Latrent Redrick, et al v. City of Akron, OH, et al
Defendant: SCOTT LIETKE, UTOMHIN OKOH and CITY OF AKRON, OH
Plaintiff / Appellee: JAMON PRUIETT and LATRENT REDRICK
Defendant / Appellant: JOHN TURNURE
Case Number: 21-3027
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 03/15/2021;. appellee brief due 04/13/2021; (RGF) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:40 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:11 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney John Christopher Reece for Appellant John Turnure Certificate of Service: 01/25/2021. [21-3027] (JCR) [Entered: 01/25/2021 11:04 AM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney John Christopher Reece for Appellant John Turnure.. Certificate of Service: 01/25/2021. [21-3027] (JCR) [Entered: 01/25/2021 11:01 AM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Latrent Redrick and Jamon Pruiett by Sarah Jeanette Gelsomino. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2021. [21-3027] (SJG) [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:30 PM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant John Turnure by John Christopher Reece. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2021. [21-3027] (JCR) [Entered: 01/22/2021 02:17 PM]
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant John Turnure by Michael J. Defibaugh. Certificate of Service: 01/22/2021. [21-3027] (MJD) [Entered: 01/22/2021 02:16 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:29 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:27 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 03:57 PM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant John Turnure. Transcript needed: y. (RGF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 03:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Latrent Redrick, et al v. City of Akron, OH, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMON PRUIETT
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Greene
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Gelsomino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LATRENT REDRICK
Represented By: Jacqueline C. Greene
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Gelsomino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LIETKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTOMHIN OKOH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF AKRON, OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN TURNURE
Represented By: John Christopher Reece
Represented By: Michael J. Defibaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?