P.G. v. Genesis Learning Centers
Defendant / Appellant: GENESIS LEARNING CENTERS, dba Genesis Academy
Plaintiff / Appellee: P.G., through his parents, A.G. and R.G.
Case Number: 19-5922
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers by Paige I. Bernick. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. [19-5922] (PIB) [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:12 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to dismiss - jurisdiction, [ # 9 ]; previously filed by Mr. Justin Scott Gilbert for P.G.. Response from Attorney Ms. Rebecca Wells Demaree for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers Certificate of Service:09/09/2019. [19-5922] (RWD) [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:38 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Rebecca Wells Demaree for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers. Certificate of Service:09/04/2019. [19-5922] (RWD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:11 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Ms. Rebecca Wells Demaree for Genesis Learning Centers. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. [19-5922] (RWD) [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:33 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers by John D. Kitch. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. [19-5922] (JDK) [Entered: 09/03/2019 02:39 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 ***LOCKED*** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Rebecca Wells Demaree for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers. Certificate of Service:09/03/2019. [19-5922] COUNSEL advised to remove AG RG individually from the statement - only P.G. is the appellee on appeal--[Edited 09/04/2019 by PJE] (RWD) [Entered: 09/03/2019 02:33 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Rebecca Wells Demaree for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. [19-5922] (RWD) [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:35 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers by John D. Kitch. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. [19-5922]***Must file using correct Pacer account***--[Edited 09/03/2019 by BSM] (RWD) [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:31 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Genesis Learning Centers by Rebecca W. Demaree. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2019. [19-5922] (RWD) [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:31 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss. (MMD) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:33 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION filed by Mr. Justin Scott Gilbert for P.G. to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 08/28/2019. [19-5922] (JSG) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:07 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee P.G. by Jessica F. Salonus. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2019. [19-5922] (JFS) [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:40 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Justin Scott Gilbert for Appellee P.G. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2019. [19-5922] (JSG) [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:23 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee P.G. by Justin S. Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 08/20/2019. [19-5922] (JSG) [Entered: 08/20/2019 02:23 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 08/20/2019 12:45 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 08/20/2019 12:34 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/30/2019;. appellee brief due 10/28/2019; (MMD) [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:14 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Michelle Davis (MMD) [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:13 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Genesis Learning Centers. Transcript needed: n. (MMD) [Entered: 08/19/2019 01:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.G. v. Genesis Learning Centers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GENESIS LEARNING CENTERS, dba Genesis Academy
Represented By: Rebecca Wells Demaree
Represented By: John Daniel Kitch
Represented By: Paige I. Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: P.G., through his parents, A.G. and R.G.
Represented By: Justin Scott Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica Farriis Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?