Susan Beiersdorfer, et al v. Frank LaRose, et al
Plaintiff: DARIO HUNTER
Defendant / Appellee: DOUGLAS J. PRIESSE, in his official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections, CHARLES E. WILLIAMS, in his official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections, KATE MCGUCKIN, in her official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections, DAVID W. FOX, in his official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections, JAMES V. STEWART, in his official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections, KIMBERLY E. MARINELLO, in her official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections, HELEN WALKER, in her official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections, MARK E. MUNROE, in his official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections, SHARON A. RAY, in her official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections, AUNDREA CARPENTER-COLVIN, in her official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections, DAVID KARMOL, in his official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections, BRENDA HILL, in her official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections, DAVID BETRAS, in his official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections, BRAD K. SINNOTT, in his official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections, PAULA J. WOOD, in her official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections, FRANK LAROSE, in his offical capacity as Secretary of State of the State of Ohio, MICHAEL E. SEXTON, in his official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections, JOHN V. WELKER, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections, DENISE L. SMITH, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections, ELAYNE J. CROSS, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections, PATRICIA NELSON, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections, LARRY G. CRAY, in his official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections, PAMELA B. MILLER, in her official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections, JOSHUA HUGHES, in his official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections, DORIA DANIELS, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections, RICHARD F. SCHOEN, in his official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections, ROBERT WASKO, in his official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections, KEN RYAN, in his official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections, TRACEY S. WINBUSH, in her official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections and CHARLES E. CALVERT, in his official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections
Plaintiff / Appellant: KATHARINE S. JONES, BRYAN TWITCHELL, SALLY JO WILEY, DAMON RAE, SUSAN S. BEIERSDORFER, SARAQUOIA BRYANT, GWEN B. FISCHER, GREGORY THOMAS PACE, GREGORY D. HOWARD, GERALD T. DOLCINI, WILLIAM LYONS and MARKIE MILLER
Case Number: 20-3557
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [18] Transcript to be filed in district court by Mary L. Uphold by 08/05/2020. (REO) [Entered: 07/06/2020 03:05 PM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Mary L. Uphold, for transcript [18] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 06/19/2020 ; Estimated completion date: 07/20/2020 ; Estimated number of pages: 75 . [20-3557] (MLU) [Entered: 07/06/2020 10:54 AM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [18]. Mary L. Uphold's acknowledgement is due 07/06/2020. (REO) [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:04 PM]
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ordered from Ms. Mary L. Uphold, filed by Mr. Terry J. Lodge for Susan S. Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T. Dolcini, Gwen B. Fischer, Gregory D. Howard, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damon Rae, Bryan Twitchell and Sally Jo Wiley. [18] ; ----- This is to order a transcript of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 06/19/2020 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Pearson ; Hearing Dates: 8/26/2019 Motion oral argument hearing ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 06/19/2020. [20-3557] (TJL) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:11 PM]
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Doria Daniels, Elayne J. Cross, Patricia Nelson and Denise L. Smith by Pamela J. Holder. Certificate of Service: 06/18/2020. [20-3557] (PJH) [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:59 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Larry G. Cray, Pamela B. Miller, Sharon A. Ray and John V. Welker, Jr. by Michael K. Lyons. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3557] (MKL) [Entered: 06/17/2020 03:38 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kimberly E. Marinello, Douglas J. Priesse, Michael E. Sexton and Brad K. Sinnott by Timothy A. Lecklider. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3557] (TAL) [Entered: 06/17/2020 02:10 PM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Kimberly E. Marinello, Douglas J. Priesse, Michael E. Sexton and Brad K. Sinnott by Nick A. Soulas, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 06/17/2020. [20-3557] (NAS) [Entered: 06/17/2020 11:34 AM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Terry J. Lodge for Appellants Susan S. Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T. Dolcini, Gwen B. Fischer, Gregory D. Howard, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damon Rae, Bryan Twitchell and Sally Jo Wiley. Certificate of Service:06/12/2020. [20-3557] (TJL) [Entered: 06/12/2020 11:53 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Susan S. Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T. Dolcini, Gwen B. Fischer, Gregory D. Howard, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damon Rae, Bryan Twitchell and Sally Jo Wiley by Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-3557] (LS) [Entered: 06/12/2020 04:44 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 ***LOCKED - appearance form appears blank, please refile*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Larry G. Cray, Pamela B. Miller, Sharon A. Ray and John V. Welker, Jr. by Michael K. Lyons. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-3557]--[Edited 06/16/2020 by REO] (MKL) [Entered: 06/12/2020 02:02 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Terry J. Lodge for Appellants Susan S. Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T. Dolcini, Gwen B. Fischer, Gregory D. Howard, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damon Rae, Bryan Twitchell and Sally Jo Wiley Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-3557] (TJL) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:40 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Susan S. Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T. Dolcini, Gwen B. Fischer, Gregory D. Howard, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damon Rae, Bryan Twitchell and Sally Jo Wiley by Terry J. Lodge. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-3557] (TJL) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:38 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Frank LaRose by Zachery P. Keller. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-3557] (ZPK) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:14 PM]
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Helen Walker, Kate McGuckin, Ken Ryan, Aundrea Carpenter-Colvin, David W. Fox, James V. Stewart, Charles E. Williams and Paula J. Wood by Zachary L. Saunders. Certificate of Service: 06/12/2020. [20-3557] (ZLS) [Entered: 06/12/2020 11:23 AM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brenda Hill, Joshua Hughes, Richard F. Schoen and David Karmol by John A. Borell, Assistant Prosecutor. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2020. [20-3557] (JAB) [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:52 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Brenda Hill, Joshua Hughes, David Karmol and Richard F. Schoen by Kevin A. Pituch, Assistant Prosecutor. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2020. [20-3557] (KAP) [Entered: 06/02/2020 01:50 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees David Betras, Mark E. Munroe, Tracey S. Winbush and Robert Wasko by Sharon K. Hackett. Certificate of Service: 06/02/2020. [20-3557] (SKH) [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:50 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Frank LaRose by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-3557] (BMF) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:15 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 05/29/2020 10:01 AM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Susan S. Beiersdorfer, Saraquoia Bryant, Gerald T. Dolcini, Gwen B. Fischer, Gregory D. Howard, Katharine S. Jones, William Lyons, Markie Miller, Gregory Thomas Pace, Damon Rae, Bryan Twitchell and Sally Jo Wiley. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 05/29/2020 09:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Susan Beiersdorfer, et al v. Frank LaRose, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS J. PRIESSE, in his official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES E. WILLIAMS, in his official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATE MCGUCKIN, in her official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID W. FOX, in his official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES V. STEWART, in his official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY E. MARINELLO, in her official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HELEN WALKER, in her official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK E. MUNROE, in his official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHARON A. RAY, in her official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections
Represented By: Michael K. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUNDREA CARPENTER-COLVIN, in her official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID KARMOL, in his official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections
Represented By: John A. Borell Sr.
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDA HILL, in her official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections
Represented By: John A. Borell Sr.
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID BETRAS, in his official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD K. SINNOTT, in his official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAULA J. WOOD, in her official capacity as a member of the Megis County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK LAROSE, in his offical capacity as Secretary of State of the State of Ohio
Represented By: Sarah E. Pierce
Represented By: Julie M. Pfeiffer
Represented By: Renata Y. Staff
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Zachery P. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL E. SEXTON, in his official capacity as a member of the Franklin County Board of Elections
Represented By: Nick A. Soulas Jr.
Represented By: Timothy A. Lecklider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN V. WELKER, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections
Represented By: Michael K. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE L. SMITH, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections
Represented By: Christopher J. Meduri
Represented By: Pamela Joy Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELAYNE J. CROSS, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections
Represented By: Christopher J. Meduri
Represented By: Pamela Joy Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA NELSON, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections
Represented By: Christopher J. Meduri
Represented By: Pamela Joy Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY G. CRAY, in his official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections
Represented By: Michael K. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAMELA B. MILLER, in her official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections
Represented By: Michael K. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA HUGHES, in his official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections
Represented By: John A. Borell Sr.
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DORIA DANIELS, in her official capacity as a member of the Portage County Board of Elections
Represented By: Christopher J. Meduri
Represented By: Pamela Joy Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD F. SCHOEN, in his official capacity as a member of the Lucas County Board of Elections
Represented By: John A. Borell Sr.
Represented By: Kevin A. Pituch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT WASKO, in his official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEN RYAN, in his official capacity as a member of the Athens County Board of Elections
Represented By: Zachary L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACEY S. WINBUSH, in her official capacity as a member of the Mahoning County Board of Elections
Represented By: Mark P. D'Apolito
Represented By: Sharon K. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES E. CALVERT, in his official capacity as a member of the Medina County Board of Elections
Represented By: Michael K. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHARINE S. JONES
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYAN TWITCHELL
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SALLY JO WILEY
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAMON RAE
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN S. BEIERSDORFER
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SARAQUOIA BRYANT
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GWEN B. FISCHER
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY THOMAS PACE
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY D. HOWARD
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALD T. DOLCINI
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM LYONS
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARKIE MILLER
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Represented By: Lindsey Schromen-Wawrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIO HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?