Jamaal Cameron, et al v. Michael Bouchard, et al
Defendant: MICHAEL BOUCHARD and CURTIS D. CHILDS
Plaintiff / Appellee: MATTHEW SAUNDERS, MICHAEL CAMERON, RICHARD BRIGGS, JAMAAL CAMERON and RAJ LEE
Defendant / Appellant: OAKLAND COUNTY, MI
Amicus Curiae: EMMITT SPARKMAN, Warden, Corrections Expert, ELDON VAIL, Corrections Expert, PHIL STANLEY, Corrections Expert, NATIONAL SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, OHIO JUSTICE & POLICY CENTER, BRIE WILLIAMS, MICHIGAN SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION, MARTIN F. HORN, Corrections Expert, HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RODERICK AND SOLANGE MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER, STEVE J. MARTIN, Corrections Expert, RICHARD MORGAN, Corrections Expert, DAN PACHOLKE, Corrections Expert, MAJOR COUNTY SHERIFFS OF AMERICA, RIGHTS BEHIND BARS and ROBERT L. COHEN, M.D.
Case Number: 20-1469
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 11, 2020 Jamaal Cameron v. Michael Bouchard
July 9, 2020 Jamaal Cameron v. Michael Bouchard

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 75 RECORD RETAINED. Record consisting of 1 copy of audio recording , will be retained. (MH) [Entered: 12/28/2020 11:03 AM]
July 31, 2020 Filing 74 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (MRE) [Entered: 07/31/2020 09:37 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 73 OPINION filed : VACATED. Decision not for publication. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Chief Judge (DISSENTING); John K. Bush, (AUTHORING), and Joan L. Larsen, Circuit Judges. (CL) [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:39 PM]
July 1, 2020 Filing 72 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to withdraw as counsel [ # 71 ] filed by Ms. Danielle Cheree Jefferis., terminating Attorney Danielle Cheree Jefferis for Amicus Curiaes Eldon Vail, Phil Stanley, Emmitt Sparkman, Dan Pacholke, Richard Morgan, Steve J. Martin and Martin F. Horn in 20-1469. Reason for termination: replaced by other counsel. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/01/2020 08:03 AM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION filed by Ms. Danielle Cheree Jefferis for Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley and Eldon Vail for Danielle C. Jefferis to withdraw as counsel for Amici Curiae - Corrections Experts Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley, Eldon Vail. Certificate of Service: 06/30/2020. [20-1469] (DCJ) [Entered: 06/30/2020 08:29 PM]
June 30, 2020 Filing 70 APPEARANCE filed for Amici Curiae Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke and Eldon Vail by Jenipher R. Jones. Certificate of Service: 06/30/2020. [20-1469] (JRJ) [Entered: 06/30/2020 06:02 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 69 ADDITIONAL CITATION filed by Ms. Jennifer Bennett for Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders. Certificate of Service: 06/22/2020. [20-1469] (JB) [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:50 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 68 CAUSE ARGUED, (via video), by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Appellant Oakland County, MI and Ms. Jennifer Bennett for Appellees Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Raj Lee, Mr. Michael Cameron and Mr. Matthew Saunders before Judges: Cole, Bush and Larsen. (LTK) [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:07 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 67 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Human Rights Defense Center, Rights Behind Bars, Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center and The Ohio Justice and Policy Center , without parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/17/2020. [20-1469] (SW) [Entered: 06/17/2020 09:22 AM]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING motions to file a brief of Amici Curiae filed by Public Health Experts Robert L. Cohen, M.D. and Brie Williams, M.D., M.S. [ # 57 ], and Prison Rights Organizations Rights Behind Bars, The Human Rights Defense Center, The Ohio Justice and Policy Center, and The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center [ # 63 ]. Entered by order of the court. (LAJ) [Entered: 06/16/2020 05:27 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 65 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Ms. Jennifer Bennett for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2020. [20-1469] (JB) [Entered: 06/16/2020 09:46 AM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 64 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Robert C. Clark for Appellant Oakland County, MI. Certificate of Service: 06/16/2020. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 06/16/2020 09:44 AM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by Samuel David Kinder Weiss for The Human Rights Defense Center; The Ohio Justice and Policy Center; Rights Behind Bars; The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center.. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469] (SW) [Entered: 06/15/2020 04:31 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 62 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Robert C. Clark for Appellant Oakland County, MI Certificate of Service:06/15/2020. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 06/15/2020 03:33 PM]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER filed GRANTING Unopposed MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to enlarge in regard to reply brief [ # 55 ]. Entered by order of the court. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/15/2020 03:08 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 60 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for The Human Rights Defense Center; The Ohio Justice and Policy Center; Rights Behind Bars; The Roderick and Solange MacArthur Justice Center. by Samuel David Kinder Weiss. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469] (SW) [Entered: 06/15/2020 02:41 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew A. Nickelhoff for Amici Curiae Robert L. Cohen and Brie Williams Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469] (AAN) [Entered: 06/15/2020 01:59 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 58 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Brie Williams and Robert L. Cohen , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/15/2020. [20-1469] (AAN) [Entered: 06/15/2020 01:58 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by Andrew Nickelhoff for Robert L. Cohen, M.D., and Brie Williams, M.D., M.S. (Public Health Experts). Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469] (AAN) [Entered: 06/15/2020 01:44 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 56 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Robert L. Cohen, M.D. and Brie Williams, M.D., M.S. (Public Health Experts) by Andrew Nickelhoff. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469] (AAN) [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:30 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to enlarge in regard to reply brief. Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/15/2020 by RLJ] (RCC) [Entered: 06/15/2020 12:19 PM]
June 15, 2020 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Danielle Cheree Jefferis for Amici Curiae Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley and Eldon Vail Certificate of Service: 06/15/2020. [20-1469] (DCJ) [Entered: 06/15/2020 10:08 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 53 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Corrections Experts Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley, Eldon Vail , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/12/2020. [20-1469] (DCJ) [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:04 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 52 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Corrections Experts Martin F. Horn, Steve J. Martin, Richard Morgan, Dan Pacholke, Emmitt Sparkman, Phil Stanley, Eldon Vail by Danielle C. Jefferis. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-1469] (DCJ) [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:01 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 51 VIDEO ARGUMENT SCHEDULED for 2:00 p.m. (Eastern Time) on Monday, June 22, 2020. (LAG) [Entered: 06/12/2020 03:00 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 50 Errata to the inadvertently omitted Addendum-Designation of Relevant District Court Documents for the Appellee Brief filed June 10, 2020. filed by Mr. Deepak Gupta for Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders. Certificate of Service: 06/11/2020. [20-1469] (DG) [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:32 AM]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER filed granting motion to stay injunction pending appeal [ # 34 ] filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark.. Decision not for publication. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Chief Judge (DISSENTING); John K. Bush and Joan L. Larsen, Circuit Judges. (CL) [Entered: 06/11/2020 11:03 AM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 48 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Jennifer Bennett for Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders Certificate of Service:06/10/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-1469] (JB) [Entered: 06/10/2020 11:36 PM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 34 ]; previously filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI. Response from Attorney Mr. Deepak Gupta for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders Certificate of Service:06/08/2020. [20-1469] (DG) [Entered: 06/08/2020 04:16 PM]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER filed GRANTING motion to enlarge appellant brief [ # 28 ] filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark., GRANTING unopposed motion to exceed word limit [ # 43 ] filed by Ms. Jennifer Bennett.; and GRANTING motion for leave to file brief of Major County Sheriffs of America and National Sheriffs' Association as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendant-Appellant [ # 44 ]. Entered by order of the court. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:11 PM]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER filed GRANTING motion to file amicus brief filed by Kristen L. Baiardi on behalf of Michigan Sheriffs Association [ # 36 ]. Entered by order of the court. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/08/2020 08:39 AM]
June 8, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by Steven H. Cook for Major County Sheriffs of America and National Sheriffs Association. Certificate of Service: 06/08/2020. [20-1469] (SHC) [Entered: 06/08/2020 08:01 AM]
June 7, 2020 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION filed by Ms. Jennifer Bennett for Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders to exceed word limit (not to exceed 18,411 words). Certificate of Service: 06/07/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ] (JB) [Entered: 06/07/2020 02:38 PM]
June 6, 2020 Filing 42 **LOCKED - THIS DOCUMENT IS A MOTION - COUNSEL ADVISED TO REDOCKET AS MOTION TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF** AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for MCSA and NSA by Steven H. Cook. Certificate of Service: 06/06/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ] (SHC) [Entered: 06/06/2020 07:56 AM]
June 6, 2020 Filing 41 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Steven H. Cook for Major County Sheriffs of America and National Sheriffs' Association, without parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/06/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ] (SHC) [Entered: 06/06/2020 07:45 AM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 40 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Major County Sheriffs of America, National Sheriffs' Association by Keith Hollingshead-Cook. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ] (KH) [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:29 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 39 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Major County Sheriffs of America and National Sheriffs Association by Steven H. Cook. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ] (SHC) [Entered: 06/05/2020 09:21 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 38 AMICUS BRIEF filed by USA , federal/state government. Certificate of Service:06/05/2020. [20-1469] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:57 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 37 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Michigan Sheriffs' Association , without parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/05/2020. [20-1469] (KLB) [Entered: 06/05/2020 03:38 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by Kristen L. Baiardi for Michigan Sheriffs Association. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469] (KLB) [Entered: 06/05/2020 02:24 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 35 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Michigan Sheriffs Association by Kristen L. Baiardi. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/08/2020 by RLJ] (KLB) [Entered: 06/05/2020 01:19 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 34 (Renewed) EMERGENCY MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to immediately stay proceedings pending determination of appeal. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/05/2020 by RLJ] (RCC) [Entered: 06/05/2020 12:12 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 33 APPEARANCE filed for Amicus Curiae USA by Andrew Goetz. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:41 AM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 32 **LOCKED - INCORRECT DESIGNATION - COUNSEL WILL REDOCKET** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Oakland County, MI by Andrew Goetz. Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 06/05/2020 by RLJ] (AG) [Entered: 06/05/2020 10:31 AM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 31 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI Certificate of Service:06/03/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 06/03/2020 04:28 PM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 30 RECORD RECEIVED from Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI. Aty/Pty - CD/DVD, Comment: 5 copies of audio recording , Sealed: None. (ALM) [Entered: 06/03/2020 12:06 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 29 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders by Alexandria Twinem. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2020. [20-1469] (AT) [Entered: 06/02/2020 11:39 AM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 06/01/2020. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 06/01/2020 03:53 PM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 27 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Oakland County, MI by Thomas M. DeAgostino. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2020. [20-1469] (TMD) [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:52 PM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 26 *LOCKED - NOT ACCEPTED FOR FILING - COUNSEL REDOCKETED CORRECTLY IN RE 27 BELOW** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Oakland County, MI and Mr. Curtis D. Childs and Michael Bouchard by Thomas M. DeAgostino. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 05/28/2020 by RLJ] (TMD) [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:25 PM]
May 27, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting expedited briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/03/2020; appellee brief now due 06/10/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/27/2020 10:14 AM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Oakland County, MI by Peter L. Menna. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2020. [20-1469] (PLM) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:43 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders by Philip Mayor. Certificate of Service: 05/26/2020. [20-1469] (PEM) [Entered: 05/26/2020 12:49 PM]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER filed: The motion to stay is DENIED, the motion to expedite is GRANTED, and the motion to strike is DENIED AS MOOT. Upon submission, the merits panel will determine whether it will expedite oral argument or a decision [ # 8 ] [ # 9 ] [ # 21 ] [ # 8 ]. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Chief Circuit Judge; Ralph B. Guy, Jr., Circuit Judge and John K. Bush (dissenting), Circuit Judge. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/26/2020 11:38 AM]
May 24, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION filed by Ms. Jennifer Bennett for Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders for to strike a portion of Appellants' reply in support of their motion to stay Certificate of Service: 05/24/2020. [20-1469] (JB) [Entered: 05/24/2020 05:59 PM]
May 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER filed GRANTING emergency motion exceed page limit of reply to response in opposition to motion for stay of district court order [ # 18 ] filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark.. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/24/2020 12:08 PM]
May 24, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Attorney Mr. Robert C. Clark for Appellant Oakland County, MI to response in opposition to emergency motion for stay. Certificate of Service:05/24/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 05/24/2020 by RLJ] (RCC) [Entered: 05/24/2020 11:51 AM]
May 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 05/24/2020. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 05/24/2020 11:13 AM]
May 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to expedite submisstion on briefs, [ # 8 ]; previously filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI, regarding a motion stay district court order, [ # 8 ]; previously filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI. Response from Attorney Mr. Deepak Gupta for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders Certificate of Service:05/23/2020. [20-1469] (DG) [Entered: 05/23/2020 11:57 AM]
May 23, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed regarding a motion to expedite briefing schedule, [ # 9 ]; previously filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI. Response from Attorney Mr. Deepak Gupta for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders Certificate of Service:05/23/2020. [20-1469] (DG) [Entered: 05/23/2020 10:05 AM]
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER filed GRANTING emergency motion exceed page limit of response to emergency motion to stay [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Deepak Gupta. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/23/2020 06:48 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION filed by Mr. Deepak Gupta for Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders to exceed page limit. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (DG) [Entered: 05/22/2020 05:03 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders by Cary S. McGehee. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (CSM) [Entered: 05/22/2020 04:40 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders by Daniel S. Korobkin. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (DSK) [Entered: 05/22/2020 03:03 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders by Deepak Gupta. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (DG) [Entered: 05/22/2020 12:30 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Mr. Richard Briggs, Mr. Jamaal Cameron, Mr. Michael Cameron, Mr. Raj Lee and Mr. Matthew Saunders by Jennifer Bennett. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (JB) [Entered: 05/22/2020 12:19 PM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to expedite briefing schedule and argument. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 05/22/2020 by RLJ] (RCC) [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:58 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI stay district court order and expedite submission on briefs. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 05/22/2020 by RLJ] (RCC) [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:49 AM]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER filed GRANTING emergency motion to exceed page limit of emergency motion to stay [ # 6 ] [ # 6 ] filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/22/2020 10:23 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION filed by Mr. Robert C. Clark for Oakland County, MI to exceed page limit of Emergency Motion to Stay. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469]--[Edited 05/22/2020 by RLJ] (RCC) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:58 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Robert C. Clark for Appellant Oakland County, MI. Certificate of Service:05/22/2020. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:51 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Michael Bouchard, Mr. Curtis D. Childs and Appellant Oakland County, MI by Robert C. Clark. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (RCC) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:49 AM]
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Michael Bouchard, Mr. Curtis D. Childs and Appellant Oakland County, MI by Steven M. Potter. Certificate of Service: 05/22/2020. [20-1469] (SMP) [Entered: 05/22/2020 09:46 AM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 05/21/2020 03:23 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Oakland County, MI. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 05/21/2020 03:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jamaal Cameron, et al v. Michael Bouchard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MATTHEW SAUNDERS
Represented By: Thomas Bradford Harvey
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jennifer Bennett
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Allison L. Kriger
Represented By: Krithika Santhanam
Represented By: Philip Edwin Mayor
Represented By: Kevin M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL CAMERON
Represented By: Thomas Bradford Harvey
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jennifer Bennett
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Allison L. Kriger
Represented By: Krithika Santhanam
Represented By: Philip Edwin Mayor
Represented By: Kevin M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD BRIGGS
Represented By: Thomas Bradford Harvey
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jennifer Bennett
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Allison L. Kriger
Represented By: Krithika Santhanam
Represented By: Philip Edwin Mayor
Represented By: Kevin M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMAAL CAMERON
Represented By: Thomas Bradford Harvey
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jennifer Bennett
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Allison L. Kriger
Represented By: Krithika Santhanam
Represented By: Philip Edwin Mayor
Represented By: Kevin M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAJ LEE
Represented By: Thomas Bradford Harvey
Represented By: Cary S. McGehee
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jennifer Bennett
Represented By: Alexandria Twinem
Represented By: Allison L. Kriger
Represented By: Krithika Santhanam
Represented By: Philip Edwin Mayor
Represented By: Kevin M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BOUCHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS D. CHILDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OAKLAND COUNTY, MI
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Represented By: Thomas M. DeAgostino
Represented By: Steven M. Potter
Represented By: Robert C. Clark
Represented By: Thomas M. DeAgostino I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EMMITT SPARKMAN, Warden, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELDON VAIL, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHIL STANLEY, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Steven H. Cook
Represented By: Keith Hollingshead-Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO JUSTICE & POLICY CENTER
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRIE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHIGAN SHERIFFS' ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Kristen Lara Baiardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTIN F. HORN, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Andrew Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RODERICK AND SOLANGE MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STEVE J. MARTIN, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RICHARD MORGAN, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAN PACHOLKE, Corrections Expert
Represented By: Jenipher R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MAJOR COUNTY SHERIFFS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Steven H. Cook
Represented By: Keith Hollingshead-Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RIGHTS BEHIND BARS
Represented By: Samuel Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT L. COHEN, M.D.
Represented By: Andrew A. Nickelhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?