Kenneth Hurt v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Plaintiff / Appellant: KENNETH SHANE HURT
Defendant / Appellee: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 20-4048
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Scott McIntyre for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company Certificate of Service: 10/16/2020. [20-4048] (MSM) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:52 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Michael Scott McIntyre. Certificate of Service: 10/13/2020. [20-4048] (MSM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:17 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/01/2020. appellee brief now due 12/30/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:19 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 11/17/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:15 AM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/23/2020;. appellee brief due 12/22/2020; (RGF) [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:33 AM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kenneth Shane Hurt by Marc D. Mezibov. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2020. [20-4048] (MDM) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:09 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Brian Joseph Butler for Kenneth Shane Hurt. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2020. [20-4048] (BJB) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:08 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Brian Joseph Butler for Appellant Kenneth Shane Hurt Certificate of Service: 10/12/2020. [20-4048] (BJB) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:08 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Brian Joseph Butler for Appellant Kenneth Shane Hurt.. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2020. [20-4048] (BJB) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:07 PM]
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Kenneth Shane Hurt by Brian J. Butler. Certificate of Service: 10/12/2020. [20-4048] (BJB) [Entered: 10/12/2020 01:06 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 11/03/2020 at 2:00 PM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:13 PM]
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:12 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:13 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Kenneth Shane Hurt. Transcript needed: y. (RGF) [Entered: 10/06/2020 12:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Hurt v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH SHANE HURT
Represented By: Brian Joseph Butler
Represented By: Marc D. Mezibov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?