Mati Leeal, et al v. Ditech Financial LLC
Defendant / Appellee: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, fka Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: MALKA LEEAL and MATI LEEAL
Case Number: 20-1639
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 10 ] filed by Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/30/2020. appellee brief now due 10/30/2020. (JEC) [Entered: 09/01/2020 12:01 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION filed by Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Malka Leeal and Mati Leeal to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/31/2020. [20-1639] (DPF) [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:45 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Nathan H. Blaske for Appellee Ditech Financial LLC Certificate of Service: 07/24/2020. [20-1639] (NHB) [Entered: 07/24/2020 10:30 AM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Ditech Financial LLC by Nathan H. Blaske. Certificate of Service: 07/23/2020. [20-1639] (NHB) [Entered: 07/23/2020 12:08 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/31/2020;. appellee brief due 09/30/2020; (JEC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:07 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Appellants Malka Leeal and Mati Leeal. Certificate of Service:07/22/2020. [20-1639] (DPF) [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:45 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Malka Leeal and Mati Leeal. fCertificate of Service: 07/22/2020. [20-1639] (DPF) [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:25 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Appellants Malka Leeal and Mati Leeal Certificate of Service: 07/22/2020. [20-1639] (DPF) [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:18 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Malka Leeal and Mati Leeal by Darwyn P. Fair. Certificate of Service: 07/22/2020. [20-1639] (DPF) [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:14 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Jill Colyer (JEC) [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:34 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Malka Leeal and Mati Leeal. Transcript needed: y. (JEC) [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mati Leeal, et al v. Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, fka Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Represented By: Nathan H. Blaske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MALKA LEEAL
Represented By: Darwyn Prentiss Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATI LEEAL
Represented By: Darwyn Prentiss Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?