In re: Bennie Adams, et al v. Richard Michael DeWine, et al
Plaintiff: BENNIE ADAMS
Plaintiff / Appellee: DOUGLAS L. COLEY, DENNY OBERMILLER, JASON ROBB, ANGELO FEARS, JAMES MAMMONE, ANDRE JACKSON, HERSIE R. WESSON, ARCHIE DIXON, JUAN A. KINLEY, TIMOTHY HOFFNER, SIDDIQUE ABDULLAH HASAN, WARREN SPIVEY, JEFFREY A. WOGENSTAHL, GREGORY OSIE, DANNY HILL, RALPH LYNCH, ROLAND DAVIS, WILLIE WILKS, KAREEM M. JACKSON, WARREN WADDY, SEAN CARTER, JOHN DAVID STUMPF, STEVEN CEPEC, AHMAD FAWZI ISSA, DELANO HALE, MICHAEL D. WEBB, JAMES TENCH, CHARLES L. LORRAINE, GERALD HAND, KEITH LAMAR, CLIFFORD WILLIAMS, GREGORY LOTT, DUANE SHORT, JAMES TRIMBLE, CARL LINDSEY, CEDRIC CARTER, TYRONE BALLEW, STANLEY FITZPATRICK, ANDRE WILLIAMS, ANTHONY BELTON, WILLIAM SAPP, QUISI BRYAN, AUGUST CASSANO, KEVIN P. SCUDDER, GENESIS HILL, JAMES WERE, JAMES T. CONWAY, III, PHILLIP ELMORE, EDWARD LANG, ABDUL AWKAL, WAYNE POWELL, LAMONT HUNTER, DAVEL CHINN, LARRY GAPEN, JONATHAN MONROE, GARY HUGHBANKS, ANTONIO FRANKLIN, MELVIN BONNELL, MICHAEL DEAN SCOTT, TIMOTHY ALAN DUNLAP, STANLEY T. ADAMS, JOHN DRUMMOND, HARRY D. MITTS, JR., GEORGE W. SKATZES, JAMES O'NEAL, WALTER RAGLIN, JOSE TRINIDAD LOZA, JERONIQUE D. CUNNINGHAM, RICHARD BAYS, GREGORY ESPARZA, FREDDIE MCNEILL, JR., DAVID BRADEN, ROBERT WILLIAMS, GRADY BRINKLEY, RONALD R. POST, LAWRENCE LANDRUM, SAMUEL MORELAND, KENNETH W. SMITH, JEROME HENDERSON, JAMES HANNA, DAWUD SPAULDING, MICHAEL TURNER, BOBBY T. SHEPPARD, NATHANIEL JACKSON, CLARENCE FRY, DAVID SNEED, PERCY HUTTON, RAYMOND A. TWYFORD, III, DONALD KETTERER, KERRY PEREZ and DAVID WAYNE ALLEN
Intervenor / Appellee: VON CLARK DAVIS, CALVIN MCKELTON, ASHFORD THOMPSON and CARON MONTGOMERY
Defendant / Appellant: ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH, Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections, EDWIN C. VOORHIES, JR., Managing Director of Operations, ODRC, MIKE DEWINE, Governor, State of Ohio, RICHARD THEODORE, Pharmacist, c/o ODRC, JOHN COLEMAN, Warden, Warden, Toledo Correctional Institution, RONALD ERDOS, Warden, Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, CHRISTOPHER LAROSE, Warden, Ohio State Penitentiary, ANONYMOUS EXECUTION TEAM MEMBERS 1-50, c/o Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, CHARLES BRADLEY, Warden, Franklin Medical Center, STEPHEN GRAY, Chief Counsel, ODRC, TIM SHOOP, Warden, Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Center, DONALD MORGAN, Warden and RICHARD MICHAEL DEWINE, Governor, State of Ohio
Not Classified By Court: In re: OHIO EXECUTION PROTOCOL LITIGATION
Case Number: 21-3330
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dale D. Cook for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2021. [21-3330] (DDC) [Entered: 05/28/2021 12:43 PM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 46 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Dale D. Cook for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr... Certificate of Service: 05/28/2021. [21-3330] (DDC) [Entered: 05/28/2021 12:41 PM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 45 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. by Dale D. Cook. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2021. [21-3330] (DDC) [Entered: 05/28/2021 12:39 PM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION filed by Mr. Dale D. Cook for Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. to extend time to File Notices of Appearances, Corporate Disclosure and Statement of Issues and Transcript Notice Certificate of Service: 05/28/2021. [21-3330] (DDC) [Entered: 05/28/2021 12:36 PM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 43 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. by Mark Landes. Certificate of Service: 05/28/2021. [21-3330] (MDL) [Entered: 05/28/2021 11:41 AM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 42 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The corporate disclosure , [ # 38 ], filed by Mr. Dale D. Cook for John Coleman, Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr., Donald Morgan, Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Richard Michael DeWine, Charles Bradley, Christopher LaRose, Annette Chambers-Smith, Stephen Gray, Ronald Erdos and Tim Shoop is deficient for the reason noted: the form is in an editable format.. You may correct the deficiency and refile within 7 days. (RB) [Entered: 05/28/2021 11:04 AM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 41 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form for Dale D. Cook, [ # 37 ],, appearance form for Mark Landes, [ # 36 ], filed by Mr. Dale D. Cook for John Coleman, Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr., Donald Morgan, Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Richard Michael DeWine, Charles Bradley, Christopher LaRose, Annette Chambers-Smith, Stephen Gray, Ronald Erdos and Tim Shoop is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 06/04/2021. (RB) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:45 AM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Dale D. Cook for Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr.. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2021. [21-3330] (DDC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:02 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 39 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - FORM IS IN EDITABLE FORMAT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE SO FORM IS NOT EDITABLE*** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Dale D. Cook for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr... Certificate of Service: 05/27/2021. [21-3330]--[Edited 05/28/2021 by RB] (DDC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:58 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 38 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE DEFICIENCY SENT 5/28/20 # 42*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Dale D. Cook for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2021. [21-3330]--[Edited 05/28/2021 by RB] (DDC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:57 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 37 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE DEFICIENCY NOTICE SENT 5/28/20 # 41*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. by Dale D. Cook. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2021. [21-3330]--[Edited 05/28/2021 by RB] (DDC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:55 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 36 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE DEFICIENCY NOTICE SENT 5/28/20 # 41*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. by Mark Landes. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2021. [21-3330]--[Edited 05/28/2021 by RB] (DDC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:53 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 35 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - INCORRECT RELIEF USED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE AS MOTION EXTEND TIME (GENERIC)*** MOTION filed by Mr. Dale D. Cook for Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. for Leave to File Notices of Appearances, Corporate Disclosure and Statement of Issues and Transcript Notice Instanter Certificate of Service: 05/27/2021. [21-3330]--[Edited 05/28/2021 by RB] (DDC) [Entered: 05/27/2021 04:46 PM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 34 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mr. Michael Dean Scott by David L. Doughten. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2021. [21-3330] (DLD) [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:03 AM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 33 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Jeronique D. Cunningham, Archie Dixon and Edward Lang by Michael J. Benza. Certificate of Service: 04/27/2021. [21-3330] (MJB) [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:11 AM]
April 26, 2021 Filing 32 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Phillip Elmore, James Hanna and Dawud Spaulding by Paul R. Bottei. Certificate of Service: 04/26/2021. [21-3330] (PRB) [Entered: 04/26/2021 08:09 AM]
April 25, 2021 Filing 31 ***LOCKED*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Edward Lang by Michael J. Benza. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2021. [21-3330] Counsel kindly advised to refile appearance listing all appellants representing.,--[Edited 04/26/2021 by PJE]] (MJB) [Entered: 04/25/2021 04:21 PM]
April 25, 2021 Filing 30 ***LOCKED*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Archie Dixon by Michael J. Benza. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2021. [21-3330] Counsel kindly advised to refile appearance listing all appellants representing.--[Edited 04/26/2021 by PJE] (MJB) [Entered: 04/25/2021 04:20 PM]
April 25, 2021 Filing 29 ***LOCKED***APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jeronique D. Cunningham by Michael J. Benza. Certificate of Service: 04/25/2021. [21-3330] Counsel kindly advised to refile one appearance listing all appellant representing--[Edited 04/26/2021 by PJE] (MJB) [Entered: 04/25/2021 04:19 PM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION filed by S. Adele Shank and Gary W. Crim for Kevin P. Scudder regarding NOTICE AND SUGGESTION OF THE DEATH OF PLAINTIFF-APPELLEE KEVIN P. SCUDDER. Certificate of Service: 04/23/2021. [21-3330]--[Edited 04/23/2021 by PJE] (SAS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:30 AM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 27 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee James O'Neal by S. Adele Shank. Certificate of Service: 04/23/2021. [21-3330] (SAS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:26 AM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Antonio Franklin by S. Adele Shank. Certificate of Service: 04/23/2021. [21-3330] (SAS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 09:23 AM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Charles A. Schneider for Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. regarding Notice that Richard Theodore is not a Defendant-Appellant in this appeal. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2021. [21-3330] (CAS) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:42 PM]
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. by Charles A. Schneider. Certificate of Service: 04/21/2021. [21-3330] (CAS) [Entered: 04/21/2021 09:06 AM]
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Richard Michael DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr. by Charles L. Wille. Certificate of Service: 04/21/2021. [21-3330] (CLW) [Entered: 04/21/2021 08:24 AM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Timothy Hoffner and Gregory Lott by Stephen M. Kissinger. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2021. [21-3330] (SMK) [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:41 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Calvin McKelton by Dana C. Hansen Chavis. Certificate of Service: 04/20/2021. [21-3330] (DHC) [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:34 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Jose Trinidad Loza by Laurence E. Komp. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (LEK) [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:13 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Stanley Fitzpatrick and Delano Hale by Lisa M. Lagos. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (LML) [Entered: 04/19/2021 12:45 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Stanley T. Adams, Richard Bays, August Cassano, Davel Chinn, Roland Davis, Von Clark Davis, Timothy Alan Dunlap, Phillip Elmore, Larry Gapen, James Hanna, Jerome Henderson, Lamont Hunter, Mr. Carl Lindsey, Samuel Moreland, Walter Raglin, Jason Robb, Bobby T. Sheppard, Kenneth W. Smith, Dawud Spaulding, John David Stumpf and Michael Turner by Allen L. Bohnert. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (ALB) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:54 AM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 17 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Quisi Bryan, John Drummond, Gregory Esparza, Danny Hill, Percy Hutton, Kareem M. Jackson, Jonathan Monroe, James Mammone, Denny Obermiller, George W. Skatzes, David Sneed, Raymond A. Twyford, III, Warren Waddy, Hersie R. Wesson, Andre Williams and Robert Williams by Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (VRW) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:50 AM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Quisi Bryan, John Drummond, Gregory Esparza and Kareem M. Jackson by Lori B. Riga. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (LBR) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:40 AM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melvin Bonnell, Quisi Bryan, John Drummond, Gregory Esparza, Percy Hutton, Kareem M. Jackson and Hersie R. Wesson by Alan C. Rossman. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (ACR) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:35 AM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Douglas L. Coley by Sharon A. Hicks. Certificate of Service: 04/19/2021. [21-3330] (SAH) [Entered: 04/19/2021 11:22 AM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Clifford Williams by Richard A. Cline. Certificate of Service: 04/16/2021. [21-3330] (RAC) [Entered: 04/16/2021 09:57 AM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 ***LOCKED - not accepted for filing*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Clifford Williams by Richard A. Cline. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2021. [21-3330] Counsel, Mr. Cline kindly advised to refile appearance under his own PACER acct.--[Edited 04/15/2021 by PJE] (AML) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:26 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Steven Cepec, Kerry Perez and Willie Wilks by Adrienne M. Larimer. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2021. [21-3330] (AML) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:41 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees David Wayne Allen, Tyrone Ballew, Cedric Carter, Sean Carter, James T. Conway, III, Gary Hughbanks, Andre Jackson, Nathaniel Jackson, Donald Ketterer, Juan A. Kinley, Lawrence Landrum, Charles L. Lorraine, Gregory Osie, William Sapp and James Were by Randall Porter. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2021. [21-3330] (RLP) [Entered: 04/15/2021 12:37 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Anthony Belton by Jessica Houston. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2021. [21-3330] (JLH) [Entered: 04/15/2021 09:41 AM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melvin Bonnell, Clarence Fry, Duane Short, Michael D. Webb, James Tench, Jeffrey A. Wogenstahl, Caron Montgomery and Ashford Thompson by Kimberly S. Rigby. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2021. [21-3330] (KSR) [Entered: 04/15/2021 09:32 AM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees David Braden, James Trimble and Ralph Lynch by Kathryn L. Sandford. Certificate of Service: 04/15/2021. [21-3330] (KLS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 09:25 AM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Gerald Hand by Jennifer Kinsley. Certificate of Service: 04/14/2021. [21-3330] (JMK) [Entered: 04/14/2021 11:29 AM]
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER SENT to all counsel regarding correccted caption. (PJE) [Entered: 04/14/2021 08:17 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 Update fee status change to paid. 4-8-21. Receipt No. 200COL065428 (PJE) [Entered: 04/12/2021 07:45 AM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER SENT to all parties regarding corrected case caption. [21-3330] (PJE) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:52 PM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Patricia J. Elder (PJE) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:42 PM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 Death Penalty Prisoner Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Anonymous Execution Team Members 1-50, Charles Bradley, Annette Chambers-Smith, John Coleman, Mike DeWine, Ronald Erdos, Stephen Gray, Christopher LaRose, Donald Morgan, Tim Shoop, Richard Theodore and Edwin C. Voorhies, Jr.. Transcript needed: y. (PJE) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Bennie Adams, et al v. Richard Michael DeWine, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOUGLAS L. COLEY
Represented By: Sharon Anne Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DENNY OBERMILLER
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JASON ROBB
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANGELO FEARS
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES MAMMONE
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDRE JACKSON
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HERSIE R. WESSON
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARCHIE DIXON
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Michael J. Benza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUAN A. KINLEY
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TIMOTHY HOFFNER
Represented By: Stephen M. Kissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SIDDIQUE ABDULLAH HASAN
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WARREN SPIVEY
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEFFREY A. WOGENSTAHL
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY OSIE
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DANNY HILL
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RALPH LYNCH
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Kathryn Louise Sandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROLAND DAVIS
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIE WILKS
Represented By: Adrienne Michelle Larimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAREEM M. JACKSON
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Represented By: Lori Beth Riga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WARREN WADDY
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SEAN CARTER
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN DAVID STUMPF
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVEN CEPEC
Represented By: Adrienne Michelle Larimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AHMAD FAWZI ISSA
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DELANO HALE
Represented By: Lisa Marie Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL D. WEBB
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES TENCH
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES L. LORRAINE
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GERALD HAND
Represented By: Jennifer M. Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEITH LAMAR
Represented By: Stephen M. Kissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLIFFORD WILLIAMS
Represented By: Richard A. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY LOTT
Represented By: Stephen M. Kissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DUANE SHORT
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES TRIMBLE
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Kathryn Louise Sandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARL LINDSEY
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CEDRIC CARTER
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TYRONE BALLEW
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STANLEY FITZPATRICK
Represented By: Lisa Marie Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDRE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTHONY BELTON
Represented By: Jessica Leigh Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILLIAM SAPP
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: QUISI BRYAN
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Represented By: Lori Beth Riga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AUGUST CASSANO
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN P. SCUDDER
Represented By: S. Adele Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GENESIS HILL
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES WERE
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES T. CONWAY, III
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PHILLIP ELMORE
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Represented By: Paul R. Bottei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWARD LANG
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Michael J. Benza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ABDUL AWKAL
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WAYNE POWELL
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAMONT HUNTER
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVEL CHINN
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LARRY GAPEN
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JONATHAN MONROE
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GARY HUGHBANKS
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTONIO FRANKLIN
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: S. Adele Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELVIN BONNELL
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL DEAN SCOTT
Represented By: David Lawrence Doughten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TIMOTHY ALAN DUNLAP
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STANLEY T. ADAMS
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN DRUMMOND
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Represented By: Lori Beth Riga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HARRY D. MITTS, JR.
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GEORGE W. SKATZES
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES O'NEAL
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: S. Adele Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WALTER RAGLIN
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE TRINIDAD LOZA
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Laurence E. Komp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JERONIQUE D. CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Michael J. Benza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD BAYS
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREGORY ESPARZA
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Represented By: Lori Beth Riga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FREDDIE MCNEILL, JR.
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID BRADEN
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Kathryn Louise Sandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT WILLIAMS
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRADY BRINKLEY
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RONALD R. POST
Represented By: Rachel G. Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LAWRENCE LANDRUM
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SAMUEL MORELAND
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KENNETH W. SMITH
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEROME HENDERSON
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAMES HANNA
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Represented By: Paul R. Bottei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAWUD SPAULDING
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Represented By: Paul R. Bottei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL TURNER
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BOBBY T. SHEPPARD
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATHANIEL JACKSON
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CLARENCE FRY
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID SNEED
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PERCY HUTTON
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Represented By: Alan C. Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAYMOND A. TWYFORD, III
Represented By: Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DONALD KETTERER
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KERRY PEREZ
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Represented By: Adrienne Michelle Larimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID WAYNE ALLEN
Represented By: Randall L. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: VON CLARK DAVIS
Represented By: Allen L. Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CALVIN MCKELTON
Represented By: Dana Hansen Chavis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: ASHFORD THOMPSON
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: CARON MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANNETTE CHAMBERS-SMITH, Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWIN C. VOORHIES, JR., Managing Director of Operations, ODRC
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MIKE DEWINE, Governor, State of Ohio
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD THEODORE, Pharmacist, c/o ODRC
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN COLEMAN, Warden, Warden, Toledo Correctional Institution
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RONALD ERDOS, Warden, Warden, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTOPHER LAROSE, Warden, Ohio State Penitentiary
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANONYMOUS EXECUTION TEAM MEMBERS 1-50, c/o Southern Ohio Correctional Facility
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHARLES BRADLEY, Warden, Franklin Medical Center
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEPHEN GRAY, Chief Counsel, ODRC
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TIM SHOOP, Warden, Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Center
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONALD MORGAN, Warden
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RICHARD MICHAEL DEWINE, Governor, State of Ohio
Represented By: Dale D. Cook
Represented By: Charles A. Schneider
Represented By: Charles L. Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNIE ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: OHIO EXECUTION PROTOCOL LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?