Travis Abbott, et al v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours & Co
Defendant / Appellant: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Not Classified By Court: In re: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY C-8 PERSONAL INJURY LITIGATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: JULIE ABBOTT and TRAVIS ABBOTT
Case Number: 21-3418
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 28 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief by 21 days [ # 27 ] filed by Mr. Damond R. Mace., resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/21/2021. appellee brief now due 08/20/2021. (CAM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 10:00 AM]
June 23, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION filed by Mr. Damond R. Mace for E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 06/23/2021. [21-3418] (DRM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 09:29 AM]
May 24, 2021 Filing 26 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Rachel Bloomekatz. Certificate of Service: 05/24/2021. [21-3418] (RSB) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:43 PM]
May 21, 2021 Filing 25 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 06/30/2021; appellee brief due 07/30/2021. (CAM) [Entered: 05/21/2021 12:44 PM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Brett Thompson. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-3418] (BCT) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:39 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 23 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Mitchell Theodore. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-3418] (MT) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:37 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Nina Towle Herring. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-3418] (NTH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:35 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Elizabeth E. Chambers. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-3418] (EEC) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:30 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by F. Jerome Tapley. Certificate of Service: 05/19/2021. [21-3418] (FJT) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:20 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance forms, [ # 16 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 14 ], [ # 13 ], [ # 12 ], filed by Mr. Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of F. Jerome Tapley, Elizabeth E. Chambers, Nina Towle Herring, Mitchell Theodore and Brett Thompson for Appellees Travis Abbott and Julie Abbott. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (CAM) [Entered: 05/19/2021 09:56 AM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Damond R. Mace for E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. fCertificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (DRM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:20 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jon Collins Conlin for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:18 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL MUST REFILE FROM HIS/HER OWN PACER ACCOUNT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Brett Thompson. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418]--[Edited 05/19/2021 by CAM] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:16 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL MUST REFILE FROM HIS/HER OWN PACER ACCOUNT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Mitchell Theodore. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418]--[Edited 05/19/2021 by CAM] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:13 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL MUST REFILE FROM HIS/HER OWN PACER ACCOUNT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Nina Towle Herring. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418]--[Edited 05/19/2021 by CAM] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:12 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 13 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL MUST REFILE FROM HIS/HER OWN PACER ACCOUNT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Elizabeth E. Chambers. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418]--[Edited 05/19/2021 by CAM] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:12 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL MUST REFILE FROM HIS/HER OWN PACER ACCOUNT*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by F. Jerome Tapley. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418]--[Edited 05/19/2021 by CAM] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:10 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Julie Abbott and Travis Abbott by Jon C. Conlin. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (JCC) [Entered: 05/18/2021 06:08 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Damond R. Mace for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (DRM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 04:48 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Damond R. Mace for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company.. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (DRM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:48 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 ***LOCKED--COUNSEL TO FLATTEN DOCUMENT (PRINT TO PDF) AND REFILE*** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Damond R. Mace for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418]--[Edited 05/18/2021 by CAM] (DRM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:46 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company by John A. Burlingame. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (JAB) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:44 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company by Aneca E. Lasley. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (AEL) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:43 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company by Colter L. Paulson. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (CLP) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:41 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company by Lauren S. Kuley. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (LSK) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:38 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company by Damond R. Mace. Certificate of Service: 05/18/2021. [21-3418] (DRM) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:35 PM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 05/05/2021 10:35 AM]
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 05/05/2021 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Travis Abbott, et al v. E. I. du Pont de Nemours & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Represented By: John A. Burlingame
Represented By: Damond R. Mace
Represented By: Aneca E. Lasley
Represented By: Colter Lawrence Paulson
Represented By: Lauren Suzanne Kuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY C-8 PERSONAL INJURY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JULIE ABBOTT
Represented By: Debra Anne Nelson
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Mitchell Theodore
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Rachel Sarah Bloomekatz
Represented By: Brett Cooper Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Chambers
Represented By: Nina Towle Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRAVIS ABBOTT
Represented By: Debra Anne Nelson
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Mitchell Theodore
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Rachel Sarah Bloomekatz
Represented By: Brett Cooper Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Chambers
Represented By: Nina Towle Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?