William Rogers v. Tony Mays
Petitioner / Appellant: WILLIAM GLENN ROGERS
Respondent / Appellee: TONY MAYS, Warden
Case Number: 19-5427
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 18, 2020 William Rogers v. Tony Mays

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry for William Glenn Rogers. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:03 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING Appellant's motion extend time (120 days) [ # 8 ] filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry. (PJE) [Entered: 06/17/2019 03:02 PM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Order Filed:05/31/2019 R. 161 R. 162 and R.163 (PJE) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:30 AM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION filed by Ms. Kelley J. Henry for William Glenn Rogers to extend time Petitioner's Motion To Extend Time To File A Motion To Expand Certificate Of Appealability Certificate of Service: 06/12/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:21 AM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tony Mays by Richard D. Douglas. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (RDD) [Entered: 06/04/2019 01:11 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant William Glenn Rogers by Kimberly S. Hodde. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (KSH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:49 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant William Glenn Rogers by Kelley J. Henry. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2019. [19-5427] (KJH) [Entered: 06/04/2019 12:35 PM]
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 4A4 ORDER from district court filed. Order Filed:05/31/2019. R.163 (PJE) [Entered: 06/03/2019 10:02 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:30 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 4a4 Notice filed. Case held in abeyance pending rulig on R. 155 MOTION to Alter Judgment Petitioner's Motion To Alter Or Amend A Judgment by William Glenn Rogers (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:27 AM]
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 Death Penalty Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant William Glenn Rogers. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 04/25/2019 07:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Rogers v. Tony Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILLIAM GLENN ROGERS
Represented By: Kimberly S. Hodde
Represented By: Kelley J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: TONY MAYS, Warden
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?