Cholyonda Brown v. Rick Snyder, et al
Defendant: GOVERNOR RICK SNYDER, et al. and RICK SNYDER, former Governor, et al.
Defendant / Appellant: HOWARD CROFT, DARNELL EARLEY, DAUGHERTY JOHNSON and MICHAEL GLASGOW
Plaintiff / Appellee: CHOLYONDA BROWN, Personal Representative for the Estate of Odie Brown
Not Classified By Court: In re: FLINT WATER CASES
Case Number: 20-1322
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 07/13/2020; appellee brief due 08/10/2020 (PJE) [Entered: 06/01/2020 07:56 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 21 Transcript, [19], has been filed in the District Court on 02/04/2020 ; Court Reporter: Ms. Darlene K. May ; Actual Number of Pages: 131 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 0 ; [20-1322] (DKM) [Entered: 05/21/2020 04:30 PM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [19]. Darlene K. May's acknowledgement is due 06/03/2020. (PJE) [Entered: 05/20/2020 11:53 AM]
May 20, 2020 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Darlene K. May, filed by Mr. Alexander Stephen Rusek for Howard Croft. [19] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 05/20/2020 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Judith E. Levy ; Hearing Dates: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2020 re 86 MOTION to Dismiss, 85 MOTION to Dismiss, 83 MOTION to Dismiss, 84 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, 89 MOTION to Dismiss, 79 MOTION to Dismiss, 91 MOTION to Dismiss; Disposition: Motions taken under advisement. ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 05/20/2020. [20-1322] (ASR) [Entered: 05/20/2020 09:15 AM]
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 05/11/2020 further action will be taken. (PJE) [Entered: 05/06/2020 06:48 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. T. Santino Mateo for Appellant Darnell Earley. Certificate of Service:04/30/2020. [20-1322] (TSM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 09:53 AM]
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. T. Santino Mateo for Appellant Darnell Earley Certificate of Service: 04/30/2020. [20-1322] (TSM) [Entered: 04/30/2020 09:47 AM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Darnell Earley by T Santino Mateo. Certificate of Service: 04/29/2020. [20-1322] (TSM) [Entered: 04/29/2020 03:29 PM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Sima Girish Patel for Appellee Cholyonda Brown Certificate of Service: 04/29/2020. [20-1322] (SGP) [Entered: 04/29/2020 11:44 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Edwar Ayoub Zeineh for Appellant Daugherty Johnson. Certificate of Service:04/27/2020. [20-1322] (EAZ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 11:35 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher James Marker for Appellant Michael Glasgow. Certificate of Service:04/27/2020. [20-1322] (CJM) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:23 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher James Marker for Appellant Michael Glasgow Certificate of Service: 04/27/2020. [20-1322] (CJM) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:21 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Michael Glasgow by Christopher J. Marker. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2020. [20-1322] (CJM) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:20 AM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 The case manager for this case is now: Patricia J. Elder [20-1322, 20-1323, 20-1324] (PJE) [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:15 AM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Alexander Stephen Rusek for Appellant Howard Croft. Certificate of Service:04/24/2020. [20-1322] (ASR) [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:32 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Alexander Stephen Rusek for Appellant Howard Croft Certificate of Service: 04/24/2020. [20-1322] (ASR) [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:31 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Howard Croft by Alexander S. Rusek. Certificate of Service: 04/24/2020. [20-1322] (ASR) [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:30 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Edwar Ayoub Zeineh for Appellant Daugherty Johnson Certificate of Service: 04/24/2020. [20-1322] (EAZ) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:34 PM]
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Daugherty Johnson by Edwar A. Zeineh. Certificate of Service: 04/24/2020. [20-1322] (EAZ) [Entered: 04/24/2020 12:33 PM]
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cholyonda Brown by Sima G. Patel. Certificate of Service: 04/21/2020. [20-1322] (SGP) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:44 AM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 04/20/2020 12:48 PM]
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Howard Croft, Darnell Earley, Michael Glasgow and Daugherty Johnson. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 04/20/2020 12:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cholyonda Brown v. Rick Snyder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HOWARD CROFT
Represented By: Alexander Stephen Rusek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DARNELL EARLEY
Represented By: Todd Russell Perkins
Represented By: T. Santino Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAUGHERTY JOHNSON
Represented By: Edwar Ayoub Zeineh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL GLASGOW
Represented By: Christopher James Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR RICK SNYDER, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK SNYDER, former Governor, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHOLYONDA BROWN, Personal Representative for the Estate of Odie Brown
Represented By: Todd J. Weglarz
Represented By: Sima Girish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: FLINT WATER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?