Davel Chinn v. Warden, Chillicothe Corr
Petitioner / Appellant: DAVEL CHINN
Respondent / Appellee: WARDEN, CHILLICOTHE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Case Number: 20-3982
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION filed by Melissa J. Jackson, Rachel Troutman, and Erin Gallagher Barnhart for Davel Chinn regarding Notice of Intent to File Motion to Expand Certificate of Appealability by January 8, 2021. Certificate of Service: 11/13/2020. [20-3982]--[Edited 11/13/2020 by PJE] (MJJ) [Entered: 11/13/2020 09:16 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 ***LOCKED - Wrong event used*** FILED: Notice of Intent to File Motion to Expand Certificate of Appealability by Ms. Melissa J. Jackson for Davel Chinn. Certificate of Service: 11/13/2020. [20-3982] COUNSEL is kindly advised to refile document using correct event: notification.--[Edited 11/13/2020 by PJE] (MJJ) [Entered: 11/13/2020 08:56 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Ms. Erin Gallagher Barnhart for Davel Chinn. Certificate of Service: 10/05/2020. [20-3982] (EGB) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:17 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Davel Chinn by Melissa Jackson. Certificate of Service: 10/05/2020. [20-3982] (MJJ) [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:35 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Davel Chinn by Rachel Troutman. Certificate of Service: 10/05/2020. [20-3982] (RGT) [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:32 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Davel Chinn by Erin Gallagher Barnhart. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2020. [20-3982] (EGB) [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:12 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution by Brenda S. Leikala. Certificate of Service: 09/21/2020. [20-3982] (BSL) [Entered: 09/21/2020 09:29 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:56 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 Death Penalty Case Docketed with certificate of appealability granted in part and denied in part. Notice filed by Appellant Davel Chinn. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 09/21/2020 08:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Davel Chinn v. Warden, Chillicothe Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DAVEL CHINN
Represented By: Rachel G. Troutman
Represented By: Erin Gallagher Barnhart
Represented By: Melissa J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WARDEN, CHILLICOTHE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Represented By: Brenda Stacie Leikala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?