Walid Jammal, et al v. American Family Ins Co, et al
Defendant / Appellee: AMERICAN STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN, AMERICAN FAMILY 401K PLAN, GROUP HEALTH PLAN, AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, COMMITTEE OF EMPLOYEES AND DISTRICT MANAGER RETIREMENT PLAN, AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST, AMERICAN FAMILY TERMINATION BENEFITS PLAN, 401K PLAN ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE, GROUP DENTAL PLAN, LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, GROUP LIFE PLAN, RETIREMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP and AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellant: NATHAN GARRETT, WALID JAMMAL, PATRICIA MCCLAIN-EVANS, DANA LARICHE, CINDA J. DURACHINSKY, KATHLEEN TUERSLEY and JOHN VINCENT
Amicus Curiae: AARP FOUNDATION and AARP
Case Number: 20-3226
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group communicating dates of unavailability for oral argument: October 5-9, 2020, October 19-23, 2020, November 16-20, 2020, and November 30-December 4, 2020.. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-3226] (LSK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 05:01 PM]
August 31, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Charles J Crueger for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley. Certificate of Service: 08/31/2020. [20-3226] (CJC) [Entered: 08/31/2020 01:02 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 35 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 34 ] filed by Mr. Charles J Crueger., setting reply brief deadline: reply brief due 08/31/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:11 AM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION filed by Mr. Charles J Crueger for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/11/2020. [20-3226] (CJC) [Entered: 08/11/2020 10:45 AM]
August 3, 2020 Filing 33 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group. Certificate of Service: 08/03/2020. Argument Request: not requested. [20-3226] (LSK) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:47 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 32 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Mark E. Silvey. Certificate of Service: 07/14/2020. [20-3226] (MES) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:22 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 31 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Gregory F. Coleman. Certificate of Service: 07/14/2020. [20-3226] (GFC) [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:17 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 30 RULING LETTER SENT granting the Appellee's motion to extend time to file brief by 14 days [ # 29 ] filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley., resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 08/03/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 07/10/2020 04:06 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2020. [20-3226] (LSK) [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:18 PM]
June 25, 2020 Filing 28 RULING LETTER SENT granting the Appellee's motion to extend time to file brief by 14 days [ # 27 ] filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley., resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 07/20/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 06/25/2020 08:22 AM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION filed by Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley for 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/24/2020. [20-3226] (LSK) [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:51 PM]
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 CORRECTED AMICUS BRIEF filed by AARP and AARP Foundation Daniel B Kohrman , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/11/2020. [20-3226]--[Edited 06/11/2020 by CAM] (DBK) [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:00 AM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Daniel Benjamin Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation because the party designations are incorrect. Corrected brief due: 06/12/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 06/10/2020 04:33 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 ***LOCKED--SEE CORRECTION LETTER [ # 25 ]***AMICUS BRIEF filed by Daniel B Kohrman for AARP and AARP Foundation, with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:06/10/2020. [20-3226]--[Edited 06/10/2020 by CAM] (DBK) [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:18 PM]
June 9, 2020 Filing 23 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for AARP and AARP Foundation by Daniel B Kohrman. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2020. [20-3226] (DBK) [Entered: 06/09/2020 02:19 PM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 22 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Charles J Crueger for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley Certificate of Service:06/03/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-3226] (CJC) [Entered: 06/03/2020 03:45 PM]
April 7, 2020 Filing 21 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 04/07/2020 12:24 PM]
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 06/03/2020. appellee brief now due 07/06/2020. (MLB) [Entered: 04/06/2020 03:56 PM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/29/2020; appellee brief due 05/29/2020. (CAM) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:16 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Ms. Kara A. Elgersma for Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley. Certificate of Service: 03/20/2020. [20-3226] (KAE) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:03 AM]
March 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed by the appellants. If not completed by 03/23/2020 further action will be taken. Please note, if transcripts are already on file, unnecessary for appeal, or there were no hearings, counsel must make the docket entry reflecting that information.--[Edited 03/20/2020 by CAM to show party obligated to file] (CAM) [Entered: 03/20/2020 08:58 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER SENT to Mr. Charles J Crueger and Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley regarding the amended official caption. (CAM) [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:44 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Edward A. Wallace. Certificate of Service: 03/19/2020. [20-3226] (EAW) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:11 AM]
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Kara A. Elergsma. Certificate of Service: 03/19/2020. [20-3226] (KAE) [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:19 AM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal and Kathleen Tuersley by Erin K. Dickinson. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2020. [20-3226] (EKD) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:05 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Charles J Crueger for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal, Dana LaRiche, Patricia McClain-Evans, Kathleen Tuersley and John Vincent Certificate of Service: 03/18/2020. [20-3226] (CJC) [Entered: 03/18/2020 05:02 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Charles J Crueger for Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal, Dana LaRiche, Patricia McClain-Evans, Kathleen Tuersley and John Vincent. Certificate of Service:03/18/2020. [20-3226] (CJC) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:59 PM]
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Walid Jammal, Kathleen Tuersley, Cinda J. Durachinsky and Nathan Garrett by Charles J. Crueger. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2020. [20-3226] (CJC) [Entered: 03/18/2020 04:52 PM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Gilbert P. Brosky. Certificate of Service: 03/10/2020. [20-3226] (GB) [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:22 AM]
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Gregory V. Mersol. Certificate of Service: 03/10/2020. [20-3226] (GVM) [Entered: 03/10/2020 11:17 AM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Lauren Suzanne Kuley for Appellees 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group Certificate of Service: 03/09/2020. [20-3226] (LSK) [Entered: 03/09/2020 04:52 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Scott W. Coyle. Certificate of Service: 03/09/2020. [20-3226] (SWC) [Entered: 03/09/2020 04:33 PM]
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees 401k Plan Administrative Committee, American Family 401k Plan, American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Group Master Retirement Trust, American Family Life Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Termination Benefits Plan, American Standard Insurance Company of Wisconsin, Committee of Employees and District Manager Retirement Plan, Group Dental Plan, Group Health Plan, Group Life Plan, Long Term Disability Plan and Retirement Plan For Employees of American Family Insurance Group by Lauren S. Kuley. Certificate of Service: 03/09/2020. [20-3226] (LSK) [Entered: 03/09/2020 04:28 PM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:49 AM]
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 02/28/2020 09:48 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:25 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Cinda J. Durachinsky, Patricia McClain-Evans, Nathan Garrett, Walid Jammal, Dana LaRiche, Kathleen Tuersley and John Vincent. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Walid Jammal, et al v. American Family Ins Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY 401K PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GROUP HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMITTEE OF EMPLOYEES AND DISTRICT MANAGER RETIREMENT PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP MASTER RETIREMENT TRUST
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY TERMINATION BENEFITS PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 401K PLAN ADMINISTRATIVE COMMITTEE
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GROUP DENTAL PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GROUP LIFE PLAN
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RETIREMENT PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Nancy F. Rigby
Represented By: Rodger L. Eckelberry
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Represented By: Scott W. Coyle
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATHAN GARRETT
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALID JAMMAL
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA MCCLAIN-EVANS
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANA LARICHE
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CINDA J. DURACHINSKY
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHLEEN TUERSLEY
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Mark E. Silvey
Represented By: Greg Frederic Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN VINCENT
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP FOUNDATION
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AARP
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Kohrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?