Henry Hill, et al v. Craig Whitford, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DIANNE HILL and HENRY L. HILL
Defendant / Appellee: JON SNYDER, CITY OF LANSING, MI and CRAIG WHITFORD
Case Number: 20-2076
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/02/2021. appellee brief now due 03/04/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 12/16/2020 11:31 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 21 Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: Counsel for the Appellee is directed to provide an update to the Mediator, John Minter, by 12/22/2020. [Please open letter for important details.] (LMR) [Entered: 12/16/2020 11:29 AM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/19/2021;. appellee brief due 02/18/2021; (VLP) [Entered: 12/10/2020 09:25 AM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 Transcript, [10], has been filed in the District Court on 12/04/2020 ; Court Reporter: Mr. Paul G. Brandell ; Actual Number of Pages: 43 ; Actual Number of Volumes: 1 ; District Court No: 1:12-cv-00291 (VLP) [Entered: 12/10/2020 09:22 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 12/15/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 11/24/2020 03:35 PM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 RULING LETTER SENT to dismiss Jon Snyder as party to the appeal. (VLP) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:43 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Mary Massaron for Appellees City of Lansing, MI, Jon Snyder and Craig Whitford Certificate of Service: 11/12/2020. [20-2076] (MM) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:47 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Mary Massaron for Appellees City of Lansing, MI, Jon Snyder and Craig Whitford Certificate of Service: 11/12/2020. [20-2076] (MM) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:46 AM]
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Mary Massaron for Appellees City of Lansing, MI, Jon Snyder and Craig Whitford Certificate of Service: 11/12/2020. [20-2076] (MM) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:45 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [10] Transcript to be filed in district court by Paul G. Brandell by 12/09/2020. (VLP) [Entered: 11/09/2020 10:01 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Mr. Paul G. Brandell, for transcript [10] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 11/07/2020 ; Estimated completion date: 12/06/2020 ; Estimated number of pages: 41 . [20-2076] (PGB) [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:19 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [10]. Paul G. Brandell's acknowledgement is due 11/23/2020. (VLP) [Entered: 11/09/2020 08:41 AM]
November 7, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Mr. Paul G. Brandell, filed by Mr. J. Nicholas Bostic for Dianne Hill and Henry L. Hill. [10] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 11/07/2020 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Hon. Janet T. Neff ; Hearing Dates: October 30, 2020, oral argument on motion for summary judgment. ; Other: A January 23, 2020 status conference is already on file. ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2020. [20-2076] (JNB) [Entered: 11/07/2020 10:54 AM]
November 7, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. J. Nicholas Bostic for Appellants Dianne Hill and Henry L. Hill.. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2020. [20-2076] (JNB) [Entered: 11/07/2020 10:50 AM]
November 7, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. J. Nicholas Bostic for Appellants Dianne Hill and Henry L. Hill Certificate of Service: 11/07/2020. [20-2076] (JNB) [Entered: 11/07/2020 10:49 AM]
November 7, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. J. Nicholas Bostic for Appellants Dianne Hill and Henry L. Hill Certificate of Service: 11/07/2020. [20-2076] (JNB) [Entered: 11/07/2020 10:49 AM]
November 7, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Dianne Hill and Henry L. Hill by J. Nicholas Bostic. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2020. [20-2076] (JNB) [Entered: 11/07/2020 10:48 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jon Snyder, Craig Whitford and City of Lansing, MI by Mary Massaron. Certificate of Service: 11/03/2020. [20-2076] (MM) [Entered: 11/03/2020 02:53 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/02/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 11/03/2020 11:56 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 11/03/2020 11:52 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Virginia Padgett (VLP) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:58 AM]
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Dianne Hill and Henry L. Hill. Transcript needed: y. (VLP) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Henry Hill, et al v. Craig Whitford, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANNE HILL
Represented By: J. Nicholas Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HENRY L. HILL
Represented By: J. Nicholas Bostic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JON SNYDER
Represented By: Mary Massaron
Represented By: David K. Otis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF LANSING, MI
Represented By: Mary Massaron
Represented By: David K. Otis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRAIG WHITFORD
Represented By: Mary Massaron
Represented By: David K. Otis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?