk of the Court in full satisfaction of the appellate filing fee. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 04/16/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, 6CCA, pro se filer via US Mail (ASM) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:40 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Respondent not served. Petition dismissed in district court without service on respondent. (ASM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:45 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:44 AM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed with CAP unnecessary. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. David Neil Phillips. Transcript needed: n. (ASM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Phillips v. Warden, USP McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DAVID NEIL PHILLIPS
Represented By: David Neil Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN, USP MCCREARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?