Gary Daily, et al v. Zeon Chem Ltd Partnership
Plaintiff / Appellee: GREGORY DENNIS KESSEL, THOMAS OEHLER, RAYMOND CATLETT, MARK H. BASHAM, THOMAS BAKER, ALEX E. BOWER, ERIC MICHAEL SETTLE, JAMES WHITTED, NATHAN TANNER, TODD G. ROBERTSON, RICKY HODGE, MATTHEW HARDIN, MD, GARY DAILY, BRIAN LEE PHILPOTT, KIMBERLY T. TATE, TROY TINGLE, ZACH RAYMER, JASON L. MOORE, STEPHEN BAUER, CHAD SEXTON, JAMES E. CLARK, KARL N. SMITH and KEVIN ROBERTSON
Defendant / Appellant: ZEON CHEMICALS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 19-5833
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - mediation [ # 8 ] filed by Mr. Kyle Donald Johnson. Entered by order of the court. (CAW) [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:32 PM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 08/26/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 12:02 PM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION filed to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. Kyle Donald Johnson for Appellant Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership. Certificate of Service: 08/14/2019. [19-5833] (KDJ) [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:51 AM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 ***LOCKED***FILED: Rule 42(b) Joint Dismissal Agreement by Mr. Kyle Donald Johnson for Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership. Certificate of Service: 08/14/2019. [19-5833] (wrong entry; counsel instructed to refile as a motion/stipulation, this document will be locked)--[Edited 08/14/2019 by MMD] (KDJ) [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:38 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. W. Kenneth Nevitt for Appellees Thomas Baker, Mark H. Basham, Stephen Bauer, Alex E. Bower, Raymond Catlett, James E. Clark, Gary Daily, Matthew Hardin, MD, Ricky Hodge, Gregory Dennis Kessel, Jason L. Moore, Thomas Oehler, Brian Lee Philpott, Zach Raymer, Kevin Robertson, Todd G. Robertson, Eric Michael Settle, Chad Sexton, Karl N. Smith, Nathan Tanner, Kimberly T. Tate, Troy Tingle and James Whitted Certificate of Service: 08/06/2019. [19-5833] (WKN) [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:24 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Thomas Baker, Mark H. Basham, Stephen Bauer, Alex E. Bower, Raymond Catlett, James E. Clark, Gary Daily, Matthew Hardin, MD, Ricky Hodge, Gregory Dennis Kessel, Jason L. Moore, Thomas Oehler, Brian Lee Philpott, Zach Raymer, Kevin Robertson, Todd G. Robertson, Eric Michael Settle, Chad Sexton, Karl N. Smith, Nathan Tanner, Kimberly T. Tate, Troy Tingle and James Whitted by William Kenneth Nevitt. Certificate of Service: 08/06/2019. [19-5833] (WKN) [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:19 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 08/26/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:26 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 08/02/2019 03:22 PM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Michelle Davis (MMD) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:29 AM]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Zeon Chemicals Limited Partnership. Transcript needed: y. (MMD) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Daily, et al v. Zeon Chem Ltd Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY DENNIS KESSEL
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS OEHLER
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND CATLETT
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARK H. BASHAM
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THOMAS BAKER
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEX E. BOWER
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ERIC MICHAEL SETTLE
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES WHITTED
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATHAN TANNER
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TODD G. ROBERTSON
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICKY HODGE
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MATTHEW HARDIN, MD
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY DAILY
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BRIAN LEE PHILPOTT
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KIMBERLY T. TATE
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TROY TINGLE
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ZACH RAYMER
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JASON L. MOORE
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEPHEN BAUER
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHAD SEXTON
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES E. CLARK
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KARL N. SMITH
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN ROBERTSON
Represented By: W. Kenneth Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ZEON CHEMICALS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Kyle Donald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?