Anthony Gates, Jr. v. Connie Horton
Petitioner / Appellant: ANTHONY CLIFFORD GATES, JR.
Respondent / Appellee: CONNIE HORTON, Warden
Case Number: 20-2295
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Copy of District Court Order filed 02/17/2021 at RE #31 granting in forma pauperis. (MTW) [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:59 AM]
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee or file motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the District Court. The fee or motion is now due 03/12/2021. (MTW) [Entered: 02/10/2021 11:37 AM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Deficiency notice filed 01/06/2021 in D.Ct. at RE#28 - petitioner has 28 days to pay the fee or file mo for ifp in the D.Ct. (MTW) [Entered: 01/08/2021 05:11 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Maria Welker (MTW) [Entered: 12/30/2020 02:27 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed denying a certificate of appealability. Notice filed by Appellant Anthony Clifford Gates, Jr.. Transcript needed: n. (MTW) [Entered: 12/30/2020 02:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anthony Gates, Jr. v. Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ANTHONY CLIFFORD GATES, JR.
Represented By: Anthony Clifford Gates Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CONNIE HORTON, Warden
Represented By: John S. Pallas
Represented By: Jared D. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?