Pandora Distribution, LLC v. Ottawa OH, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: GENESEE & WYOMING, INC., DBI PARTNERS, LLC and PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, nka Philips North America LLC
Defendant / Appellant: OTTAWA OH, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: PANDORA DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Appellee: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 21-3127
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT filed. The next Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/09/2021 from Counsel for Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:57 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT filed. The next Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 04/09/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa OH, LLC. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:53 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 28 A Joint Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 03/19/2021 from Counsel for Pandora Distribution, LLC, Philips Electronics North America Corp., nka Philips North America LLC, and Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:39 PM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 27 A Status Report is DUE TO THE MEDIATION 03/19/2021 from Counsel for Ottawa OH, LLC. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:34 PM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Genesee & Wyoming, Inc. by Timothy Nackowicz. Certificate of Service: 03/09/2021. [21-3127] (TPN) [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:19 PM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 25 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy John Fitzgerald for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2021. [21-3127] (TJF) [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:39 AM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158, 21-3127 by Bruce J.L. Lowe. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (BJL) [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:14 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. William A. Doyle for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158, 21-3127 Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (WAD) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:53 PM]
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation in 21-3158 by William A. Doyle. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (WAD) [Entered: 02/25/2021 01:49 PM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3158, 21-3127. Certificate of Service: 02/24/2021. [21-3158, 21-3127] (TPN) [Entered: 02/24/2021 11:58 AM]
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg will INCLUDE BOTH CA Nos. 21-3127 AND 21-3158. [Please open original notice found on CA No. 21-3127 for important details and deadlines.] [21-3127, 21-3158] (LMR) [Entered: 02/24/2021 09:15 AM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Timothy John Fitzgerald for Ottawa OH, LLC. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 05:30 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 by Timothy P. Nackowicz. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 05:00 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:51 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher F. Swing for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127] (CFS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:00 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 15 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE LISTING BOTH CASE NOS. 21-3127 AND 21-3158***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:44 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy John Fitzgerald for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:43 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 11 ], filed by Mr. Timothy P. Nackowicz for Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127 is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 02/26/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158] (CAM) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:43 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ottawa OH, LLC by Timothy J. Fitzgerald. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127] (TJF) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:41 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE LISTING BOTH CASE NOS. 21-3127 AND 21-3158 AND CORRECT THE DEFICIENCIES NOTED IN RE 13***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Cross-Appellant Pandora Distribution, LLC in 21-3127, 21-3158 by Timothy P. Nackowicz. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (TPN) [Entered: 02/23/2021 02:24 PM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company by David Sporar. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127] (DS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:51 AM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE ONLY IN CASE 21-3127 WHERE FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO IS PARTY ON APPEAL. COUNSEL MUST UNCHECK THE OTHER CASE NUMBERS***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company in 21-3127 by David Sporar. Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (DS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 11:03 AM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO REFILE ONLY IN CASE 21-3127 WHERE FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO IS PARTY ON APPEAL. COUNSEL MUST UNCHECK THE OTHER CASE NUMBERS***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher F. Swing for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company in 21-3127 Certificate of Service: 02/23/2021. [21-3127, 21-3158]--[Edited 02/23/2021 by CAM] (CFS) [Entered: 02/23/2021 10:27 AM]
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee First American Title Insurance Company by Christopher F. Swing. Certificate of Service: 02/19/2021. [21-3127] (CFS) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:21 PM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation by Bruce J. L. Lowe. Certificate of Service: 02/18/2021. [21-3127] (BJL) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:57 AM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/10/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:06 AM]
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:05 AM]
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Philips Electronics North America Corporation by William A. Doyle. Certificate of Service: 02/17/2021. [21-3127] (WAD) [Entered: 02/17/2021 09:38 AM]
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:43 AM]
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ottawa OH, LLC. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pandora Distribution, LLC v. Ottawa OH, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENESEE & WYOMING, INC.
Represented By: James R. Carnes
Represented By: Timothy P. Nackowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DBI PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: DBI Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, nka Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Bruce J.L. Lowe
Represented By: Amelia Jane Workman Farago
Represented By: William A. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OTTAWA OH, LLC
Represented By: Timothy John Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PANDORA DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By: Timothy P. Nackowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: David Sporar
Represented By: Christopher F. Swing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?