Wendy Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, TROTT LAW, P.C., HSBC BANK USA, NA, Individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, MICHAEL MCDERMOTT, HEIDI MYSAZK and OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, nka PHH Mortgage Corporation, Successor by Merger
Plaintiff / Appellant: WENDY B ADELSON and WENDY B. ADELSON
Case Number: 20-2204
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to dismiss - jurisdiction, [ # 15 ]; previously filed by Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA. Response from Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B Adelson. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2021. [20-2204] (WND) [Entered: 01/30/2021 03:02 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss. (REO) [Entered: 01/25/2021 11:38 AM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION filed by Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2021. [20-2204] (NSR) [Entered: 01/21/2021 05:15 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/08/2021; appellee brief due 03/10/2021. (REO) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:23 AM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER SENT to Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B Adelson, Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA, Mr. Thomas M. Schehr for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ms. Jill Margaret Wheaton for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA, regarding corrected caption. (REO) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:04 AM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER SENT to Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B Adelson, Mr. John P. Kapitan for Trott Law, P.C., Mr. Michael McDermott and Ms. Heidi Mysazk, Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA, Mr. Thomas M. Schehr for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ms. Jill Margaret Wheaton for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA, regarding corrected caption and list of parties on appeal. (REO) [Entered: 12/29/2020 03:27 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2204] (NSR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:47 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2204] (NSR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:46 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B Adelson Certificate of Service: 12/29/2020. [20-2204] (WND) [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:45 AM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Ms. Wendy B Adelson. fCertificate of Service: 12/28/2020. [20-2204] (WND) [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:23 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Wendell N. Davis, Jr. for Appellant Ms. Wendy B Adelson.. Certificate of Service: 12/28/2020. [20-2204] (WND) [Entered: 12/28/2020 04:43 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ms. Wendy B Adelson by Wendell N. Davis, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 12/28/2020. [20-2204] (WND) [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:06 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and HSBC Bank USA, NA by Jill M. Wheaton. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2020. [20-2204] (JMW) [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:29 AM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Thomas M. Schehr. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2020. [20-2204] (TMS) [Entered: 12/14/2020 04:21 PM]
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees HSBC Bank USA, NA and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC by Nasseem S. Ramin. Certificate of Service: 12/14/2020. [20-2204] (NSR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 04:18 PM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:34 AM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Wendy B. Adelson. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 12/10/2020 11:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wendy Adelson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TROTT LAW, P.C.
Represented By: John P. Kapitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC BANK USA, NA, Individually and as Trustee on behalf of ACE SECURITIES HOME EQUITY LOAN TRUST SERIES 2007-HE1, ASSET BACKED PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Represented By: Nasseem Sara Ramin
Represented By: Jill Margaret Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL MCDERMOTT
Represented By: John P. Kapitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEIDI MYSAZK
Represented By: John P. Kapitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, nka PHH Mortgage Corporation, Successor by Merger
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Represented By: Nasseem Sara Ramin
Represented By: Jill Margaret Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WENDY B ADELSON
Represented By: Wendell N. Davis Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WENDY B. ADELSON
Represented By: Wendell N. Davis Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?