Jeffrey Kahl v. Spectrum Security, LLC, et al
Defendant: JOHN DOE, #1
Plaintiff / Appellant: JEFFREY KAHL, Administrator of the Estate of Deceased Heather Kahl
Defendant / Appellee: TWC SECURITY, INC., doing business as Time Warner Cable, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC., doing business as Spectrum, TWC SECURITY, LLC, doing business as Time Warner and SPECTRUM SECURITY, LLC, doing business as Spectrum
Case Number: 21-3306
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 05/11/2021 02:13 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/01/2021; appellee brief due 07/01/2021. (MMP) [Entered: 04/19/2021 12:45 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Robert P. Rutter for Jeffrey Kahl. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3306] (RPR) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:56 AM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Monroe, II for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (JM) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:39 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Monroe, II for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (JM) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:38 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Monroe, II for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (JM) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:36 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph Monroe, II for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (JM) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:35 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC by Joseph Monroe II. Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (JM) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:32 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC by Richard C.O. Rezie. Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (RCR) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:30 PM]
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Security, LLC, TWC Security, Inc. and TWC Security, LLC by Thomas J. Cabral. Certificate of Service: 04/09/2021. [21-3306] (TJC) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:21 PM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Robert P. Rutter for Appellant Jeffrey Kahl Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-3306] (RPR) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:01 AM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Robert P. Rutter for Appellant Jeffrey Kahl.. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-3306] (RPR) [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:59 AM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Jeffrey Kahl by Robert P. Rutter. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-3306] (RPR) [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:58 AM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:19 PM]
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:14 PM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 03/26/2021 03:25 PM]
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Jeffrey Kahl. Transcript needed: y. (MMP) [Entered: 03/26/2021 03:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jeffrey Kahl v. Spectrum Security, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY KAHL, Administrator of the Estate of Deceased Heather Kahl
Represented By: Robert P. Rutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWC SECURITY, INC., doing business as Time Warner Cable
Represented By: Joseph Monroe II
Represented By: Thomas J. Cabral
Represented By: Richard C.O. Rezie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC., doing business as Spectrum
Represented By: Joseph Monroe II
Represented By: Thomas J. Cabral
Represented By: Richard C.O. Rezie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TWC SECURITY, LLC, doing business as Time Warner
Represented By: Joseph Monroe II
Represented By: Thomas J. Cabral
Represented By: Richard C.O. Rezie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECTRUM SECURITY, LLC, doing business as Spectrum
Represented By: Joseph Monroe II
Represented By: Thomas J. Cabral
Represented By: Richard C.O. Rezie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE, #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?