St. Paul Guardian Ins. Co., et al v. City of Newport, KY, et al
Defendant: WILLIAM R. VIRGIL and LIEUTENANT COLONEL KEN PAGE
Defendant / Appellant: PAT MOORE, SARAH TOLLE, fka Sarah Desentz, CITY OF NEWPORT, KY, SERGEANT ROBERT BRADFORD, NORM WAGNER, RICK SEARS, MARK BRANDT, LIEUTENANT TOM FROMME and HOWARD NIEMEIER
Plaintiff / Appellee: ST. PAUL GUARDIAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PHOENIX INSURANCE CO. and TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-5948
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 28 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/08/2019 11:55 AM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/05/2019. appellee brief now due 12/10/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:52 AM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Follow-up Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/08/2019 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 10/08/2019 08:49 AM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/05/2019. appellee brief now due 12/03/2019. (LMR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 04:06 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Follow-up Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/08/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/01/2019 04:05 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 10/01/2019 at 1:30 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/24/2019 09:58 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/21/2019;. appellee brief due 11/18/2019; (RB) [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:24 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Robert Bradford, Mark Brandt, City of Newport, KY, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Niemeier, Rick Sears, Sarah Tolle and Norm Wagner. Certificate of Service: 09/09/2019. [19-5948] (JCK) [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:38 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellants Robert Bradford, Mark Brandt, City of Newport, KY, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Niemeier, Rick Sears, Sarah Tolle and Norm Wagner. Certificate of Service:09/06/2019. [19-5948] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:32 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Rick Sears. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:31 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Tom Fromme. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:30 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Robert Bradford. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:28 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Sarah Tolle. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:27 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Howard Niemeier. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:26 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Pat Moore. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:24 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Norm Wagner. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:23 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant Mark Brandt. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:22 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason C. Kuhlman for Appellant City of Newport, KY. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RB] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:20 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Robert Bradford, Mark Brandt, City of Newport, KY, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Niemeier, Rick Sears, Sarah Tolle and Norm Wagner by Jason C. Kuhlman. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948] (JCK) [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:14 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Justin M. Schaefer for Appellee Travelers Indemnity Company of America. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by LAJ] (JMS) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:55 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Justin M. Schaefer for Appellee Phoenix Insurance Co. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by LAJ] (JMS) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:54 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Justin M. Schaefer for Appellee St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by LAJ] (JMS) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:53 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Phoenix Insurance Co., St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of America by Michael S. Maloney. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948] (MSM) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:52 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Phoenix Insurance Co., St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company of America by Justin M. Schaefer. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-5948] (JMS) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:48 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/24/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:25 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:12 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Laura Jones (LAJ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:50 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Robert Bradford, Mark Brandt, City of Newport, KY, Tom Fromme, Pat Moore, Howard Niemeier, Rick Sears, Sarah Tolle and Norm Wagner. Transcript needed: y. (LAJ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 01:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Guardian Ins. Co., et al v. City of Newport, KY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM R. VIRGIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT COLONEL KEN PAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PAT MOORE
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SARAH TOLLE, fka Sarah Desentz
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CITY OF NEWPORT, KY
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SERGEANT ROBERT BRADFORD
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: NORM WAGNER
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICK SEARS
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARK BRANDT
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LIEUTENANT TOM FROMME
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HOWARD NIEMEIER
Represented By: Jason C. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ST. PAUL GUARDIAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHOENIX INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?