Donald Middlebrooks v. Tony Parker, et al
Defendant / Appellee: TONY PARKER, in his official capacity as Tennessee's Commissioner of Correction and TONY MAYS, in his official capacity as Warden of Riverbend Maximum Security Institution
Plaintiff / Appellant: DONALD RAY MIDDLEBROOKS
Case Number: 20-5419
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 DEATH PENALTY BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 08/17/2020; appellee brief due 10/15/2020. (PJE) [Entered: 06/17/2020 11:30 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Tony Mays and Tony Parker by Rob Mitchell. Certificate of Service: 06/04/2020. [20-5419] (RWM) [Entered: 06/04/2020 12:13 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Tony Mays and Tony Parker by Scott C. Sutherland. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5419] (SCS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 06:15 PM]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Tony Mays and Tony Parker by Miranda Jones. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2020. [20-5419] (MHJ) [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:23 AM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Copy of District Court Order filed 5-12-2020 R.33 GRANTING in forma pauperis and assessing the $505 filing fee (PJE) [Entered: 05/28/2020 06:04 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Ray Middlebrooks by Richard L. Tennent. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2020. [20-5419] (RLT) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:21 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Ray Middlebrooks by Katherine M. Dix. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2020. [20-5419] (KMD) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:15 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Ray Middlebrooks by Kelley J. Henry. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2020. [20-5419] (KJH) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:12 AM]
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Donald Ray Middlebrooks by Amy D. Harwell. Certificate of Service: 05/07/2020. [20-5419] (ADH) [Entered: 05/07/2020 10:09 AM]
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Deficiency notice filed 4-29-2020 R.31. IFP forms or fee due in DC by 5-29-2020 (PJE) [Entered: 04/29/2020 01:58 PM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 04/23/2020 06:29 AM]
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 Death Penalty Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Donald Ray Middlebrooks. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 04/23/2020 06:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Donald Middlebrooks v. Tony Parker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY PARKER, in his official capacity as Tennessee's Commissioner of Correction
Represented By: Scott Crawford Sutherland
Represented By: Miranda Heather Jones
Represented By: Robert William Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONY MAYS, in his official capacity as Warden of Riverbend Maximum Security Institution
Represented By: Scott Crawford Sutherland
Represented By: Miranda Heather Jones
Represented By: Robert William Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD RAY MIDDLEBROOKS
Represented By: Kelley J. Henry
Represented By: Amy D. Harwell
Represented By: Katherine Marie Dix
Represented By: Richard L. Tennent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?