Scott Hardin v. ATF, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: SCOTT A. HARDIN
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Attorneys Office, WILLIAM P. BARR, U.S. Attorney General, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States, BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, an agency of the Department of Justice, THOMAS E. BRANDON, Acting Director Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives and JEFFREY A. ROSEN, Acting U.S. Attorney General, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 20-6380
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees ATF, Thomas E. Brandon, Mr. Jeffrey A. Rosen and USA by Abby Wright. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2021. [20-6380] (ACW) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:56 AM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/08/2021; appellee brief due 03/10/2021. (REO) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:23 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees ATF, William P. Barr, Thomas E. Brandon and USA by Brad Hinshelwood. Certificate of Service: 12/28/2020. [20-6380] (BH) [Entered: 12/28/2020 08:40 AM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Scott A. Hardin by Joseph Allan Cobb. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2020. [20-6380] (JAC) [Entered: 12/18/2020 09:05 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Jason T. Hardin for Mr. Scott A. Hardin. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2020. [20-6380] (JTH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:05 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason T. Hardin for Appellant Mr. Scott A. Hardin Certificate of Service: 12/18/2020. [20-6380] (JTH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 06:01 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jason T. Hardin for Appellant Mr. Scott A. Hardin.. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2020. [20-6380] (JTH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 05:59 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Mr. Scott A. Hardin by Jason T. Hardin. Certificate of Service: 12/18/2020. [20-6380] (JTH) [Entered: 12/18/2020 05:57 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:49 PM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Scott A.. Hardin. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 12/08/2020 01:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Scott Hardin v. ATF, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT A. HARDIN
Represented By: Joseph Allan Cobb
Represented By: Jason T. Hardin
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Attorneys Office
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, U.S. Attorney General, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, an agency of the Department of Justice
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS E. BRANDON, Acting Director Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY A. ROSEN, Acting U.S. Attorney General, in his official capacity as Acting Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?