Ohio Public Employees Ret v. FHLMC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, on behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated
Defendant / Appellee: EUGENE M. MCQUADE, ANTHONY S. PISZEL, PATRICIA L. COOK, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, aka Freddie Mac and RICHARD F. SYRON
Case Number: 20-4082
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Securities Commodities Exchg.
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Filing 38 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellees motion to extend time to file brief by 30 days [ # 37 ] filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman., resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 03/09/2022. (SSS) [Entered: 01/11/2022 04:01 PM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman for FHLMC to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2022. [20-4082] (JDH) [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:30 PM]
January 6, 2022 Filing 36 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellee brief due 02/07/2022. (SSS) [Entered: 01/06/2022 08:40 AM]
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER filed: Accordingly, the motions to dismiss are DENIED [ # 25 ] [ # 27 ]. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Richard Allen Griffin (dissenting) and Jane Branstetter Stranch, Circuit Judges. (SSS) [Entered: 01/06/2022 08:20 AM]
March 15, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman for FHLMC regarding motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction Certificate of Service: 03/15/2021. [20-4082] (JDH) [Entered: 03/15/2021 10:56 AM]
March 11, 2021 Filing 33 **DEFECTIVE ENTRY**REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Jordan D. Hershman for Appellee FHLMC. Certificate of Service: 03/11/2021. [20-4082]-Counsel instructed to refile using the correct docket entry Response/Reply>reply filed.--[Edited 03/15/2021 by SSS] (JDH) [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:46 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 32 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellees motion extend time to file a reply by 10 days [ # 30 ] filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman. The appellees shall be permitted to file a reply to the response on or before March 11, 2021. (SSS) [Entered: 02/22/2021 03:06 PM]
February 22, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion, [ # 25 ]; previously filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman for FHLMC, regarding a motion, [ # 27 ]; previously filed by Mr. Frank R. Volpe for Richard F. Syron. Response from Attorney Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. Certificate of Service: 02/22/2021. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 02/22/2021 02:45 PM]
February 17, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman for FHLMC to extend timeCertificate of Service: 02/17/2021. [20-4082] (JDH) [Entered: 02/17/2021 04:55 PM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 29 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion extend time to file a response [ # 28 ] filed by Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits. The consolidated response to the motions to dismiss is now due February 22, 2021. (SSS) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:38 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION filed by Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Ohio Public Employees Retirement System to extend timeCertificate of Service: 02/04/2021. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 02/04/2021 04:28 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION filed by Mr. Frank R. Volpe for Richard F. Syron to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 02/01/2021. [20-4082] (FRV) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:57 PM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 26 RULING LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss. The briefing schedule issued November 24, 2020 is cancelled. When this outstanding matter has been resolved, the clerk's office will issue a new briefing schedule or give the parties other instructions. (SSS) [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:34 AM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION filed by Mr. Jordan D. Hershman for FHLMC to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/27/2021. [20-4082] (JDH) [Entered: 01/27/2021 07:46 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee FHLMC by Michael E. Kenneally. Certificate of Service: 01/27/2021. [20-4082] (MEK) [Entered: 01/27/2021 07:15 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 23 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. Certificate of Service: 12/23/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:39 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 RULING LETTER SENT granting joint motion to extend time to file brief [ # 21 ] filed by Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 12/23/2020, appellee brief now due 02/17/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 11/24/2020 12:25 PM]
November 20, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION filed by Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Ohio Public Employees Retirement System to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/20/2020. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:56 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee FHLMC by Emily E. Renshaw. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4082] (ER) [Entered: 11/04/2020 10:36 AM]
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Patricia L. Cook by Carl S. Kravitz. Certificate of Service: 10/30/2020. [20-4082] (CSK) [Entered: 10/30/2020 12:00 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James K. Goldfarb for Appellee Anthony S. Piszel Certificate of Service: 10/29/2020. [20-4082] (JKG) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:56 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Richard F. Syron by Frank R. Volpe. Certificate of Service: 10/29/2020. [20-4082] (FRV) [Entered: 10/29/2020 01:51 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Anthony S. Piszel by Michael V. Rella. Certificate of Service: 10/29/2020. [20-4082] (MVR) [Entered: 10/29/2020 01:42 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Anthony S. Piszel by James K. Goldfarb. Certificate of Service: 10/29/2020. [20-4082] (JKG) [Entered: 10/29/2020 01:30 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee FHLMC by Hugh E. McKay. Certificate of Service: 10/29/2020. [20-4082] (HEM) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:59 AM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Anthony S. Piszel by Joseph C. Weinstein. Certificate of Service: 10/29/2020. [20-4082] (JCW) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:47 AM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason D. Frank for Appellee FHLMC Certificate of Service: 10/28/2020. [20-4082] (JDF) [Entered: 10/28/2020 09:04 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee FHLMC by Jason D. Frank. Certificate of Service: 10/28/2020. [20-4082] (JDF) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:59 PM]
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee FHLMC by Jordan D. Hershman. Certificate of Service: 10/28/2020. [20-4082] (JDH) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:55 PM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/07/2020; appellee brief due 01/06/2021. (SSS) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:41 PM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. fCertificate of Service: 10/27/2020. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 10/27/2020 02:37 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System.. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2020. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:36 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Wilbert Benjamin Markovits for Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System Certificate of Service: 10/26/2020. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:35 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System by W.B.Markovits. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2020. [20-4082] (WBM) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:34 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System by Terence R. Coates. Certificate of Service: 10/26/2020. [20-4082] (TC) [Entered: 10/26/2020 02:30 PM]
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System by Richard S. Wayne. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2020. [20-4082] (RSW) [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:17 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:09 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 10/13/2020 03:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ohio Public Employees Ret v. FHLMC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OHIO PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, on behalf of Itself and All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Wilbert Benjamin Markovits
Represented By: Terence Coates
Represented By: Richard Stuart Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EUGENE M. MCQUADE
Represented By: Michael S. Doluisio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY S. PISZEL
Represented By: Michael V. Rella
Represented By: Joseph C. Weinstein
Represented By: James K. Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA L. COOK
Represented By: Carl Spencer Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, aka Freddie Mac
Represented By: Jason D. Frank
Represented By: Hugh E. McKay
Represented By: Emily Renshaw
Represented By: Jordan D. Hershman
Represented By: Michael E. Kenneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD F. SYRON
Represented By: Frank R. Volpe
Represented By: Frank Robert Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?