Stephen West v. Tony Parker, et al
Defendant / Appellee: TONY PARKER, Commissioner, Riverbend Maximum Security Institution, in his official capacity; and TONY MAYS, Warden, Riverbend Maximum Security Institution, in his official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHEN MICHAEL WEST
Case Number: 19-5585
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 6, 2019 Stephen West v. Tony Parker

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY filed by Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Stephen Michael West regarding Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay of Execution Certificate of Service: 07/29/2019. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:06 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 13 ]; previously filed by Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Stephen Michael West. Response from Attorney Ms. Sarah Campbell for Appellees Tony Mays and Tony Parker Certificate of Service:07/22/2019. [19-5585] (SC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 05:10 PM]
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER filed the motion to exceed the word length limitation [ # 15 ] is GRANTED. Further, the defendants are directed to file a response to the motion to stay no later than July 22, 2019. Entered by order of the court. (RB) [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:09 PM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Stephen Michael West to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2019. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 07/10/2019 08:11 AM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Appellant Stephen Michael West Certificate of Service:07/09/2019. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 07/09/2019 06:02 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Stephen Michael West to stay execution date. Certificate of Service: 07/09/2019. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 07/09/2019 05:58 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Sarah Campbell for Tony Mays and Tony Parker Certificate of Service:07/08/2019. Argument Request: not requested. [19-5585] (SC) [Entered: 07/08/2019 06:35 PM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Tony Mays and Tony Parker by Sarah K. Campbell. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2019. [19-5585] (SC) [Entered: 06/25/2019 10:54 AM]
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Stephen Michael West Certificate of Service:06/24/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:02 PM]
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Copy of District Court Order filed 6-13-19 R.30 granting in forma pauperis and assessing the appellate filing fee. (PJE) [Entered: 06/19/2019 08:06 AM]
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 DEATH PENALTY BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief now due 06/24/2019; appellee brief now due 07/08/2019; reply brief due 07/15/19. No extensions of time will be considered.-- (PJE) [Entered: 06/12/2019 09:29 AM]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed: Upon review and consideration, the plaintiffs motion to expedite this appeal is GRANTED, with briefing to be expedited as follows: appellants brief is due not later than Monday, June 24, 2019; appellees brief is due not later than Monday, July 8, 2019; appellants reply brief is due not later than Monday, July 15, 2019. A briefing schedule to this effect will be issued forthwith by the clerk, and no extension of time will be considered. [ # 6 ], [ # 6 ]. Entered by order of the court. (PJE) [Entered: 06/12/2019 09:19 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION filed by Mr. Stephen M. Kissinger for Stephen Michael West to expedite briefing schedule, to expedite decision. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2019. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:25 PM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephen Michael West by Stephen M. Kissinger. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2019. [19-5585] (SMK) [Entered: 06/05/2019 09:40 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 06/05/2019 07:23 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of District Court Order filed 1/4/19 R.6: the claims of the three remaining plaintiffs are hereby SEVERED into separate actions. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 (The court may also sever any claim against any party.). The Court is directed to docket a copy of the Complaint in this case as the initial pleading in a new civil matter, designating Stephen Michael West, as the sole plaintiff and reassign the new action to the appropriate District Judge pursuant to AO 158-1(a)(ii).. (PJE) [Entered: 06/05/2019 07:21 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 ***LOCKED - See corrected letter*** Death Penalty Case Docketed with CAP unnecessary. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen Michael West. Transcript needed: n.--[Edited 06/05/2019 by PJE] (PJE) [Entered: 06/05/2019 07:08 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED Death Penalty Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Stephen Michael West. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stephen West v. Tony Parker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY PARKER, Commissioner, Riverbend Maximum Security Institution, in his official capacity;
Represented By: Scott Crawford Sutherland
Represented By: Sarah Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY MAYS, Warden, Riverbend Maximum Security Institution, in his official capacity
Represented By: Scott Crawford Sutherland
Represented By: Sarah Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN MICHAEL WEST
Represented By: Stephen M. Kissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?