Michael Kitchen v. Rick Snyder, et al
Defendant / Appellee: COREY GRAHN, THOMAS J. DOYLE, ANTHONY CROLL, HEIDI SLUSHER, HEIDI E. WASHINGTON, RICK SNYDER, Governor, CARMEN DENISE PALMER, Warden, TERI BYRNE and CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL ANDREW KITCHEN
Case Number: 20-1936
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER SENT to Michael Andrew Kitchen enclosing copy of public docket sheet setting forth counsels of record for all appellees which he is required to serve a copy of his brief. (RLJ) [Entered: 11/12/2020 01:49 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 CORRESPONDENCE: asking whether or not appellee counsel VanderVeen has entered an appearance by Michael Andrew Kitchen. (RLJ) [Entered: 11/12/2020 01:47 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/04/2020; appellee brief due 01/06/2021. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:54 AM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Ronald W. Chapman, Sr. for Appellees Corizon Health, Inc. and Corey Grahn Certificate of Service: 10/22/2020. [20-1936] (RWC) [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:01 AM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Corizon Health, Inc. and Corey Grahn by Ronald W. Chapman Sr.. Certificate of Service: 10/22/2020. [20-1936] (RWC) [Entered: 10/22/2020 09:00 AM]
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Teri Byrne, Anthony Croll and Heidi Slusher by Alicia Lane. Certificate of Service: 10/20/2020. [20-1936] (AL) [Entered: 10/20/2020 01:10 PM]
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Copy of District Court Order filed 09/30/20 granting in forma pauperis. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 05:19 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Doctor Thomas J. Doyle by Joseph P. VanderVeen. Certificate of Service: 09/28/2020. [20-1936] (JPV) [Entered: 09/28/2020 05:35 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:20 PM]
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Michael Andrew Kitchen. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Kitchen v. Rick Snyder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COREY GRAHN
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS J. DOYLE
Represented By: Joseph Patrick VanderVeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY CROLL
Represented By: O.G. Joseph Paul Reasons
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEIDI SLUSHER
Represented By: O.G. Joseph Paul Reasons
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEIDI E. WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICK SNYDER, Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARMEN DENISE PALMER, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERI BYRNE
Represented By: O.G. Joseph Paul Reasons
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL ANDREW KITCHEN
Represented By: Michael Andrew Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?