Martin Leaf v. Nike, Inc., et al
Defendant: FACEBOOK, INC., YOUTUBE LLC, TWITTER, INC. and GOOGLE, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARTIN H. LEAF
Defendant / Appellee: NIKE, INC. and WIEDEN & KENNEDY
Case Number: 21-1045
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Martin H. Leaf by Douglas K. MacLean. Certificate of Service: 02/04/2021. [21-1045] (DKM) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:55 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/16/2021; appellee brief due 04/15/2021. (JAC) [Entered: 02/04/2021 08:02 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Martin H. Leaf for Martin H. Leaf. Certificate of Service: 02/04/2021. [21-1045] (MHL) [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:51 AM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Martin H. Leaf for Appellant Martin H. Leaf Certificate of Service: 02/03/2021. [21-1045] (MHL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 01:04 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Martin H. Leaf for Appellant Martin H. Leaf.. Certificate of Service: 02/03/2021. [21-1045] (MHL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:47 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Martin H. Leaf by Martin H Leaf. Certificate of Service: 02/03/2021. [21-1045] (MHL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:34 PM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form, [ # 8 ], filed by Mr. Martin H. Leaf for Martin H. Leaf is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (JAC) [Entered: 02/02/2021 09:34 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED FROM SIGNING ATTORNEY'S PACER ACCOUNT - PLEASE REFILE ACCORDINGLY *** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Marc M. Susselman for Appellant Martin H. Leaf Certificate of Service: 02/01/2021. [21-1045]--[Edited 02/02/2021 by JAC] (MMS) [Entered: 02/01/2021 07:12 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILED FROM SIGNING ATTORNEY'S PACER ACCOUNT - PLEASE REFILE ACCORDINGLY *** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Marc M. Susselman for Appellant Martin H. Leaf.. Certificate of Service: 02/01/2021. [21-1045]--[Edited 02/02/2021 by JAC] (MMS) [Entered: 02/01/2021 07:09 PM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 *** DEFECTIVE ENTRY SEE #12 *** APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Martin H. Leaf by Martin H Leaf. Certificate of Service: 02/01/2021. [21-1045]--[Edited 02/03/2021 by JAC] (MHL) [Entered: 02/01/2021 06:44 PM]
January 30, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Martin H. Leaf by Marc M. Susselman. Certificate of Service: 01/30/2021. [21-1045] (MMS) [Entered: 01/30/2021 08:36 PM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellee Nike, Inc. Certificate of Service: 01/28/2021. [21-1045]--[Edited 01/28/2021 by JAC] (NSR) [Entered: 01/28/2021 11:20 AM]
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Nasseem Sara Ramin for Appellee Wieden & Kennedy Certificate of Service: 01/28/2021. [21-1045]--[Edited 01/28/2021 by JAC] (NSR) [Entered: 01/28/2021 11:19 AM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nike, Inc. and Wieden & Kennedy by Thomas M. Schehr. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2021. [21-1045] (TMS) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:53 PM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Nike, Inc. and Wieden & Kennedy by Nasseem S. Ramin. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2021. [21-1045] (NSR) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:51 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Julie A. Connor (JAC) [Entered: 01/15/2021 01:27 PM]
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Martin H. Leaf. Transcript needed: n. (JAC) [Entered: 01/15/2021 01:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Martin Leaf v. Nike, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YOUTUBE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWITTER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTIN H. LEAF
Represented By: Douglas K. MacLean
Represented By: Martin H. Leaf
Represented By: Marc M. Susselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NIKE, INC.
Represented By: Nasseem Sara Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WIEDEN & KENNEDY
Represented By: Nasseem Sara Ramin
Represented By: Thomas M. Schehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?