Richard Moore, III v. Hopkins County, Kentucky, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DEPUTY JAILER TRACY GRIFFITH, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, SERGEANT CARL COY, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer and employee of the Hopkins County Jail, JAILER JOE BLUE, Individually and in his official capacity as Hopkins County Jailer, SERGEANT BRANDON LAMPTON, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, ROBIN RAMBURGER, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., MATTHEW JOHNSTON, Individually and in his official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., STEPHANIE UTLEY, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., UNKNOWN DENTAL ASSISTANTS AND AIDES, Individually and in their official capacities at the Hopkins County Jail, or as employees or independent contractors of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., HOPKINS COUNTY, KENTUCKY, UNKNOWN DOCTOR, Individually and in his/her official capacity as doctor at the Hopkins County Jail, or as employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., SERGEANT AMBER EAGLES, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, JACLYN GIBSON, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., SERGEANT ANGELA HOPPER, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, CHERYL CONNELLY, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., DEPUTY JAILER JARRETT BLACKHURST, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, DEPUTY JAILER VICTORIA DAVENPORT, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, JODI BLAKE, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., DEBORAH ASH, R.N., Individually and in her official capacity as Regional Nurse or Manager at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., at the Hopkins County Jail, DEPUTY JAILER JAMES MANNS, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, DEPUTY JAILER CHRIS MELTON, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail, ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE and DEPUTY ADAM QUALLS, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD EDWARD MOORE, III
Case Number: 19-6267
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER filed to dismiss for want of prosecution for failure to pay the filing fee by 12/06/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 12/19/2019 07:59 AM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jarrett Blackhurst, Joe Blue, Carl Coy, Victoria Davenport, Amber Eagles, Tracy Griffith, Hopkins County, Kentucky, Angela Hopper, Brandon Lampton, James Manns, Chris Melton and Adam Qualls by Stacey A. Blankenship. Certificate of Service: 12/10/2019. [19-6267]--[Edited 12/10/2019 by CAM] (SAB) [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:36 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Deborah Ash, Matthew Johnston, Jodi Blake, Stephanie Utley, Robin Ramburger, Cheryl Connelly and Jaclyn Gibson by Timothy E. Bridgeman. Certificate of Service: 12/10/2019. [19-6267] (TEB) [Entered: 12/10/2019 11:19 AM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ian Andrew Loos for Appellees Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Deborah Ash, Jodi Blake, Cheryl Connelly, Jaclyn Gibson, Matthew Johnston, Robin Ramburger and Stephanie Utley Certificate of Service: 12/09/2019. [19-6267] (IAL) [Entered: 12/09/2019 02:22 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Deborah Ash, Jodi Blake, Cheryl Connelly, Jaclyn Gibson, Matthew Johnston, Robin Ramburger and Stephanie Utley by Ian A. Loos. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2019. [19-6267] (IAL) [Entered: 12/06/2019 05:39 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Stacey Ann Blankenship for Appellees Jarrett Blackhurst, Joe Blue, Carl Coy, Victoria Davenport, Amber Eagles, Tracy Griffith, Hopkins County, Kentucky, Angela Hopper, Brandon Lampton, James Manns, Chris Melton and Adam Qualls Certificate of Service: 12/06/2019. [19-6267] (SAB) [Entered: 12/06/2019 04:49 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 ***LOCKED--SEE RE 8***APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jarrett Blackhurst, Joe Blue, Carl Coy, Victoria Davenport, Amber Eagles, Tracy Griffith, Angela Hopper, Brandon Lampton, James Manns, Chris Melton and Adam Qualls by Stacey A. Blankenship. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2019. [19-6267]--[Edited 12/10/2019 by CAM] (SAB) [Entered: 12/06/2019 04:46 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 11/06/2019 01:03 PM]
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Richard Edward Moore, III. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 11/06/2019 01:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Moore, III v. Hopkins County, Kentucky, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JAILER TRACY GRIFFITH, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT CARL COY, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer and employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAILER JOE BLUE, Individually and in his official capacity as Hopkins County Jailer
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT BRANDON LAMPTON, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN RAMBURGER, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW JOHNSTON, Individually and in his official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHANIE UTLEY, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN DENTAL ASSISTANTS AND AIDES, Individually and in their official capacities at the Hopkins County Jail, or as employees or independent contractors of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOPKINS COUNTY, KENTUCKY
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN DOCTOR, Individually and in his/her official capacity as doctor at the Hopkins County Jail, or as employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT AMBER EAGLES, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACLYN GIBSON, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEANT ANGELA HOPPER, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHERYL CONNELLY, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JAILER JARRETT BLACKHURST, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JAILER VICTORIA DAVENPORT, Individually and in her official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JODI BLAKE, Individually and in her official capacity as a nurse, health care professional, or employee at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH ASH, R.N., Individually and in her official capacity as Regional Nurse or Manager at the Hopkins County Jail, or as an employee or independent contractor of Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., at the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JAILER JAMES MANNS, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY JAILER CHRIS MELTON, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Timothy Edward Bridgeman
Represented By: Ian Andrew Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY ADAM QUALLS, Individually and in his official capacity as an officer or employee of the Hopkins County Jail
Represented By: Stacey Ann Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD EDWARD MOORE, III
Represented By: Richard Edward Moore III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?